Gudger v. Centene Management Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jody Gudger, Rhonda King, Judith Carter, Nikia Ford, Karel Fernandez, Gregory Garofolo, Deborah Swinford, Debora Butler, Rebecca Sincere, Michelle McLean, Cecilia Ernsting, Dafina Muniz, Deborah DeVries, Idalis Rodriguez Quinones, Robin Semwayo, Ann Viens, Bernadette Brauer, Kate Scheurich, Elaura Suazo, Stephanie Mertens, Janice Ann Ross, Felicia McDuffie, Shanita Hunter, DJiny Brutus, Lezlee Powell, Mitzi Bryant, Yolanda Blocker, Nakia McNeil, Romona Black-Smith, Sylma Ocasio- Peterson, Robin Callahan, Susan Walker, Gisella Ubillus, Monta Yava Casan, Tiffany Noel, Shannon Elaam, Tomeka Givhan, Meliscia Jackson, Celeste Busbee, DeLitta George, Ariel Graham, Monica Hernandez, Michelle Thompson, Yasheka Gaddy-Walker, Carmen Carrasquillo, Wendy Shanahan, Carla Peterson, Courtney Crawford, Larson Carlie, Lynn Beksha, Brittany Beardsley, Chaitra McNair, Theresa Martinez, Yanick Destin, Audrey Ross, Dedra McKinney, Angela Carrington, Carolyn Gillis, Cicley Roberts, Natasha Washinton, Vera Leisure, Crystal Freeman, Sherrye Hester Whittet, Shannon Michaud, Melissa Benitez, Elizabeth Wigle, Ebony Holley, Brian Hill, Tineka Wilson, Tameka Dickerson-Glenn, Shirley Simeone, Wallys Maria, Yvar Belotte, Cynthia Russell Echeverria, Amantha Hill, Anquanette Jackson, Fabienne Vendrys, Amy Howell, LaShawn J Parham Mobley, Natalee Wright, Marinelza Romero and Griselle Solorzano
Defendant: Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc. and Centene Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv14281
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Pierce Office
County: St. Lucie (Office: Ft Pierce)
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Dismissing Case with prejudice. The parties' Joint Motion and Brief in Support of Approval of Settlement is GRANTED. The parties' Settlement Agreement is APPROVED. This case, including all individual and collective claims presented thereby, is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 17, 2020 Filing 158 Joint MOTION for Settlement by Jody Gudger. Responses due by 5/1/2020 (Storch, Noah)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER ON MEDIATOR'S REPORT AND DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. The Clerk is DIRECTED So DENY ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for statistical purposes only. This shall not affect the substantive rights of the parties. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 156 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Marlene Quintana. Disposition: Settled in full.(Quintana, Marlene)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (wh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 154 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Stay for 90 days While Parties Enage in Mediation by Centene Management Company, LLC. Responses due by 6/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
May 17, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Monica Hernandez. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Monica Hernandez(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Monica Hernandez) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Shanita Hunter. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Shanita Hunter(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Shanita Hunter) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Wendy Shanahan. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Wendy Shanahan(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Wendy Shanahan) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Wallys Maria. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Wallys Maria(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Wallys Maria) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Susan Walker. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Susan Walker(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Susan Walker) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Fabienne Vendrys. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Fabienne Vendrys(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Fabienne Vendrys) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Tineka Wilson. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Tineka Wilson(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Tineka Wilson) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Amy Howell. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Amy Howell(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Amy Howell) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Yanick Destin. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Yanick Destin(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Yanick Destin) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Ebony Holley. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Ebony Holley(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Ebony Holley) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Judith Carter. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Judith Carter(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Judith Carter) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Lynn Beksha. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Lynn Beksha(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Lynn Beksha) (Storch, Noah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Romona Black-Smith. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Romona Black-Smith(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Romona Black-Smith) (Storch, Noah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Cicley Roberts. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Cicley Roberts(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Cicley Roberts) (Storch, Noah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Deborah Swinford. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Deborah Swinford(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Deborah Swinford) (Storch, Noah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Chaitra McNair. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Chaitra McNair(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Chaitra McNair) (Storch, Noah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Yvar Belotte. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Yvar Belotte(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Yvar Belotte) (Storch, Noah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Bernadette Brauer. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Bernadette Brauer(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Bernadette Brauer) (Storch, Noah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Dafina Muniz. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Dafina Muniz(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Dafina Muniz) (Storch, Noah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Tiffany Noel. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Tiffany Noel(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Tiffany Noel) (Storch, Noah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Audrey Ross. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Audrey Ross(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Audrey Ross) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Mitzi Bryant. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Mitzi Bryant(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Mitzi Bryant) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of DJiny Brutus. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party DJiny Brutus(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff DJiny Brutus) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Robin Callahan. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Robin Callahan(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Robin Callahan) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Stephanie Mertens. