McWilliams et al v. Novartis AG et al
Plaintiff: Dennis McWilliams and Lori McWilliams
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Novartis AG
Case Number: 2:2017cv14302
Filed: August 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Pierce Office
County: St. Lucie (Office: Ft Pierce)
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 123 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams (Aylstock, Bryan)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #121 Motion for Extension of Time. Dismissal documents due November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/23/2018. (kbs)
October 23, 2018 Reset Deadlines Per DE#122. Miscellaneous Deadline 11/9/2018. (cqs)
October 22, 2018 Filing 121 MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE DISMISSAL PLEADINGS by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 11/5/2018 (Thomas, Michael)
October 22, 2018 Filing 120 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Dismissal Pleadings by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams (Aylstock, Bryan)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #118 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties have until October 22, 2018 to file a stipulated dismissal. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/7/2018. (kbs)
September 7, 2018 Filing 118 MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE DISMISSAL re #117 Order Dismissing Case, by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 9/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Thomas, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO CLOSE THIS CASE. This case is STAYED.All pending deadlines are TERMINATED, all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, and all hearings are CANCELLED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES; this closure shall not affect the merits of any partys claim. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/8/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
August 8, 2018 Filing 116 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Dominic Caparello. Disposition: Settled in full.(Gimbel, Albert)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 PAPERLESS ORDER informing the parties that the status conference scheduled for August 15, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. will be in Fort Pierce. Counsel may appear at the Status Conference via telephone but must file a notice of telephonic appearance at least one (1) day prior to the Status Conference. Instructions for appearing via telephone are as follows: (1) Please call five (5) minutes prior to the Status Conference.; (2) The toll-free number is: 1 (877) 873-8018; (3) The access code is: 9890482; (4) The security code is: 4008. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/7/2018. (ege)
August 2, 2018 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 07.16.2018 before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, 1-35 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018. (ps)
August 2, 2018 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 06.20.2018 before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, 1-16 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018. (ps)
July 31, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams Joint Submission of Responses to Objections to Deposition Designations and Objections to Counter Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Aylstock, Bryan)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS #100 MOTION FOR PARTIALRECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS ORDER ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
July 25, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams Joint Submission of Deposition Designations, Counter-Designations, and Objections to Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Aylstock, Bryan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams Joint Notice Regarding Additional Procedures (Aylstock, Bryan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 108 PRETRIAL STIPULATION by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Aylstock, Bryan)
July 18, 2018 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re #100 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order on Summary Judgment filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. (Aylstock, Bryan)
July 16, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re 93 Order,,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,, (Thomas, Michael)
July 16, 2018 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #100 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order on Summary Judgment filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Replies due by 7/23/2018. (Thomas, Michael)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #94 Plaintiffs' Motion to Permit Contemporaneous Video Transmission Under FRCP 43(a) for the reasons stated on the record on July 16, 2018 and for the reasons stated in #102 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Permit Contemporaneous Video Transmission Under FRCP 43(A). Additionally, as discussed during the hearing on July 16, 2018, the parties shall file a Notice of any additional procedures that they believe could streamline the Court's review of the deposition designations and objections by July 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/16/2018. (ege)
July 16, 2018 Filing 103 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2018 re #94 MOTION to Permit Contemporaneous Video Transmission Under FRCP 43(a) filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Total time in court: 48 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Caitlyn Corrine Prichard, Richard M. Elias, Tamara M. Spicer, Robert E. Johnston, Andrew L. Reissaus. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ir)
July 13, 2018 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION to Permit Contemporaneous Video Transmission Under FRCP 43(a) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Replies due by 7/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Thomas, Michael)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PAPERLESS ORDER expediting briefing on #100 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order on Summary Judgment. Defendant's response due by July 16, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' reply due by July 18, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/13/2018. (ege)
July 13, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order on Summary Judgment by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. (Aylstock, Bryan)
