Aliko v. Tai et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Aliko
Defendant: Bill Tai, Asher Genoot, Alexia Hefti, Joseph Flinn, Mayo A. Shattuck, III, Stanley O'Neal, Amy Wilkinson, Rick Rickertsen, Jamie Leverton, Shenif Visram, Hut 8 Corp. and Mike Ho
Case Number: 1:2024cv20890
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David Seymour Leibowitz
Referring Judge: David S Leibowitz
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0078 Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Gregory M. Egleston re #14 Plaintiff's MOTION and Memorandum of Law to Lift Stay of Action, Consolidate Derivative Actions, and Appoint Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel by Wesley Aliko (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint filed in In Re Hut 8 Securities Litigation, Case No. 1:24-cv-00904 (S.D.N.Y.)., #2 Exhibit B - Complaint filed in Aliko v. Tai, et al., Case No. 1:24-cv-20890-DSL (S.D. Fla.)., #3 Exhibit C - Complaint filed in Medney v. Tai, et al., Case No. 1:24-cv-21482-DSL (S.D. Fla.)., #4 Exhibit D - Complaint filed in Jiang v. Leverton, et al., 1:24-cv-21591-DSL (S.D. Fla.)., #5 Exhibit E - firm resume of Gainey McKenna & Egleston, #6 Exhibit F - firm resume of the Rosen Law Firm, P.A., #7 Exhibit G - firm resume of Eggnatz | Pascucci)(Eggnatz, Joshua)
May 3, 2024 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION and Memorandum of Law to Lift Stay of Action, Consolidate Derivative Actions, and Appoint Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel by Wesley Aliko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eggnatz, Joshua)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Gregory M. Egleston. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/24/2024. (sm00)
April 23, 2024 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gregory M. Egleston. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17471568 by Wesley Aliko. Responses due by 5/7/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eggnatz, Joshua)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows- The Joint Motion to Stay [ECF No. 9] is GRANTED IN PART. This case is STAYED pending the resolution of a motion to dismiss in Mayiras v. Hut 8 Corp., et al., No. 1:24-cv-00904-VM (S.D.N.Y.). The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY close this case and all pending motions are denied without prejudice to being re-filed once the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
April 12, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement / NOMINAL DEFENDANT HUT 8 CORP.'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hut 8 Corp. identifying Corporate Parent no corporate parent for Hut 8 Corp. (Holecek, Michael)
April 1, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION / JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO STAY DERIVATIVE ACTION by Joseph Flinn, Asher Genoot, Alexia Hefti, Mike Ho, Hut 8 Corp., Jamie Leverton, Stanley O'Neal, Rick Rickertsen, Mayo A. Shattuck, III, Bill Tai, Shenif Visram, Amy Wilkinson (Holecek, Michael)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
March 14, 2024 Filing 6 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Verification by Wesley Aliko re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Verification of Plaintiff to the Complaint) (Eggnatz, Joshua)
March 13, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Wesley Aliko. Hut 8 Corp. served on 3/12/2024, response/answer due 4/2/2024. (Eggnatz, Joshua)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hut 8 Corp.. (amb) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/8/2024) (amb).
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Wesley Aliko re #1 Complaint, filed by Wesley Aliko (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) as to nominal defendant, Hut 8 Corp.) (Eggnatz, Joshua)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David Seymour Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Flinn, Asher Genoot, Alexia Hefti, Mike Ho, Hut 8 Corp., Jamie Leverton, Stanley O'Neal, Rick Rickertsen, Mayo A. Shattuck, III, Bill Tai, Shenif Visram, Amy Wilkinson. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17348779, filed by Wesley Aliko. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eggnatz, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aliko v. Tai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Aliko
Represented By: Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Represented By: Michael James Pascucci
Represented By: Gregory M. Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asher Genoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexia Hefti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo A. Shattuck, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Rickertsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Leverton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenif Visram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hut 8 Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?