Smith, et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Maureen D. Smith and Edward B. Smith, Jr.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv14222
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Edward B. Smith, Jr, Maureen D. Smith. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Appelbaum, Steven)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 , #7 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Kathleen Lach, Esq. and Robert E. McKenzie, Esq. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/22/2019. (mbt)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert E. McKenzie. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11831131 by Edward B. Smith, Jr, Maureen D. Smith. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Appelbaum, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kathleen Lach. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11831114 by Edward B. Smith, Jr, Maureen D. Smith. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Appelbaum, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Martin (Office - Ft Pierce) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (pcs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11767306, filed by Edward B Smith, Jr., Maureen D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(Appelbaum, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith, et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen D. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Hudson, III
Represented By: Steven Myer Appelbaum
Represented By: Kathleen M. Lach
Represented By: Robert E. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip M. Hudson, III
Represented By: Steven Myer Appelbaum
Represented By: Kathleen M. Lach
Represented By: Robert E. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?