YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC v. INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC, Kip Lamar Snell and Magna Charter, LLC
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC., YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., BOATS GROUP, LLC, PERMIRA ADVISERS LLC, YATCO, LLC, UNITED YACHT SALES, LLC, DENISON YACHT SALES, INC., DENISON NEW YACHTS, LLC, NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC, GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC, HMY YACHT SALES, INC., ALLIED MARINE, INC, MARINEMAX, INC., SHARON & JACK MALATICH, LLC, TOURNAMENT YACHT SALES, LLC, RJC YACHT SALES, INC., Denison Yachts International, LLC, International Yacht Corporation, MarineMax East, Inc., Rick Obey Yacht Sales LLC, Ocean Independence Yachts, LLC, OneWater Marine Inc., Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC, Permira Advisers Limited, Catamaran Sales, Inc, Northrop & Johnson Yacht Sales, LLC, Sunshine Cruising Yachts LLC and The Multihull Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv20805
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0015 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 119 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC (Kreitzer, Michael)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gregory J. Casas. #116 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #116 is GRANTED. Gregory J. Casas may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: casasg@gtlaw.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/25/2024. (sdu)
April 24, 2024 Filing 117 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip M. Soven on behalf of Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Attorney Phillip M. Soven added to party Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC(pty:dft). (Soven, Phillip)
April 24, 2024 Filing 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gregory J. Casas. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17475955 by Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Responses due by 5/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Gregory J. Casas, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Kreitzer, Michael)
April 24, 2024 Filing 115 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Mychael Mandel on behalf of Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Attorney Joshua Mychael Mandel added to party Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC(pty:dft). (Mandel, Joshua)
April 24, 2024 Filing 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Mamounas on behalf of Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Attorney Joseph Mamounas added to party Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC(pty:dft). (Mamounas, Joseph)
April 24, 2024 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Neil Kreitzer on behalf of Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC(pty:dft). (Kreitzer, Michael)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey B. Gittleman. #88 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #88 is GRANTED. Jeffrey B. Gittleman may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: jgittleman@pogustgoodhead.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William J. Leonard. #92 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #92 is GRANTED. William J. Leonard may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: william.leonard@obermayer.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/19/2024. (sdu)
April 19, 2024 Filing 111 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. YATCO, LLC served on 4/1/2024, response/answer due 4/22/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 110 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC served on 3/29/2024, response/answer due 4/19/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 109 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kip Lamar Snell. YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. waiver sent on 4/9/2024, response/answer due 6/10/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 108 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. UNITED YACHT SALES, LLC served on 3/27/2024, response/answer due 4/17/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 107 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. RJC YACHT SALES, INC. served on 3/28/2024, response/answer due 4/18/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 106 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. Rick Obey Yacht Sales LLC served on 4/1/2024, response/answer due 4/22/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 105 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. PERMIRA ADVISERS LLC served on 3/27/2024, response/answer due 4/17/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 104 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. OneWater Marine Inc. served on 3/27/2024, response/answer due 4/17/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 103 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. Ocean Independence Yachts, LLC served on 3/28/2024, response/answer due 4/18/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 102 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC served on 3/27/2024, response/answer due 4/17/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 101 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. MARINEMAX, INC. served on 3/27/2024, response/answer due 4/17/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 100 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. MarineMax East, Inc. served on 3/27/2024, response/answer due 4/17/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 99 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. International Yacht Corporation served on 3/28/2024, response/answer due 4/18/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 98 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC. served on 3/28/2024, response/answer due 4/18/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 97 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. HMY YACHT SALES, INC. served on 3/27/2024, response/answer due 4/17/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 96 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC served on 3/27/2024, response/answer due 4/17/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 95 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. Denison Yachts International, LLC served on 3/28/2024, response/answer due 4/18/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 94 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. BOATS GROUP, LLC served on 3/27/2024, response/answer due 4/17/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 19, 2024 Filing 93 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kip Lamar Snell. ALLIED MARINE, INC served on 3/28/2024, response/answer due 4/18/2024. (Dearman, Mark)
April 18, 2024 Filing 92 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William J. Leonard. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17460812 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 5/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 18, 2024 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Marie Heim on behalf of Denison Yachts International, LLC (Heim, Emily)
April 18, 2024 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Denison Yachts International, LLC (Heim, Emily)
April 18, 2024 Filing 89 (DOCKETED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Marie Heim on behalf of Denison Yachts International, LLC. Attorney Emily Marie Heim added to party Denison Yachts International, LLC(pty:dft). (Heim, Emily) Modified on text 4/19/2024 (scn).
