Poindexter v. Zacharzewski et al

Plaintiff: Yvonne Poindexter
Defendant: Joseph A. Zacharzewski and Carolyn E. Evans Bruns
Case Number: 2:2018cv14155
Filed: April 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Pierce Office
County: St. Lucie (Office: Ft Pierce)
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M. Maynard
Presiding Judge: Robin L. Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER On Evidence of Pain and Suffering. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (bkd)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Strike, adopting 63 Report and Recommendations, and granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (bkd)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (bkd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poindexter v. Zacharzewski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Zacharzewski
Represented By: Patrick K Dahl
Represented By: Robert Emerito Paradela
Represented By: Patrick K Dahl
Represented By: Robert Emerito Paradela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn E. Evans Bruns
Represented By: David Andrew Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Poindexter
Represented By: Christian D. Searcy
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?