Fisher v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven Fisher
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv14154
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of docket entry 24. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/28/2019. (bkd)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc., filed by Steven Fisher.(Hobbs, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Mr. Jacob M. Tubbs ; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Mr. Garrett Owens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Steven Fisher (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Hobbs, Ryan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Garrett Owens. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11744286 by Steven Fisher. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, et al.)(Hobbs, Ryan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jacob M. Tubbs. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11744229 by Steven Fisher. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, et al.)(Hobbs, Ryan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Notice of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Duke, Samantha)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Harley-Davidson, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. (Duke, Samantha)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit HD Warranty)(Duke, Samantha)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION: AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING (DE 9 & 10). ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING for appropriate disposition #10 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel Conley. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11700336 filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc., #9 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark Kircher. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11700312 filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. Motions referred to Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/6/2019. (bkd)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ernest Hadley Eubanks, Jr on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. Attorney Ernest Hadley Eubanks, Jr added to party Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.(pty:dft). (Eubanks, Ernest)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard per DE #11 Order. (amb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 5/20/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 4/22/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel Conley. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11700336 by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark Kircher. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11700312 by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. answer due 6/12/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Steven Fisher. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/29/2019. (bkd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. Attorney Samantha Crawford Duke added to party Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duke, Samantha)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Scott Foster on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.(pty:dft). (Foster, Zachary)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steven Fisher. Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Hobbs, Ryan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. (pcs)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HARLEY DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11618113, filed by STEVEN FISHER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons - Harley Davidson)(Hobbs, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Fisher
Represented By: Ryan Blake Hobbs
Represented By: Garrett Owens
Represented By: Jacob M. Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E. Conley
Represented By: Zachary Scott Foster
Represented By: Samantha Crawford Duke
Represented By: Mark A. Kircher
Represented By: Ernest Hadley Eubanks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?