April 17, 2024 Filing 88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey B. Gittleman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17456382 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 5/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 17, 2024 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory G. Olsen on behalf of Ocean Independence Yachts, LLC. Attorney Gregory G. Olsen added to party Ocean Independence Yachts, LLC(pty:dft). (Olsen, Gregory)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Roberta D. Liebenberg. #81 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #81 is GRANTED. Roberta D. Liebenberg may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: rliebenberg@finekaplan.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul Costa. #82 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #82 is GRANTED. Paul Costa may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: pcosta@finekaplan.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/15/2024. (sdu)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff Kip Lamar Snell's Unopposed Motion to Stay Defendant Rick Obey Yacht Sales LLC's Deadline to Respond to Complaint. #74 . Therein, Plaintiff Snell requests an indefinite stay of Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint because there is a different company with a similar name that may be the proper defendant in this action. Id. at 2. In the Court's Order consolidating cases, the Court terminated all deadlines to respond to the complaints and ordered the Parties to submit a joint scheduling report on or before May 31, 2024. See #40 at 4-5. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #74 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/15/2024. (sdu)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Adjourn the Deadline to Respond to Defendant Denison's Motion to Dismiss. #69 . Therein, Plaintiff Ya Mon Expeditions, LLC requests to adjourn the deadline to respond to Defendant Denisons Motion to Dismiss or extend the deadline for 60 days, which will allow the Parties time to determine the need for a consolidated complaint and discuss a proposed schedule per the Court's Order consolidating cases. Id. at 2. In response, Defendant essentially reiterates its arguments on why the pending Motion to Dismiss should be granted. See generally #73 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #69 is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff shall respond to the pending #34 Motion to Dismiss on or before June 11, 2024. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/15/2024. (sdu)
April 15, 2024 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by A. Thomas Connick, Jr on behalf of HMY YACHT SALES, INC.. Attorney A. Thomas Connick, Jr added to party HMY YACHT SALES, INC.(pty:dft). (Connick, A.)
April 14, 2024 Filing 82 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul Costa. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17445951 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 4/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 14, 2024 Filing 81 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Roberta Liebenberg. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # CFLSDC-17445950 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 4/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 12, 2024 Filing 80 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #34 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Adjourn the Deadline to Respond to Defendant Denison's Motion to Dismiss, or i filed by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. (Bucciero, Lea)
April 11, 2024 Filing 79 Summons Issued as to Catamaran Sales, Inc, Sunshine Cruising Yachts LLC, The Multihull Company, LLC. (scn)
April 11, 2024 Filing 78 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Magna Charter, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s)) (Love, Kevin)
April 10, 2024 Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DENISON YACHT SALES, INC. (Heim, Emily)
April 10, 2024 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DENISON NEW YACHTS, LLC (Heim, Emily)
April 9, 2024 Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIED MARINE, INC identifying Corporate Parent Ferretti S. p.A. for ALLIED MARINE, INC (Ryan, Matthew)
April 9, 2024 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION to Stay - Unopposed Motion to Stay Defendant Rick Obey Yacht Sales LLC's Deadline to Respond to Complaint - by Kip Lamar Snell. Responses due by 4/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davidson, Stuart)
April 8, 2024 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #34 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Adjourn the Deadline to Respond to Defendant Denison's Motion to Dismiss, or i filed by DENISON NEW YACHTS, LLC, DENISON YACHT SALES, INC.. Replies due by 4/15/2024. (Heim, Emily)
April 8, 2024 Filing 72 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney Amanda Romfh Jesteadt re #68 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. (cw)
April 8, 2024 Filing 71 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address information for attorney Amanda Romfh Jesteadt re #68 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. See the Court's website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information. (cw)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Scott Abeles. #64 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #64 is GRANTED. Scott Abeles may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: sabeles@carltonfields.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Anny M. Martin's Motion to Withdraw As Counsel. #67 . Therein, attorney Anny M. Martin requests to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Kip Lamar Snell. Id. at 1. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Withdraw #67 is GRANTED. Attorney Anny M. Martin is relieved of all further responsibilities related to this action. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to REMOVE Anny M. Martin as counsel of record for Kip Lamar Snell. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/8/2024. (sdu)
April 5, 2024 Filing 69 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #34 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Adjourn the Deadline to Respond to Defendant Denison's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Extend the Deadline to Respond by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. (Bucciero, Lea)
April 5, 2024 Filing 68 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Amanda Romfh Jesteadt (Jesteadt, Amanda)
