Fletcher v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections

Petitioner: Eddie Fletcher
Respondent: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv14231
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/20/2019. (br)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ORDER Adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE. Motions Terminated: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2254 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eddie Fletcher Recommending that this action be CLOSED, as it appears Mr. Fletcher meant to litigate in state court. If Mr. Fle. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2254 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eddie Fletcher; Recommending that this action be CLOSED, as it appears Mr. Fletcher meant to litigate in state court. If Mr. Fletcher wishes to pursue an action in this Court, he should clarify this by filing an objection to this Report in this court. Objections to R&R due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Case not filed with required filing fees of $ 5.00 (civil cases=$400.00, memo cases=$47.00, habeas cases=$5.00) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a), and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Summons(es) will not be issued until the filing fee is paid or an order granting the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is entered. (cga)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Eddie Fletcher (cga)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (cga)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 NOT PAID. No IFP Motion filed by Eddie Fletcher.(cga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eddie Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?