United States of America v. Mazzeo
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Michael Mazzeo
Case Number: 2:2018cv14492
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Motion to Stay Discovery and Deadlines #6 is denied without prejudice. The parties need not file a motion for an extension of any pre-trial deadlines, up until the dispositive motion deadline, as the parties can file a joint notice of their agreement to extend pretrial deadlines, pursuant to Court's Order at DE 4, page 6. At this early stage of litigation, before Defendant has appeared, it is not necessary for the Court to intervene and stay litigation when the parties are explicitly permitted to extend pretrial deadlines as they deem appropriate. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/8/2019. (kbs)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Deadlines to Provide Initial Disclosures and Select Mediator by United States of America. Responses due by 1/22/2019 (Bahnsen, Nicholas)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 12/18/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, ANDTRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 4/19/2019., Expert Discovery due by 5/6/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2019., Jury Trial set for 8/19/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/14/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 6/19/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Mazzeo. (kpe)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Mazzeo. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to Michael Mazzeo)(Bahnsen, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mazzeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mazzeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicholas S. Bahnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?