April 5, 2024 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anny M. Martin for / by Kip Lamar Snell. Responses due by 4/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davidson, Stuart)
April 5, 2024 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Jesteadt, Amanda)
April 5, 2024 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC. (Foreman, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2024 Filing 64 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Scott Abeles. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17426947 by YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. Responses due by 4/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Scott Abeles, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jesteadt, Amanda)
April 5, 2024 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Romfh Jesteadt on behalf of YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. Attorney Amanda Romfh Jesteadt added to party YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.(pty:dft). (Jesteadt, Amanda)
April 5, 2024 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Jay Blechman on behalf of INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC.. Attorney William Jay Blechman added to party INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC.(pty:dft). (Blechman, William)
April 5, 2024 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B. Esau on behalf of YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. Attorney David B. Esau added to party YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.(pty:dft). (Esau, David)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anna M. Rathbun. #50 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #50 is GRANTED. Anna M. Rathbun may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: anna.rathbun@lw.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher J. Brown. #51 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #51 is GRANTED. Christopher J. Brown may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: chris.brown@lw.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lawrence E. Buterman. #52 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #52 is GRANTED. Lawrence E. Buterman may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: lawrence.buterman@lw.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael F. Brockmeyer. #53 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #53 is GRANTED. Michael F. Brockmeyer may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: mbrockmeyer@haugpartners.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jennifer B. Patterson. #54 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #54 is GRANTED. Jennifer B. Patterson may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: jpatterson@haugpartners.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey J. Corrigan. #57 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #57 is GRANTED. Jeffrey J. Corrigan may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: jcorrigan@srkattorneys.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey L. Spector. #58 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #58 is GRANTED. Jeffrey L. Spector may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: jspector@srkattorneys.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/5/2024. (sdu)
April 5, 2024 Filing 59 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the email for PHV attorney Brian J. Smith re #55 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name (pt)
April 4, 2024 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey Spector. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17424479 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 4, 2024 Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey Corrigan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17424478 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 4, 2024 Filing 56 Defendant's RESPONSE by TOURNAMENT YACHT SALES, LLC. (Warburton, Scott)
April 4, 2024 Filing 55 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Christina McGinley Paul (Paul, Christina)
April 4, 2024 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jennifer B. Patterson. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-17423939. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by ALLIED MARINE, INC. Responses due by 4/18/2024. (Ryan, Matthew)
April 4, 2024 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael F. Brockmeyer. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17423914 by ALLIED MARINE, INC. Attorney Matthew Kevin Ryan added to party ALLIED MARINE, INC(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/18/2024. (Ryan, Matthew)
April 4, 2024 Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lawrence E. Buterman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17422557 by BOATS GROUP, LLC, PERMIRA ADVISERS LLC, Permira Advisers Limited. Responses due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification L. Buterman, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Orders L. Buterman)(Burstyn, Sean)
April 4, 2024 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher J. Brown. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17422541 by BOATS GROUP, LLC, PERMIRA ADVISERS LLC, Permira Advisers Limited. Responses due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification C. Brown, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Orders C. Brown)(Burstyn, Sean)
April 4, 2024 Filing 50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anna M. Rathbun. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17422387 by BOATS GROUP, LLC, PERMIRA ADVISERS LLC, Permira Advisers Limited. Attorney Sean Alexander Burstyn added to party Permira Advisers Limited(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification A. Rathbun, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Orders A. Rathbun)(Burstyn, Sean)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Benjamin J. Eichel. #43 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #43 is GRANTED. Benjamin J. Eichel may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: beichel@bonizack.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua D. Snyder. #44 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #44 is GRANTED. Joshua D. Snyder may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: jsnyder@bonizack.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John E. Sindoni. #45 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #45 is GRANTED. John E. Sindoni may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: jsindoni@bonizack.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael J. Boni. #46 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #46 is GRANTED. Michael J. Boni may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: mboni@bonizack.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua B. Gray. #47 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #47 is GRANTED. Joshua B. Gray may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: jgray@knpa.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/4/2024. (sdu)
