Lambert v. Florida Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Cory Cordale Lambert
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv14105
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 5:19-cv-00275, filed 06/04/2019. (bb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 2:19-cv-00275, filed 06/04/2019. (bb)
June 4, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 2:19-cv-14105 electronically transferred out to Florida Middle. (pes)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER Adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. THE CLERK OF THE COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/3/2019. (bkd)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for Transfer of Venue on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Cory Cordale Lambert; Recommending that this court transfer this cause to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Objections to R&R due by 5/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cory Cordale Lambert. (jas)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jas)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Florida Department of Corrections. Filing fee $400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Cory Cordale Lambert.(jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert v. Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Cordale Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?