Matthews v. Warden, United States of America

Plaintiff: Eric Martin Matthews
Defendant: Warden, United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv14173
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Receipt for Filing fee for Habeas Corpus received on 6/7/2019 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS200002328 (lh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend Exhibit B of #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Eric Martin Matthews. Responses due by 6/18/2019. (jas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct Argument Submitted on #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Eric Martin Matthews. Responses due by 6/18/2019. (jas)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (lh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 due, filed by Eric Martin Matthews. (Attachments: #1 continued 2241 petition, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Warden, United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Martin Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?