April 2, 2024 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Actions and for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Magna Charter, LLC. Replies due by 4/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Firm Biography, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 2, 2024 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua B. Gray. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17417043 by INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC.. Responses due by 4/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foreman, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2024 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael J. Boni. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17416918 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 2, 2024 Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John E. Sindoni. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17416900 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 2, 2024 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua D. Snyder. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17416851 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 2, 2024 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Benjamin J. Eichel. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17416794 by Magna Charter, LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Kevin)
April 2, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Todd Foreman on behalf of INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC.. Attorney Jeffrey Todd Foreman added to party INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC.(pty:dft). (Foreman, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2024 Filing 41 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED YACHT SALES, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BRB IV, LLC for UNITED YACHT SALES, LLC (Turnbull, W.)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part #37 Unopposed Motion to Adjourn or Extend Deadlines; granting #20 Motion to Consolidate Cases and deferring ruling on #20 Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (sdu)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher M. Brainard. #18 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #18 is GRANTED. Christopher M. Brainard may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: christopherbrainard@gmail.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael E. Martinez. #24 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #24 is GRANTED. Michael E. Martinez may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: michael.martinez@klgates.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian J. Smith. #25 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #25 is GRANTED. Brian J. Smith may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: brian.smith@klgates.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kenneth M. Kliebard. #26 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #26 is GRANTED. Kenneth M. Kliebard may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: kenneth.kliebard@morganlewis.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stacey Anne Mahoney. #27 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #27 is GRANTED. Stacey Anne Mahoney may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: stacey.mahoney@morganlewis.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William T. McEnroe. #28 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #28 is GRANTED. William T. McEnroe may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: william.mcenroe@morganlewis.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/1/2024. (sdu)
March 30, 2024 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Weinshall on behalf of YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC(pty:pla). (Weinshall, Matthew)
March 29, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC, MARINEMAX, INC., NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Certain Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Adjourn the Deadlines to Respond to the Complaint)(Paul, Christina)
March 29, 2024 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PERMIRA ADVISERS LLC identifying Corporate Parent Permira Advisers (London) Limited for PERMIRA ADVISERS LLC (Burstyn, Sean)
March 29, 2024 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOATS GROUP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Boats Group Holdings, Inc. for BOATS GROUP, LLC (Burstyn, Sean)
March 29, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DENISON NEW YACHTS, LLC, DENISON YACHT SALES, INC.. Responses due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Heim, Emily)
March 29, 2024 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GMI Holding Company for GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC (Paul, Christina)
March 29, 2024 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MarineMax, Inc. for NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC (Paul, Christina)
March 29, 2024 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARINEMAX, INC. (Paul, Christina)
March 29, 2024 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HMY YACHT SALES, INC. (Stern, Justin)
March 29, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin M. L. Stern on behalf of HMY YACHT SALES, INC. (Stern, Justin)
March 29, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William T. McEnroe. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17408993 by HMY YACHT SALES, INC.. Responses due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Justin)
March 29, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stacey Anne Mahoney. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17408980 by HMY YACHT SALES, INC.. Responses due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Justin)