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Stephanie Mertens(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Stephanie Mertens) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Angela Carrington. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Angela Carrington(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Angela Carrington) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of DeLitta George. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party DeLitta George(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff DeLitta George) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Meliscia Jackson. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Meliscia Jackson(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Meliscia Jackson) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Rebecca Sincere. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Rebecca Sincere(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Rebecca Sincere) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Robin Semwayo. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Robin Semwayo(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Robin Semwayo) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Shannon Elaam. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Shannon Elaam(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Shannon Elaam) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Yasheka Gaddy-Walker. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Yasheka Gaddy-Walker(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Yasheka Gaddy-Walker) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Cecilia Ernsting. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Cecilia Ernsting(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Cecilia Ernsting) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Deborah DeVries. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Deborah DeVries(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Deborah DeVries) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Kate Scheurich. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Kate Scheurich(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Kate Scheurich) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Nakia McNeil. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Nakia McNeil(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Nakia McNeil) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Nikia Ford. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Nikia Ford(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Nikia Ford) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Shirley Simeone. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Shirley Simeone(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Shirley Simeone) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Tameka Dickerson-Glenn. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Tameka Dickerson-Glenn(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Tameka Dickerson-Glenn) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Anquanette Jackson. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Anquanette Jackson(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Anquanette Jackson) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Brian Hill. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Brian Hill(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Brian Hill) (Storch, Noah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Natasha Washinton. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Natasha Washinton(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Natasha Washington) (Storch, Noah)
May 2, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of LaShawn J Parham Mobley. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party LaShawn J Parham Mobley(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff LaShawn J Mobley Parham) (Storch, Noah)
May 2, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Debora Butler. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Debora Butler(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Debora Butler) (Storch, Noah)
May 2, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Dedra McKinney. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Dedra McKinney(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Dedra McKinney) (Storch, Noah)
May 2, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Elizabeth Wigle. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Elizabeth Wigle(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Elizabeth Wigle) (Storch, Noah)
May 1, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Carolyn Gillis. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Carolyn Gillis(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Carolyn Gillis) (Storch, Noah)
May 1, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Amantha Hill. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Amantha Hill(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Amantha Hill) (Storch, Noah)
May 1, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Vera Leisure. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Vera Leisure(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Vera Leisure) (Storch, Noah)
May 1, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Sherrye Hester Whittet. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Sherrye Hester Whittet(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Sherrye Hester Whittet) (Storch, Noah)
April 29, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Marinelza Romero. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Marinelza Romero(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Marinelza Romero) (Storch, Noah)
April 29, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Felicia McDuffie. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Felicia McDuffie(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Felicia McDuffie) (Storch, Noah)
April 29, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Carmen Carrasquillo. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Carmen Carrasquillo(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Carmen Carrasquillo) (Storch, Noah)
April 29, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Brittany Beardsley. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Brittany Beardsley(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Brittany Beardsley) (Storch, Noah)
April 29, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Janice Ann Ross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Janice Ann Ross) (Storch, Noah)
April 29, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Striking #93 Notice of Consent to Join, filed by Janice Ann Ross by Janice Ann Ross (Storch, Noah)
April 29, 2019 Filing 97 Clerks Notice to Filer re #93 Notice of Consent to Join,. Document Unreadable/Wrong Image Uploaded; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then refile the correct document. (ls)
April 26, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Idalis Rodriguez Quinones. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Idalis Rodriguez Quinones(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Idalis Rodriguez Quinones) (Storch, Noah)
April 26, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Ann Viens. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Ann Viens(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Ann Viens) (Storch, Noah)
April 26, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Karel Fernandez. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Karel Fernandez(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Karel Fernandez) (Storch, Noah)
April 26, 2019 Filing 93 **Stricken**NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Janice Ann Ross. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Janice Ann Ross(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Janice Ann Ross) (Storch, Noah) Text Modified on 4/30/2019 per DE #98 Notice Striking(ail).