July 13, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams Telephonic Appearance of Richard Elias and Tamara Spicer for July 16, 2018 Status Conference (Aylstock, Bryan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation of Telephonic Appearance at July 16, 2018 Status Conference (Thomas, Michael)
July 10, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams of Service of Demand for Judgment to Defendant (Aylstock, Bryan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams of Telephonic Appearance for July 16, 2018 Status Conference (Prichard, Caitlyn)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PAPERLESS ORDER expediting briefing on #94 Plaintiffs' Motion to Permit Contemporaneous Video Transmission Under FRCP 43(a). Defendant's response is due by July 13, 2018. The Court also sets a status conference on #94 Plaintiffs' Motion for July 16, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in West Palm Beach. Counsel may appear at the Status Conference via telephone but must file a notice of telephonic appearance at least one (1) day prior to the Status Conference. Instructions for appearing via telephone are as follows: (1) Please call five (5) minutes prior to the Status Conference.; (2) The toll-free number is: 1 (877) 873-8018; (3) The access code is: 9890482; (4) The security code is: 4008. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/10/2018. (ege)
July 9, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION to Permit Contemporaneous Video Transmission Under FRCP 43(a) by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. (Aylstock, Bryan)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court notes that, during the status conference held on June 20, 2018, the parties indicated that they would be willing to conduct a second mediation following the Court's order on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Now that the Court has ruled on the Motion, the parties shall file a Notice by July 16, 2018, informing the Court if they intend to conduct a second mediation and, if so, the date of the mediation. The Court also informs the parties that this case will be tried during the September 17, 2018 trial docket in Fort Pierce, rather than the August 20, 2018 trial docket. The remainder of the deadlines set in docket entries 7, 25, and 87 remain in place with the exception that the August 15, 2018 Calendar Call will now be a Status Conference. The Court will hold a Calendar Call on September 12, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. in West Palm Beach. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/9/2018. (ege)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #61 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #59 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #56 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying DE #60 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
July 6, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Thomas, Michael)
July 2, 2018 Filing 86 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #75 Response in Support of Motion, by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Thomas, Michael)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ON ADDITIONAL PRETRIAL PROCEDURES, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 7/20/2018). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 20, 2018 Filing 85 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg: Calendar Call held on 6/20/2018. Total time in court: 20 minutes. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mg)
June 18, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams telephonic appearance (Prichard, Caitlyn)
June 18, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caitlyn Corrine Prichard on behalf of Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Attorney Caitlyn Corrine Prichard added to party Dennis McWilliams(pty:pla), Attorney Caitlyn Corrine Prichard added to party Lori McWilliams(pty:pla). (Prichard, Caitlyn)
June 18, 2018 Filing 82 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #56 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. SONAL SINGH WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW , #60 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. ROBERT WAGMEISTER WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Thomas, Michael)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PAPERLESS ORDER noting that the status conference scheduled for June 20, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. will be at the United States District Court at 701 Clematis Street, Fourth Floor, Courtroom 2, West Palm Beach, Florida. Counsel may appear at the Status Conference via telephone but must file a notice of telephonic appearance at least one (1) day prior to the Status Conference. Instructions for appearing via telephone are as follows: (1) Please call five (5) minutes prior to the Status Conference or Calendar Call; (2) The toll-free number is: 1 (877) 873-8018. (3) The access code is: 9890482. (4) The security code is: 4008. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/18/2018. (ege)
June 12, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re #73 Reply to Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Thomas, Michael)
June 12, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Striking #73 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation as to Exhibits Only by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Thomas, Michael)
June 11, 2018 Filing 78 REPLY in Support re #55 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF CHERYL BLUME, PH.D. WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Thomas, Michael) Modified title text on 6/12/2018 (asl).
June 11, 2018 Filing 77 REPLY in Support re #58 MOTION in Limine AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Thomas, Michael) Modified title text on 6/12/2018 (asl).
June 11, 2018 Filing 76 Statement of: Reply in Support of Its Statement of Material Facts and in Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re #64 Statement,,,,,,, #62 Statement,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 55)(Thomas, Michael)
June 11, 2018 Filing 75 REPLY in Support re #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Thomas, Michael) Modified title text on 6/12/2018 (asl).
June 11, 2018 Filing 74 REPLY in Support re #56 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. SONAL SINGH WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Thomas, Michael) Modified title text on 6/12/2018 (asl).