March 29, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kenneth M. Kliebard. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17408929 by HMY YACHT SALES, INC.. Attorney Justin M. L. Stern added to party HMY YACHT SALES, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Justin)
March 29, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian J. Smith. Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17408278 by GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC, MARINEMAX, INC., NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC. Responses due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Brian J. Smith, Esq., #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Paul, Christina)
March 29, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael E. Martinez, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17408234 by GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC, MARINEMAX, INC., NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC. Responses due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Michael E. Martinez, Esq., #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Paul, Christina)
March 29, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina McGinley Paul on behalf of GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC, MARINEMAX, INC., NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC. Attorney Christina McGinley Paul added to party GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christina McGinley Paul added to party MARINEMAX, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Christina McGinley Paul added to party NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC(pty:dft). (Paul, Christina)
March 29, 2024 Filing 22 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Exhibit "B" and Proposed Order to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Related actions and for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Actions and for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B - Firm Resume, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bucciero, Lea)
March 28, 2024 Filing 21 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Actions and for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt A - Firm Resume) (Bucciero, Lea)
March 28, 2024 Filing 20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Actions and for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. Responses due by 4/11/2024. (Bucciero, Lea)
March 28, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Scott Turnbull on behalf of UNITED YACHT SALES, LLC. Attorney W. Scott Turnbull added to party UNITED YACHT SALES, LLC(pty:dft). (Turnbull, W.)
March 28, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher M. Brainard. with Certification per Rule 4(b)(1) Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17405330 by DENISON NEW YACHTS, LLC, DENISON YACHT SALES, INC.. Responses due by 4/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heim, Emily)
March 28, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Marie Heim on behalf of DENISON NEW YACHTS, LLC, DENISON YACHT SALES, INC.. Attorney Emily Marie Heim added to party DENISON NEW YACHTS, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Marie Heim added to party DENISON YACHT SALES, INC.(pty:dft). (Heim, Emily)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Salvatore C. Badala. #11 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #11 is GRANTED. Salvatore C. Badala may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: SBadala@Napolilaw.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Hunter J. Shkolnik. #12 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #12 is GRANTED. Hunter J. Shkolnik may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: Hunter@nsprlaw.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kenneth N. Ralston. #13 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #13 is GRANTED. Kenneth N. Ralston may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: ken.ralston@gknet.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin D. Neal. #14 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #14 is GRANTED. Kevin D. Neal may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: kevin.neal@gknet.com. PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William F. King. #15 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #15 is GRANTED. William F. King may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: bill.king@gknet.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/21/2024. (sdu)
March 20, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William F. King. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17383290 by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of William F. King, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bucciero, Lea)
March 20, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin D. Neal. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17383280 by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Kevin D. Neal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bucciero, Lea)
March 20, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kenneth N. Ralston. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17383018 by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Kenneth N. Ralston, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bucciero, Lea)
March 20, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Hunter J. Shkolnik. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17382312 by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Hunter J. Shkolnik, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bucciero, Lea)
March 20, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Salvatore C. Badala. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17381604 by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Salvatore C. Badala, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bucciero, Lea)
March 8, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (scn)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LISETTE M. REID. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid's discovery procedures. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/8/2024. (sdu)