April 26, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Theresa Martinez. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Theresa Martinez(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Theresa Martinez) (Storch, Noah)
April 26, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Lezlee Powell. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Lezlee Powell(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Lezlee Powell) (Storch, Noah)
April 26, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Melissa Benitez. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Melissa Benitez(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Melissa Benitez) (Storch, Noah)
April 26, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Natalee Wright. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Natalee Wright(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Natalee Wright) (Storch, Noah)
April 25, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Elaura Suazo. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Elaura Suazo(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Elaura Suazo) (Storch, Noah)
April 25, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Carla Peterson. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Carla Peterson(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Carla Peterson) (Storch, Noah)
April 25, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Shannon Michaud. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Shannon Michaud(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Shannon Michaud) (Storch, Noah)
April 25, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Monta Yava Casan. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Monta Yava Casan(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Monta Yava Cason, Jr.) (Storch, Noah)
April 24, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Gisella Ubillus. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Gisella Ubillus(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Gisella Ubillus) (Storch, Noah)
April 24, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Griselle Solorzano. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Griselle Solorzano(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Griselle Solorzano) (Storch, Noah)
April 24, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Ariel Graham. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Ariel Graham(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Ariel Graham) (Storch, Noah)
April 23, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Courtney Crawford. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Courtney Crawford(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Courtney Crawford) (Storch, Noah)
April 23, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Michelle Thompson. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Michelle Thompson(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Michelle Thompson) (Storch, Noah)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER Terminating Calendar Call and Trial Date in this action, in light of this Court's Order 79 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/8/2019. (wh)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #76 the parties' Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time and Continuance of Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines. The CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE are hereby CANCELLED. Moreover, the pre-trial deadlines set forth in this Court's Order Revising Scheduling Order #75 , beginning with the discovery deadline, are hereby STAYED. The parties shall file a joint' notice with the Court within 14 days after the close of the opt-in period for the conditionally-certified FLSA collective action setting forth new, proposed pretrial deadlines, beginning with the discovery deadline, and a proposed trial date. At that time, the Court will issue a revised scheduling order. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/8/2019. (ean)
March 6, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Orders by Centene Management Company, LLC (Reed, Aaron)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ON MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENLARGEMENT OF OPT-IN PERIOD. ORDER granting in part and denying in part #66 Motion for Clarification; denying #66 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification and for an Enlargement of Opt-ln Period (ECF No. #66 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as set forth herein. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Clarification with respect to clarifying appropriate portions of the R&R, as set forth herein. To the extent the Court has found that Plaintiffs' requests for clarifications are objections to the R&R, the Court DENIES said requests for clarifications as untimely objections to the R&R, as set forth herein. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement Of Opt-ln Period, as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time and Continuance of Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines re #23 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by Centene Management Company, LLC. Responses due by 3/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REVISING SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 6/24/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jose E. Martinez. Calendar Call set for 6/20/2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Jose E. Martinez. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 17, 2018 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION for clarification #63 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Report and Recommendations MOTION for Extension of Time Of the Opt-In/Notice Period re #63 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Report and Recommendations, #57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #45 Defendant's MOTION to Strik filed by Yolanda Blocker, Celeste Busbee, Larson Carlie, Crystal Freeman, Gregory Garofolo, Tomeka Givhan, Jody Gudger, Rhonda King, Michelle McLean, Sylma Ocasio- Peterson, Cynthia Russell Echeverria. (Storch, Noah)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #72 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for a One Day Extension of Time to File a Reply to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification and for an Enlargement of Opt-In Period. Plaintiffs' Reply is due on or before September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/14/2018. (ean)
