U.S. Bank N.A. v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Defendant: Tamiko Walker and Robert Walker
Case Number: 2:2019cv14037
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER Extending Deadline to File a Response. On March 7, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Remand and a Motion for Fees. [D.E. 11]. Defendants' deadline to respond was March 21, 2019, but no Response was filed. The Court extends Defendants' deadline to Friday, April 5, 2019. If Defendants do not file a Response by this new deadline, this Court will consider the Motion to Remand unopposed. (re #11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Motion for Fees filed by U.S. Bank N.A., as to #11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Motion for Fees. ( Responses due by 4/5/2019) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 3/28/2019. (hin)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER Striking This Court's Previous Order at D.E 15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 3/28/2019. (hin)
March 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per DE#15. Responses due by 4/5/2019 (cqs)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (STRICKEN PER DE#16)PAPERLESS ORDER Extending Deadline to File a Response. On March 7, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Remand and Motion for Fees. [D.E. 11]. Defendants' deadline to respond was March 21, 2019, but no Response was filed. The Court extends Defendants' Response deadline to Friday, April 5, 2019. If Defendants fail to file a Response, the Court may enter a Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 3/28/2019. (hin) Modified on 3/28/2019 (cqs).
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 Robert Walker, Tamiko Walker and Tamiko Peele Defendants, Counter Palintiff's and Third Party Plaintiff's SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Robert Walker, Tamiko Walker (mee)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 Robert Walker, Tamiko Walker and Tamiko Peele Defendants, Counter Plaintiff's and Third Party Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure(s) by Robert Walker, Tamiko Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(mee)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING all matters relating to #11 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Motion for Fees to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard to take all necessary action as required by law, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/7/2019. (ean)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Motion for Fees by U.S. Bank N.A.. Attorney Shannon Troutman Sinai added to party U.S. Bank N.A.(pty:pla). (Sinai, Shannon)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Adopt/Join #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by U.S. Bank N.A.. (Knight, Joshua)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua David Knight on behalf of U.S. Bank N.A.. Attorney Joshua David Knight added to party U.S. Bank N.A.(pty:pla). (Knight, Joshua)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of Law re #5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), for image see de #5 by Robert Walker. (mee)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Present Brief and Oral Argument, Notice of Related Cases and Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Notice of Jurisdictional Notices and or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Robert Walker. Responses due by 2/22/2019 (mee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2019: #1 Exhibit, #2 exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (mee).
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Robert Walker, Tamiko Walker to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: Walkerlegalw@yahoo.com (lh)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 2/7/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS200002244 (lh)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lh)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00 Receipt#: FLS200002244, filed by Tamiko Walker, Robert Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint and other documents, (No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer attached) #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank N.A. v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamiko Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: James E. Albertelli
Represented By: Joshua David Knight
Represented By: Shannon Troutman Sinai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?