March 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Yacht Broker's Association of America, Inc.) (Bucciero, Lea)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons for Yacht Broker's Association of America, Inc. will not be issued. Attorney's name and return address is not listed. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons with the corrected summons attached. (scn)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ALLIED MARINE, INC, BOATS GROUP, LLC, DENISON NEW YACHTS, LLC, DENISON YACHT SALES, INC., GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC, HMY YACHT SALES, INC., INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC., MARINEMAX, INC., NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC, PERMIRA ADVISERS LLC, RJC YACHT SALES, INC., SHARON & JACK MALATICH, LLC, TOURNAMENT YACHT SALES, LLC, UNITED YACHT SALES, LLC, YATCO, LLC. (scn)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons - International Yacht Broker's Association, Inc., #2 Summon(s) Summons - Yacht Broker's Association of America, Inc., #3 Summon(s) Summons - Boats Group, LLC, #4 Summon(s) Summons - Permira Advisers LLC, #5 Summon(s) Summons - Yatco, LLC, #6 Summon(s) Summons - United Yacht Sales, LLC, #7 Summon(s) Summons - Denison Yacht Sales, Inc., #8 Summon(s) Summons - Denison New Yachts, LLC, #9 Summon(s) Summons - Northrop & Johnson Yacht Ships, LLC, #10 Summon(s) Summons - Galati Yacht Sales, LLC, #11 Summon(s) Summons - HMY Yacht Sales, Inc, #12 Summon(s) Summons - Allied Marine, Inc., #13 Summon(s) Summons - MarineMax, Inc., #14 Summon(s) Summons - Sharon & Jack Malatich, LLC, #15 Summon(s) Summons - Tournament Yacht Sales, LLC, #16 Summon(s) Summons - RJC Yacht Sales, Inc.) (Bucciero, Lea)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. The parties shall seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing.... Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three (3) days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/4/2024. (sdu)
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kevin D. Neal, William F. King, Kenneth N. Ralston, Hunter J. Shkolnik, Salvatore C. Badala, mailing date March 1, 2024, (pt)
February 29, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17333733, filed by YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bucciero, Lea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC v. INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YA MON EXPEDITIONS, LLC
Represented By: Lea Pilar Bucciero
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kenneth N. Ralston
Represented By: Kevin D. Neal
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: William F. King
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kip Lamar Snell
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Lindsey Handley Taylor
Represented By: Anny Marie Martin
Represented By: Arthur L. Shingler, III
Represented By: Marc Aaron Wites
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Geller
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Thomas Bowen Rogers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magna Charter, LLC
Represented By: John E. Sindoni
Represented By: Benjamin J. Eichel
Represented By: Joshua D. Snyder
Represented By: Kevin Bruce Love
Represented By: Megan J. Talbot
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Corrigan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Gittleman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: Paul Costa
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg
Represented By: William J. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Foreman
Represented By: Joshua B. Gray
Represented By: William Jay Blechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YACHT BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Amanda Romfh Jesteadt
Represented By: David B. Esau
Represented By: Scott Abeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOATS GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Anna M. Rathbun
Represented By: Christopher J. Brown
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERMIRA ADVISERS LLC
Represented By: Anna M. Rathbun
Represented By: Christopher J. Brown
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YATCO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED YACHT SALES, LLC
Represented By: W. Scott Turnbull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISON YACHT SALES, INC.
Represented By: Christopher M. Brainard
Represented By: Emily Marie Heim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISON NEW YACHTS, LLC
Represented By: Emily Marie Heim
Represented By: Christopher M. Brainard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHROP & JOHNSON YACHT SHIPS, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Martinez
Represented By: Christina McGinley Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GALATI YACHT SALES, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Martinez
Represented By: Christina McGinley Paul
Represented By: Brian J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMY YACHT SALES, INC.
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Represented By: William T. McEnroe
Represented By: A. Thomas Connick, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Kliebard
Represented By: Justin M. L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED MARINE, INC
Represented By: Michael F. Brockmeyer
Represented By: Matthew Kevin Ryan
Represented By: Jennifer Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINEMAX, INC.
Represented By: Christina McGinley Paul
Represented By: Michael E. Martinez
Represented By: Brian J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON & JACK MALATICH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOURNAMENT YACHT SALES, LLC
Represented By: Scott Stevens Warburton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJC YACHT SALES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denison Yachts International, LLC
Represented By: Emily Marie Heim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Yacht Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MarineMax East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Obey Yacht Sales LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Independence Yachts, LLC
Represented By: Gregory G. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWater Marine Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC
Represented By: Gregory J. Casas
Represented By: Joseph Mamounas
Represented By: Joshua Mychael Mandel
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Represented By: Phillip M. Soven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Permira Advisers Limited
Represented By: Anna M. Rathbun
Represented By: Christopher J. Brown
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catamaran Sales, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop & Johnson Yacht Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Cruising Yachts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Multihull Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?