Smith v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections

Petitioner: Ben Jermaine Smith
Respondent: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv14170
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 12 : Filing Fee due by 7/16/2019. Motion for IFP due by 7/16/2019. (lk)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). Petitioner filed an incomplete motion to proceed IFP and failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in his name. Now, Petitioner is directed for the second time to file the completed form to proceed IFP and to submit the required account statement or, alternatively, pay the $5 filing fee within 14 days of the date of this order, on or before, July 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/2/2019. (lt00)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ben Jermaine Smith. (ar2)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections re #8 Response to Order to Show Cause Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Transcripts Mot. Supp & Sentencing, #2 Transcripts Nelson Hearing) (Patti, Paul)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 APPENDIX to #8 Response to Order to Show Cause by Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits 1-20)(Patti, Paul)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, by Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. (Patti, Paul)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Patti, III on behalf of Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Paul Patti, III added to party Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections(pty:res). (Patti, Paul)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 6/24/2019. Motions due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Case not filed with required filing fees of $ 5.00 (civil cases=$400.00, memo cases=$47.00, habeas cases=$5.00) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a), and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Summons(es) will not be issued until the filing fee is paid or an order granting the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is entered. (cga)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (cga)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 NOT PAID. No IFP motion filed by Ben Jermaine Smith.(cga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Paul Patti, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ben Jermaine Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?