Negron v. Strickland et al
Plaintiff: Hector R. Negron
Defendant: Chaplain Louie, Chaplain Tropf and Selby Strickland
Case Number: 2:2018cv14324
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Pierce Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Patrick A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/11/2018. (br)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's Complaint DE #1 is DISMISSED AS MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 Motion for OBJECTION to Report Dismissal as Moot to #13 Report and Recommendations by Hector R. Negron. (drz)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE DISMISSAL AS MOOT on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint, filed by Hector R. Negron; Recommending that the instant case be dismissed as moot. Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/24/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #9 Motion Travel Expenses. The motion to reimburse for travel expenses of the plaintiff's fiance to travel to Florida to marry the plaintiff is denied. To the extent that this motion is a request for damages it is premature as the complaint has not yet been screened. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/18/2018. (jbr)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hector R. Negron. (mc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Financial Relief by Hector R. Negron. (mc)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 9/17/2018. Motions due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 6:18-cv-01257. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 TRANSFER to the Southern District of Florida, Fort Pierce Division. (JET)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court, Southern District of Florida, Fort Pierce Division for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/13/2018. (DJD)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/20/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/6/2018. (DJD) ctp
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hector R. Negron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(JET) No filing fee and no motion to proceed in forma pauperis included, but 5 copies of the Complaint were submitted and are in the file.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negron v. Strickland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Tropf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selby Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector R. Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?