Portes et al v. City of Doral et al
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Portes and Romina Portes
Defendant: City of Doral, Jean Valez, Regions Security Services, Inc., Ariel Gonzalez, Javier Sarmiento and Hakime St. Cyr
Case Number: 1:2024cv24652
Filed: November 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Juan Jose Portes. Replies due by 1/30/2025. (ebz)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Mediator Dominic Brandy. Mediation Hearing set for 8/5/2025 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/23/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's Request for the Court to Appoint Mediator, ECF No. #25 . The parties filed a Joint Notice of Selection of Mediator and Notice of Scheduled Mediation. See ECF No. #26 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ap01)
January 23, 2025 Filing 26 NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Dominic Brandy selected. Filed/Added by Dominic L. Brandy. Mediation Hearing set for August 5, 2025 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Railey, Jonathan)
January 16, 2025 Filing 25 Plaintiff's MOTION / NOTICE of Request for Court Ordered Mediation and Appoint Mediator by Juan Jose Portes (ar24) Modified to convert to motion on 1/21/2025 (ar24).
January 15, 2025 Filing 24 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Regions Security Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Striking Punitive Damages, #2 Exhibit Regions' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Power of Attorney, #5 Exhibit Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Griffis, Kevin)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Select Mediator and Schedule Mediation, ECF No. #22 . The parties shall file the joint notice of selection of a mediator and to schedule mediation on or before January 21, 2025. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ap01)
January 13, 2025 Filing 22 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to select a mediator and schedule mediation (all defendants) re #18 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by City of Doral, Ariel Gonzalez, Javier Sarmiento, Hakime St. Cyr, Jean Valez. Responses due by 1/27/2025. (Railey, Jonathan)
January 6, 2025 Filing 21 Plaintiff's Certificate of Compliance with Initial Disclosures by Juan Jose Portes, Romina Portes. (ar24)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 12/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 7/23/2025 11:30 AM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 12/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
December 30, 2024 Per DE #20 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ( Joint Discovery Status Report due by 7/16/2025.), Set/Reset Hearings Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 7/23/2025 11:30 AM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein. (ar24) Modified on 1/2/2025 (ar24).
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2025, Discovery due by 9/16/2025, Fact Discovery due by 9/16/2025, Expert Discovery due by 9/16/2025, Joinder of Parties due by 2/21/2025, Mediation Deadline 9/30/2025, In Limine Motions due by 12/29/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 10/8/2025, Motions due by 10/8/2025, Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/29/2025, Jury Trial set for 1/12/2026 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 1/6/2026 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 9/30/2025.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 20, 2024 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties - NONE disclosed by Juan Jose Portes, Romina Portes (ar24)
December 20, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE Of Filing Cover Sheet for Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties and Attachments by Juan Jose Portes, Romina Portes (ar24)
December 20, 2024 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO #11 DEFENDANTS'REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONTO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Juan Jose Portes, Romina Portes. (ar24)
December 18, 2024 Filing 14 First Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Security Services, Inc. (Griffis, Kevin)
December 18, 2024 Filing 13 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by City of Doral, Ariel Gonzalez, Javier Sarmiento, Hakime St. Cyr, Jean Valez (Stearns, Christopher)
December 18, 2024 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by City of Doral, Ariel Gonzalez, Javier Sarmiento, Hakime St. Cyr, Jean Valez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Railey, Jonathan)
December 16, 2024 Filing 11 DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ariel Gonzalez, Javier Sarmiento, Hakime St. Cyr, Jean Valez. (Railey, Jonathan) Modified text on 12/16/2024 (ebz).
December 10, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Juan Jose Portes. Replies due by 12/17/2024. (ar24)
December 10, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Doral, Ariel Gonzalez, Javier Sarmiento, Hakime St. Cyr, Jean Valez. Replies due by 12/17/2024. (Railey, Jonathan)
December 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET by City of Doral, Ariel Gonzalez, Javier Sarmiento, Hakime St. Cyr, Jean Valez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket Sheet) (Stearns, Christopher)
December 4, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ariel Gonzalez, Javier Sarmiento, Hakime St. Cyr, Jean Valez. Responses due by 12/18/2024. (Stearns, Christopher)
December 3, 2024 Filing 6 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Juan Jose Portes to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: rominaportes@gmail.com (ar24)
December 3, 2024 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by Juan Jose Portes, Romina Portes. (ar24)
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/18/2024 Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
November 27, 2024 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kevin L. Griffis, mailing date November 27, 2024 (nwn)
November 26, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
November 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18013524, filed by Ariel Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 State Court Pleadings)(Stearns, Christopher) Answer and Motion to Dismiss filed (see Exh 3). Modified on 11/27/2024 (ar24).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portes et al v. City of Doral et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Doral
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Railey
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Valez
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Railey
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Security Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Gabriel Waas
Represented By: Kevin L. Griffis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariel Gonzalez
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Railey
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Sarmiento
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Railey
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hakime St. Cyr
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Railey
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Portes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romina Portes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?