June 11, 2018 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. MARK WEISS WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #57 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF MR. RICHARD HARPER WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW , #60 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. ROBERT WAGMEISTER WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Thomas, Michael)
June 11, 2018 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION to Strike the Expert Testimony of Javid Moslehi, M.D. and Francis Giles, M.D. filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. (Aylstock, Bryan)
June 4, 2018 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION in Limine AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Aylstock, Bryan)
June 4, 2018 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Strike the Expert Testimony of Javid Moslehi, M.D. and Francis Giles, M.D. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Thomas, Michael)
June 4, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF MR. RICHARD HARPER WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Aylstock, Bryan)
June 4, 2018 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF CHERYL BLUME, PH.D. WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Aylstock, Bryan)
June 4, 2018 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. MARK WEISS WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Aylstock, Bryan)
June 4, 2018 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. ROBERT WAGMEISTER WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Aylstock, Bryan)
June 4, 2018 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. SONAL SINGH WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Aylstock, Bryan)
June 4, 2018 Filing 64 Statement of: of Disputed Facts in Opposition to Defendant Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation's Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Material Facts in Opposition to Movant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams re #62 Statement,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80)(Aylstock, Bryan)
June 4, 2018 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Aylstock, Bryan)
May 21, 2018 Filing 62 Statement of: MATERIAL FACTS by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-5-18 Walia Dep, #2 Exhibit 3-21-18 Shaikh Dep, #3 Exhibit 4-13-17 Woodman Dep, #4 Exhibit 4-26-18 Blume Dep, #5 Exhibit 7-14-17 Weiss Dep, #6 Exhibit 4-8-17 Habucky Dep, #7 Exhibit 10-29-07 Approval, #8 Exhibit 6-17-10 Approval, #9 Exhibit 4-24-18 Weiss Dep, #10 Exhibit 6-6-2011 Rec, #11 Exhibit 03-08-18 Walia Dep, #12 Exhibit 10-20-14 - Shaikh Rec, #13 Exhibit 10-22-13 Walia Rec, #14 Exhibit 2-6-18 Loyola Dep, #15 Exhibit 9-9-13 Loyola Rec, #16 Exhibit 2018 Label, #17 Exhibit 2-9-18 Maraist Dep, #18 Exhibit 8-27-13 Rec, #19 Exhibit 3-19-22 Maraist Dep, #20 Exhibit 9-10-13 Rec, #21 Exhibit 10-18-17 Rec, #22 Exhibit 11-14-17 Rec, #23 Exhibit 7-12-15 Rec, #24 Exhibit AHA 2017 Update, #25 Exhibit 4-19-18 Wagmeister Dep, #26 Exhibit 6-16-11 Record at 43, #27 Exhibit Lifetime Risks of Cardio Dis, #28 Exhibit 8-25-13 Record at 155, #29 Exhibit Coon et al (2013), #30 Exhibit Levato et al (2013), #31 Exhibit 1-22-18 Blume Report, #32 Exhibit 4-7-17 Habucky Dep, #33 Exhibit 4-25-17 Aghoghovbia Dep, #34 Exhibit 5-2-17 Hong Dep, #35 Exhibit 12-16-10 MSRB Minutes, #36 Exhibit 7-13-11 PAOD label changes, #37 Exhibit 7-31-17 Blume Dep, #38 Exhibit 10-10-11 FDA Memo, #39 Exhibit 10-13-11 FDA lbl feedback, #40 Exhibit 11-18-11 Approval, #41 Exhibit 12-20-12 Approval, #42 Exhibit 3-29-13 PSUR Report, #43 Exhibit 4-5-13 Ltr to FDA, #44 Exhibit 9-27-13 Type C Req, #45 Exhibit 10-25-13 FDA req, #46 Exhibit 11-20-13 FDA Email, #47 Exhibit FDA Comms re Iclusig, #48 Exhibit FDA Iclusig Review, #49 Exhibit Iclusig Memo, #50 Exhibit 12-20-13 FDA Comm, #51 Exhibit 12-30-13 PSS, #52 Exhibit 1-2014 FDA Pub, #53 Exhibit 01-22-14 App Ltr, #54 Exhibit 02-21-14 Email)(Thomas, Michael)
May 21, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 6/4/2018 (Thomas, Michael)
May 21, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. ROBERT WAGMEISTER WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Thomas, Michael)
May 21, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. MARK WEISS WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Thomas, Michael)
May 21, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION in Limine AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(Thomas, Michael)
May 21, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF MR. RICHARD HARPER WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Thomas, Michael)
May 21, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. SONAL SINGH WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Thomas, Michael)
May 21, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF CHERYL BLUME, PH.D. WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Thomas, Michael)
May 21, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Strike the Expert Testimony of Javid Moslehi, M.D. and Francis Giles, M.D. by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Responses due by 6/4/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Aylstock, Bryan)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 4/20/2018. (kpe)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR EN TRY OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER (DE 51). ORDER granting #51 Motion for Protective and Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 4/20/2018. (kpe)
April 19, 2018 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Michael)
April 13, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael John Thomas on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certification) (Thomas, Michael)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying #43 Motion to Quash; denying #43 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 4/6/2018. (ip00)
April 6, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. (Aylstock, Bryan)
April 5, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas MOTION for Protective Order filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Replies due by 4/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Thomas, Michael)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #45 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL. Attorney Katherine J. Duncan terminated Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Katherine Duncan.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/5/2018. (kpe)
April 4, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Katherine J. Duncan. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 4/18/2018 (Thomas, Michael)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Paperless Order Creating Expedited Briefing Schedule. The Defendants shall file their Response to the Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Protective Order (DE 43) by 4:00 PM on Thursday, April 5, 2018. The Reply is due by 8:00 AM on Friday, April 6, 2018. The parties shall include in their briefing what impact Local Rule 26.1(h) has. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 4/4/2018. (ip00)
April 4, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, MOTION for Protective Order by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Aylstock, Bryan)
March 9, 2018 Filing 42 MEDIATION REPORT by Dominic M. Caparello. Disposition: Adjourned.(Gimbel, Albert)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court notes that the parties had mediation scheduled for March 7, 2018. DE 34. To date, the parties have not informed the Court of the outcome of mediation. Accordingly, the parties shall file a Notice informing the Court of the outcome of mediation by 3/12/18. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/9/2018. (ege)
March 5, 2018 Filing 40 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Thomas, Michael)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2018. (bkd)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Catherine E. Stolar, Esquire at email address: cstolar@hollingsworthllp.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 2/1/2018. (cga)
January 30, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Catherine E. Stolar. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10367046 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 2/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Thomas, Michael)
