Evanston Insurance Company v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv14497
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaim. Plaintiff shall file a responsive pleading or a responsive motion by February 8, 2019. Response due 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/28/2019. (sk01)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, James)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 10/9/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2019, Motions due by 9/6/2019, Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/8/2019). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (mno)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Evanston Insurance Company by Medical Data Systems, Inc.. (Walker, Casey)
January 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #11 Expedited Motion for Early Mediation for the reasons set forth in Defendant's Response to the Motion at docket entry 14. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/5/2019. (sk01)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Renewed EXPEDITED MOTION To Set Early Mediation (Verified) filed by Medical Data Systems, Inc.. Replies due by 1/11/2019. (Walker, Casey)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 1/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendant is ordered to file a response to Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Early Mediation at docket entry 11 by no later than 5:00 p.m. on January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/3/2019. (sk01)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 Renewed EXPEDITED MOTION To Set Early Mediation by Evanston Insurance Company. (Kaplan, James)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING STAUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Status Conference set for 11/6/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M.Maynard for Dispositive Motions., ( Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 12/4/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 11/6/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 Order, Explaining the Basis for the Amount in Controversy by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heifferman, Kimberly)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Expedite Mediation. Plaintiff may renew the Motion following a showing that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction in this matter. See DE 7. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/21/2018. (sk01)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by no later than January 4, 2019, Plaintiff shall file with the Court a memorandum explaining the basis for the allegation in the Complaint that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000, exclusive of interest and costs. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Set an Early Mediation by Evanston Insurance Company. (Kaplan, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Sarah Heifferman on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company. Attorney Kimberly Sarah Heifferman added to party Evanston Insurance Company(pty:pla). (Heifferman, Kimberly)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooke Wagner Odom on behalf of Medical Data Systems, Inc.. Attorney Brooke Wagner Odom added to party Medical Data Systems, Inc.(pty:dft). (Odom, Brooke)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey Walker on behalf of Medical Data Systems, Inc.. Attorney Casey Walker added to party Medical Data Systems, Inc.(pty:dft). (Walker, Casey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Medical Data Systems, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11223025, filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Underlying Action)(Kaplan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Casey Walker
Represented By: Brooke Wagner Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: James Miller Kaplan
Represented By: Kimberly Sarah Heifferman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?