Reed v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Richard Barrie Reed, II
Defendant: Jeremiah Johnson
Case Number: 2:2019cv14262
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike the Defendant's Affirmative Defenses re #19 Answer to Complaint by Richard Barrie Reed, II. See DE #22 Order. Responses due by 10/3/2019 (kpe)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY, Voidance and Denial of, the Defendant's Affirmative Defenses as Being Legally Insufficient re #19 Answer to Complaint by Richard Barrie Reed, II. (kpe)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Defendant Jeremiah Johnson's Unopposed Motion to Accept Late-Filed Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The motion is granted as filed. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/11/2019. (kml)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Accept Late-Filed Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jeremiah Johnson. (Bradford, Gail)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeremiah Johnson. (Bradford, Gail)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Discovery Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Motions to Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:30 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 9/10/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jeremiah Johnson (Bradford, Gail)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Jeremiah Johnson served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (kpe)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richard Barrie Reed, II identifying Other Affiliate Florida Municipal Insurance Trust, Other Affiliate City of Ft. Pierce for Richard Barrie Reed II (kpe)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (kpe)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Jeremiah Johnson (Bradford, Gail)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file a response on or before September 10, 2019. The deadlines included in the Court's Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report #7 shall not be affected. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/19/2019. (kml)
August 19, 2019 Set Answer Due Deadline per DE 11 Order: Jeremiah Johnson response due 9/10/2019. (kpe)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Jeremiah Johnson. (Bradford, Gail)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 08/06/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gail C. Bradford on behalf of Jeremiah Johnson. Attorney Gail C. Bradford added to party Jeremiah Johnson(pty:dft). (Bradford, Gail)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge for All Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Richard Barrie Reed, II to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: rbr0969@icloud.com (lh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jeremiah Johnson. (lh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/29/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS200002361 (lh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeremiah Johnson. Filing fees $ 400.00 Receipt#: FLS200002361, filed by Richard Barrie Reed, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(lh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Johnson
Represented By: Gail C. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Barrie Reed, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?