September 14, 2018 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification, up to and including, September 17, 2018 re 71 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, by Jody Gudger. Responses due by 9/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Storch, Noah)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #70 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification and for an Enlargement of Opt-In Period. Plaintiffs may file a reply in further support of their Motion for Clarification #66 on or before September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/7/2018. (ean)
September 7, 2018 Filing 70 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #69 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Jody Gudger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Storch, Noah)
August 31, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION for clarification #63 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Report and Recommendations MOTION for Extension of Time Of the Opt-In/Notice Period re #63 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Report and Recommendations, #57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #45 Defendant's MOTION to Strik and for an Enlargement of Opt-In Period filed by Centene Management Company, LLC. Replies due by 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Breanne Martell, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
August 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadline as to #66 MOTION for clarification. Responses due by 8/31/2018. SEE DE 68 ORDER (ail)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #67 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification #66 on or before August 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/23/2018. (ean)
August 23, 2018 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #66 MOTION for clarification #63 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Report and Recommendations MOTION for Extension of Time Of the Opt-In/Notice Period re #63 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Report and Recommendations, #57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #45 Defendant's MOTION to Strik DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLIANTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
August 13, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for clarification #63 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Report and Recommendations , MOTION for Extension of Time Of the Opt-In/Notice Period re #63 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Report and Recommendations, #57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #45 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #40 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Sumitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Conditionally Certify Col by Yolanda Blocker, Celeste Busbee, Larson Carlie, Crystal Freeman, Gregory Garofolo, Tomeka Givhan, Jody Gudger, Rhonda King, Michelle McLean, Sylma Ocasio- Peterson, Cynthia Russell Echeverria. Responses due by 8/27/2018 (Storch, Noah)
August 7, 2018 Filing 65 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jody Gudger, Rhonda King (Storch, Noah)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 7/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (ail)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Adopting #57 Report and Recommendations;granting #40 Motion to Certify Class; denying #45 Motion to Strike Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ail)
July 20, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE by Jody Gudger of Non Objection to Report and Recommendation (Storch, Noah)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting re #58 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Protective Order and FRE 502(E) Clawback Agreement filed by Centene Management Company, LLC Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/25/2018. (dj)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER and FRE 502(E) CLAWBACK AGREEMENT Motions terminated: #58 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Protective Order and FRE 502(E) Clawback Agreement filed by Centene Management Company, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/25/2018. (dj)
May 24, 2018 Filing 59 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #52 Order on Motion to Certify Class. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. (dgj)
May 24, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Protective Order and FRE 502(E) Clawback Agreement by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Reed, Aaron)
May 22, 2018 Filing 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #45 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #40 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Sumitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice t filed by Centene Management Company, LLC, #40 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Rhonda King, Jody Gudger Recommending that Docket Entry #40 be GRANTED and Docket Entry #45 be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 6/5/2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/21/2018. (ail)
April 30, 2018 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #40 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Sumitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice t Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action & Facilitate Notice to Potential Class Members filed by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Reed, Aaron)
April 23, 2018 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Yolanda Blocker, Celeste Busbee, Larson Carlie, Crystal Freeman, Gregory Garofolo, Tomeka Givhan, Jody Gudger, Rhonda King, Michelle McLean, Sylma Ocasio- Peterson, Cynthia Russell Echeverria. (Storch, Noah)
April 23, 2018 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #40 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Sumitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice t filed by Yolanda Blocker, Celeste Busbee, Larson Carlie, Crystal Freeman, Gregory Garofolo, Tomeka Givhan, Jody Gudger, Rhonda King, Michelle McLean, Sylma Ocasio- Peterson, Cynthia Russell Echeverria. Replies due by 4/30/2018. (Storch, Noah)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REFERRING #45 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #40 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Sumitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice t filed by Centene Management Company, LLC. Motions referred to Judge Shaniek M. Maynard Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/19/2018. (ail)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER STAYING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES granting in part re #41 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/19/2018. (ail) Modified text and linkage on 5/24/2018 (dgj).
