6628 Grenada Boulevard Land Trust v. Bank of New York Mellon et al
Plaintiff: 6628 Grenada Boulevard Land Trust
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 2:2019cv14209
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Closing Case. Denied As Moot: #5 Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of New York Mellon. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 6628 Grenada Boulevard Land Trust (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplement to Notice of Dismissal) (Reissman, Marshall)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other. US Mail returned for: Marshall Gary Reissman. Updated address found and document resent to new address.The Reissman Law Group, P.A.5150 Central AvenueSaint Petersburg, FL 33707-1833 (mp)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,,. US Mail returned for: Marshall Gary Reissman. Updated address found and document resent to new address. The Reissman Law Group, P.A.5150 Central AvenueSaint Petersburg, FL 33707-1833 (mp)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Maroon Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.; Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Other Affiliate Bayview Asset Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Bayview Loan Servicing LLC for Bank of New York Mellon (Hekkanen, Justin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Adoption by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. Related document: #5 Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of New York Mellon. Attorney Frederic J. DiSpigna added to party Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.(pty:dft). (DiSpigna, Frederic)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Bank of New York Mellon, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hekkanen, Justin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Original Petition for Declaratory Judgment and for the Cancellation and Expungement of Instruments Assignment of Mortgage (Dated November 4, 2009 and August 3, 2015) and for Statutory Violations of 817.535) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11737174, filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hekkanen, Justin) Text Modified on 6/17/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 6628 Grenada Boulevard Land Trust v. Bank of New York Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Eric Hekkanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Evertz
Represented By: Frederic J. DiSpigna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Justin Eric Hekkanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 6628 Grenada Boulevard Land Trust
Represented By: Marshall Gary Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?