RUCKER et al v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd et al
Plaintiff: LAURA RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER and CARTER RUCKER
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd, Forster's West Bay Resort, South Shore Adventures and Fosters West Bay Resort
Case Number: 1:2024cv20788
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
2 Judge: Melissa Damian
3 Judge: Eduardo I Sanchez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IN EXCESS OF THE COURT ORDERED PAGE LIMIT; granting in part #31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
April 24, 2024 Filing 32 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal ( Responses due by 5/8/2024.) by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Map of Area, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Foster Pinella Diaz Bush, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kirby Warren)(Chardon, Carlos)
April 24, 2024 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Joint Motion to Dismiss by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chardon, Carlos)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #29 Defendant South Shore Adventure's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Finding good cause for the requested extension, and noting no opposition from Plaintiff, Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly all Defendants shall file their Response by April 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/8/2024. (cos)
April 8, 2024 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Defendant South Shore Aventures' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time for the Defendants to File Their Joint Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by South Shore Adventures. Attorney Noah Daniel Silverman added to party South Shore Adventures(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Noah)
March 29, 2024 Filing 28 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #27 Notice of Striking #25 MOTION TO DISMISS. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (sk)
March 28, 2024 Filing 27 Notice of Striking #25 MOTION TO DISMISS #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. Responses due by 4/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Spencer) Modified text/status per Chambers on 3/29/2024 (sk).
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. Response/Answer due 4/10/2024. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 3/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
March 27, 2024 Filing 25 STRICKEN (per DE#25 ) MOTION TO DISMISS #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. Attorney Spencer Burgess Price added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/10/2024. (Price, Spencer) Modified text/status per Chambers on 3/29/2024 (sk).
March 25, 2024 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. Attorney Carlos Javier Chardon added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chardon, Carlos)
March 8, 2024 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Mitchel Chusid re #22 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Mitchel Chusid has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
March 8, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Mitchel Chusid (Chusid, Mitchel)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Melissa Damian for all further proceedings, Judge Roy K. Altman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
March 6, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by LAURA RUCKER, CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER. South Shore Adventures served on 3/6/2024, response/answer due 3/27/2024. (Chusid, Mitchel)
March 5, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by LAURA RUCKER, CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER. Fosters West Bay Resort served on 3/4/2024, response/answer due 3/25/2024. (Chusid, Mitchel)
March 4, 2024 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Fosters West Bay Resort, South Shore Adventures. (cds)
March 4, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) South Shore Adventures by CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER, LAURA RUCKER re #1 Complaint filed by CHASE RUCKER, LAURA RUCKER, CARTER RUCKER (Chusid, Mitchel)
March 4, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fosters West Bay Resort, Roatan by CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER, LAURA RUCKER re #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by CHASE RUCKER, LAURA RUCKER, CARTER RUCKER (Chusid, Mitchel)
March 4, 2024 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re #13 Summons Issued. Correction Other. Document Restricted Due to Error. (cds)
March 4, 2024 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. South Shore Adventures (cds)
March 4, 2024 Filing 13 (RESTRICTED) Document Restricted Due to Error. (cds) Modified Docket Security on 3/4/2024 (cds).
March 4, 2024 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. FORSTERS WEST BAY RESORT (cds)
March 4, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) South Shore Excursions by CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER, LAURA RUCKER re #1 Complaint filed by CHASE RUCKER, LAURA RUCKER, CARTER RUCKER (Chusid, Mitchel)
March 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fosters West Bay Resort, Roatan by CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER, LAURA RUCKER re #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by CHASE RUCKER, LAURA RUCKER, CARTER RUCKER (Chusid, Mitchel)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Service by Publication. The Plaintiff may serve the Summonses, the Complaint, and all other filings and discovery in this case on Defendants Foster's West Bay Resort and South Shore Adventures via email. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez for Pretrial Non-Dispositive and Discovery Matters. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra no longer assigned as presider/referral judge(s) in case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
March 4, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by LAURA RUCKER, CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd served on 3/1/2024, response/answer due 3/22/2024. (Chusid, Mitchel)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Service by Publication to Authorize Alternative Service of Process on Defendants, Foster's West Bay Resort and South Shore Adventures by CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER, LAURA RUCKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chusid, Mitchel)
February 29, 2024 Filing 4 Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LAURA RUCKER, CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER.(Chusid, Mitchel)
February 29, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (nwn)
February 29, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17330824, filed by LAURA RUCKER, CARTER RUCKER, CHASE RUCKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Chusid, Mitchel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUCKER et al v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA RUCKER
Represented By: Jordan Russell Chusid
Represented By: Mitchel Chusid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE RUCKER
Represented By: Jordan Russell Chusid
Represented By: Mitchel Chusid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARTER RUCKER
Represented By: Jordan Russell Chusid
Represented By: Mitchel Chusid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd
Represented By: Spencer Burgess Price
Represented By: Carlos Javier Chardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forster's West Bay Resort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Shore Adventures
Represented By: Noah Daniel Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fosters West Bay Resort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?