January 26, 2018 Filing 36 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Dominic Caparello. (Thomas, Michael)
January 23, 2018 Filing 35 Clerks Notice to Filer re #34 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional mediator. (kpe)
January 23, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Mediator Hearing. Dominic Caparello selected. Mediation Hearing set for 03/07/18 at 10:00 a.m.. (Thomas, Michael)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON MOTION S TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING (DE 31 & 32). Order granting #31 & #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Stephen A.Klein and Katherine J. Duncan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 12/21/2017. (kpe)
December 20, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for KATHERINE J. DUNCAN. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10275485 by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 1/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Thomas, Michael)
December 20, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for STEPHEN A. KLEIN. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10275437 by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Attorney Michael John Thomas added to party Novartis AG(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Thomas, Michael)
November 22, 2017 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Thomas, Michael)
November 20, 2017 Filing 29 Consent to Mediation byNovartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation(Thomas, Michael)
November 15, 2017 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss #19 Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Replies due by 11/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aylstock, Bryan)
November 1, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss #19 Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 11/15/2017 (Thomas, Michael)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Andrew L. Reissaus; granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Katharine R. Latimer; granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Robert E. Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 10/25/2017. (jas)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2017., Discovery due by 4/20/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 12/19/2017., In Limine Motions due by 5/21/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2018., Motions due by 5/21/2018., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/20/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 6/20/2018. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/19/2017. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 18, 2017 Filing 24 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Proposed Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit Defendant Proposed Scheduling Order)(Aylstock, Bryan)
October 18, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert E. Johnston. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10119723 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 11/1/2017 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Thomas, Michael)
October 18, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Katharine R. Latimer. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10119700 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 11/1/2017 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Thomas, Michael)
October 18, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew L. Reissaus. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10119328 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 11/1/2017 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Thomas, Michael)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #15 Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation's Motion to Dismiss in light of #19 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/18/2017. (ege)
October 18, 2017 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams.(Aylstock, Bryan)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Evan C. Murphy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 10/5/2017. (kpe)
October 5, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Evan C. Murphy. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10086663 by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Responses due by 10/19/2017 (Aylstock, Bryan)
October 4, 2017 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Thomas, Michael)
October 4, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Attorney Michael John Thomas added to party Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thomas, Michael)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Greg G. Gutzler; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Richard M. Elias; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Tamara M. Spicer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 10/3/2017. (jas)
October 3, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Tamara M. Spicer. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10079298 by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Responses due by 10/17/2017 (Aylstock, Bryan)
October 3, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard M. Elias. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10079284 by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Responses due by 10/17/2017 (Aylstock, Bryan)
October 3, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Greg G. Gutzler. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10079264 by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Responses due by 10/17/2017 (Aylstock, Bryan)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) James G. Onder, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 9/27/2017. (jas)
September 26, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James G. Onder. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10059493 by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Responses due by 10/10/2017 (Aylstock, Bryan)
September 19, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation served on 9/13/2017, answer due 10/4/2017. (Aylstock, Bryan)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE: (Status Conference set for 6/20/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Jury Trial set for 8/20/2018 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/15/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek Maynard for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/19/2017. (jas) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 31, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Novartis AG. (asl)
August 30, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Novartis AG by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams (Aylstock, Bryan)
August 23, 2017 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Summons for Party Novartis AG, does not have address. (jas)
August 23, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (jas)
August 23, 2017 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
August 23, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9995247, filed by Dennis McWilliams, Lori McWilliams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Aylstock, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McWilliams et al v. Novartis AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Catherine E. Stolar
Represented By: Michael John Thomas
Represented By: Stephen A. Klein
Represented By: Andrew L. Reissaus
Represented By: Katharine R. Latimer
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Represented By: Katherine J. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis AG
Represented By: Michael John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis McWilliams
Represented By: Bryan Frederick Aylstock
Represented By: Richard M. Elias
Represented By: Caitlyn Corrine Prichard
Represented By: Tamara M. Spicer
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Greg G. Gutzler
Represented By: Evan C. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori McWilliams
Represented By: Bryan Frederick Aylstock
Represented By: Richard M. Elias
Represented By: Caitlyn Corrine Prichard
Represented By: Tamara M. Spicer
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Greg G. Gutzler
Represented By: Evan C. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?