Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Calusa Waterkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity and Waterkeeper Alliance
Defendant: Deputy Directory Margaret Everson, Secretary David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Department of the Interior, Dr. Roy E. Crabtree, Colonel Andrew Kelly and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv14199
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS Order setting the telephonic Scheduling Conference for THURSDAY 8/29/2019 at 2:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Counsel for the Plaintiff is responsible for initiating the conference call to opposing counsel and then to Chambers at (772) 467-2320. (Chambers will not be initiating the conference call.) Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(b)(1), counsel for the parties shall confer and prepare a Joint Scheduling Report. The parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report by TUESDAY 8/27/2019. The parties shall begin pre-trial tasks now, in advance of the scheduling conference, and their Joint Scheduling Report shall reflect that. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/5/2019. (ip00)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/29/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard For Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Calusa Waterkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. National Marine Fisheries Service served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service to National Marine Fisheries Service and U.S. Attorney General)(Lopez, Jaclyn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Calusa Waterkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. David Bernhardt served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; Roy E. Crabtree served on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019; Margaret Everson served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; Andrew Kelly served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; U.S. Army Corps of Engineers served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; U.S. Department of the Interior served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Lopez, Jaclyn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Calusa Waterkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity, Waterkeeper Alliance (Lopez, Jaclyn)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A. Brown on behalf of David Bernhardt, Roy E. Crabtree, Margaret Everson, Andrew Kelly, National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Department of the Interior. Attorney Mark A. Brown added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A. Brown added to party Roy E. Crabtree(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A. Brown added to party Margaret Everson(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A. Brown added to party Andrew Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A. Brown added to party National Marine Fisheries Service(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A. Brown added to party U.S. Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A. Brown added to party U.S. Department of the Interior(pty:dft). (Brown, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (lbc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Calusa Waterkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity, Waterkeeper Alliance (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Lopez, Jaclyn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Calusa Waterkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity, Waterkeeper Alliance (Lopez, Jaclyn)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Roy E. Crabtree, Margaret Everson, Andrew Kelly, National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cds)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11718389, filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s))(Lopez, Jaclyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Directory Margaret Everson
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary David Bernhardt
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Roy E. Crabtree
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Andrew Kelly
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calusa Waterkeeper
Represented By: Jaclyn M Lopez
Represented By: Jason Alexander Totoiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Jaclyn M Lopez
Represented By: Jason Alexander Totoiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Jaclyn M Lopez
Represented By: Jason Alexander Totoiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?