Santana-Iglesias v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Santana-Iglesias
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv14247
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:30 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 9/10/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard For Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Moss, Devin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Vrasmasu, Mihai)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Striking #16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Vrasmasu, Mihai)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, granting #15 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney added William Patrick Geraghty, Devin Arnold Moss for BP America Production Company, William Patrick Geraghty, Devin Arnold Moss for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. Attorney Georgia Lee Lucier; Catherine Pyune McEldowney; Don Keller Haycraft and Kevin Michael Hodges terminated Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Don Haycraft, Kevin Hodges, Georgia Lucier, Catherine McEldowney. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) Modified on 7/29/2019 (mee).
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 STRICKEN per DE #18 Certificate of Other Affiliates by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Vrasmasu, Mihai) Text Modified on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting William Geraghty, Mihai Vrasmasu, and Devin Moss for Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft, and Kevin Michael Hodges by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.. Attorney Mihai Marian Vrasmasu added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mihai Marian Vrasmasu added to party BP Exploration & Production Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Vrasmasu, Mihai)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kevin Michael Hodges, mailing date July 17, 2019, (pt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Georgia Lee Lucier, mailing date July 17, 2019, (pt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney, mailing date July 17, 2019, (pt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Don Keller Haycraft, mailing date July 17, 2019, (pt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-14281. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to Southern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/16/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 30, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/2/2019.(mmv)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7327601) filed by Juan Santana Iglesias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Juan Santana Iglesias(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santana-Iglesias v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Santana-Iglesias
Represented By: Craig Thomas Downs
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: William Patrick Geraghty
Represented By: Devin Arnold Moss
Represented By: Mihai Marian Vrasmasu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: William Patrick Geraghty
Represented By: Devin Arnold Moss
Represented By: Mihai Marian Vrasmasu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?