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #49 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. Plaintiffs shall file a Reply to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification on or before April 23, 2018. This Order shall affect no other deadlines in this action. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/13/2018. (ean)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #48 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification on or before April 23, 2018. This Order shall affect no other deadlines in this action. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/13/2018. (ean)
April 13, 2018 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #42 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Jody Gudger, Rhonda King. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Storch, Noah)
April 12, 2018 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #45 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #40 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Sumitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice t by Jody Gudger, Rhonda King. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Storch, Noah)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #46 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. Plaintiffs shall file a Reply on or before April 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/4/2018. (ean)
April 4, 2018 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #42 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Jody Gudger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Storch, Noah) Modified Text on 4/4/2018 (ls).
March 29, 2018 Filing 45 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #40 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Sumitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice to Potential Class Members by Centene Management Company, LLC. Responses due by 4/12/2018 (Reed, Aaron)
March 29, 2018 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Certify Class Declaration of Roni Zaletel in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Reed, Aaron)
March 29, 2018 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Certify Class Declaration of Breanne Sheetz Martell in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Reed, Aaron)
March 29, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Centene Management Company, LLC. Replies due by 4/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
March 16, 2018 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date and PreTrial Deadlines re #23 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by Centene Management Company, LLC. Responses due by 3/30/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
March 15, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Certify Class by Jody Gudger, Rhonda King. Responses due by 3/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Storch, Noah)
March 15, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Cynthia Russell Echeverria. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Cynthia Russell Echeverria(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join) (Storch, Noah)
March 15, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Celeste Busbee. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Celeste Busbee(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join) (Storch, Noah)
March 2, 2018 Filing 37 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Reed, Aaron)
February 20, 2018 Filing 36 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Jody Gudger.(Storch, Noah)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall refile the Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry on or before February 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/16/2018. (ean)
February 15, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Larson Carlie. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Larson Carlie(pty:pla). (Storch, Noah)
January 11, 2018 Filing 33 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jody Gudger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Complaint)(Storch, Noah)
October 31, 2017 Filing 32 Defendant's RESPONSE to #28 Statement Defendants' Response to OPT-IN Plaintiff Crystal Freeman's Statement of Claim by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Reed, Aaron)
October 31, 2017 Filing 31 Defendant's RESPONSE to #27 Statement Defendants' Response to OPT-IN Plaintiff Yolanda Blocker's Statement of Claim by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Reed, Aaron)
October 31, 2017 Filing 30 Defendant's RESPONSE to #29 Statement Defendants' Response to OPT-IN Plaintiff Sylma Ocasio Peterson's Statement of Claim by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Reed, Aaron)
October 16, 2017 Filing 29 Statement of: Claim for Opt-In Plaintiff Sylma Ocasio Peterson by Sylma Ocasio- Peterson re #5 Notice of Court Practice (Storch, Noah)
October 16, 2017 Filing 28 Statement of: Claim for Opt-In Plaintiff Crystal Freeman by Crystal Freeman re #5 Notice of Court Practice (Storch, Noah)
October 16, 2017 Filing 27 Statement of: Claim for Opt-In Plaintiff Yolanda Blocker by Yolanda Blocker re #5 Notice of Court Practice (Storch, Noah)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Douglas E. Smith; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Breanne Sheetz Martell. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/12/2017. (kpe)
October 12, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Tomeka Givhan. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Tomeka Givhan(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join) (Storch, Noah)
October 12, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Michelle McLean. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Michelle McLean(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join) (Storch, Noah)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/23/2018 09:30 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 7/19/2018 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2018., Discovery due by 5/9/2018., Expert Discovery due by 5/9/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2018., Mediation Deadline 6/13/2018., In Limine Motions due by 6/25/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2018., Motions due by 6/25/2018., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/3/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 6/13/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/6/2017. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 4, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Gregory Garofolo. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Gregory Garofolo(pty:pla). (Storch, Noah)
October 4, 2017 Filing 21 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Centene Management Company, LLC, Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reed, Aaron)
October 3, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Rhonda King. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Rhonda King(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join) (Storch, Noah)
September 25, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Crystal Freeman. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Crystal Freeman(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join) (Storch, Noah)
September 25, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Sylma Ocasio- Peterson. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Sylma Ocasio- Peterson(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join) (Storch, Noah)
September 25, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of Yolanda Blocker. Attorney Noah E Storch added to party Yolanda Blocker(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join) (Storch, Noah)
September 20, 2017 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Breanne Sheetz Martell. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10046532 by Centene Management Company, LLC, Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc.. Responses due by 10/4/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Certification of Breanne Sheetz Martell and 2. Consent to designation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
September 20, 2017 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Douglas E. Smith. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10046319 by Centene Management Company, LLC, Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc.. Responses due by 10/4/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Certification of Douglas E. Smith and 2. Consent to Designation, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
September 14, 2017 Filing 14 Defendant's RESPONSE to #5 Notice of Court Practice, #11 Statement Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim by Centene Management Company, LLC, Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
September 14, 2017 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centene Management Company, LLC, Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc. (Reed, Aaron)
September 14, 2017 Filing 12 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Centene Management Company, LLC, Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
August 30, 2017 Filing 11 Statement of: Claim by Jody Gudger re #5 Notice of Court Practice (Storch, Noah)
August 29, 2017 Filing 10 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Jody Gudger (Storch, Noah)
August 29, 2017 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jody Gudger (Storch, Noah)
August 24, 2017 Reset Deadlines per 8 Order: Centene Management Company, LLC answer/response due 9/14/2017; Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc. answer/response due 9/14/2017. -Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/4/2017 (asl)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may have an extension of time, through and including September 14, 2017, to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint, and the parties may have an extension of time, through and including October 4, 2017, to conduct a 26(f) conference and file a Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/24/2017. (rkn)
August 24, 2017 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, #6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report ( Responses due by 9/7/2017) by Centene Management Company, LLC, Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc.. Attorney Aaron Jarett Reed added to party Centene Management Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Jarett Reed added to party Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc. (pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reed, Aaron)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/11/2017. (dq)
August 11, 2017 Filing 5 Notice of Court Practice in FLSA Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/10/2017. (kpe)
August 7, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jody Gudger of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Become Party Plaintiff) (Celler, Richard)
August 7, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Centene Management Company, LLC, Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc. (pes)
August 7, 2017 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pes)
August 7, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centene Management Company, LLC, Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9950789, filed by Jody Gudger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Celler, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gudger v. Centene Management Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine State Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Smith
Represented By: Breanne Sheetz Martell
Represented By: Aaron Jarett Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Smith
Represented By: Breanne Sheetz Martell
Represented By: Aaron Jarett Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Gudger
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Represented By: Richard Bernard Celler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda King
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Carter
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikia Ford
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karel Fernandez
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Garofolo
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Swinford
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Butler
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Sincere
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle McLean
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Ernsting
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dafina Muniz
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah DeVries
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idalis Rodriguez Quinones
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Semwayo
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Viens
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Brauer
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Scheurich
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaura Suazo
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Mertens
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Ann Ross
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia McDuffie
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanita Hunter
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJiny Brutus
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lezlee Powell
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitzi Bryant
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Blocker
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakia McNeil
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romona Black-Smith
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylma Ocasio- Peterson
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Callahan
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Walker
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisella Ubillus
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monta Yava Casan
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Noel
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Elaam
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeka Givhan
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meliscia Jackson
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Busbee
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeLitta George
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Graham
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Hernandez
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Thompson
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasheka Gaddy-Walker
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Carrasquillo
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Shanahan
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Peterson
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Crawford
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larson Carlie
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Beksha
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Beardsley
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaitra McNair
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Martinez
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanick Destin
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Ross
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedra McKinney
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Carrington
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Gillis
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cicley Roberts
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Washinton
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Leisure
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Freeman
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrye Hester Whittet
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Michaud
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Benitez
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wigle
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Holley
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hill
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tineka Wilson
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameka Dickerson-Glenn
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Simeone
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallys Maria
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvar Belotte
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Russell Echeverria
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amantha Hill
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anquanette Jackson
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabienne Vendrys
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Howell
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShawn J Parham Mobley
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalee Wright
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marinelza Romero
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Griselle Solorzano
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?