Ferreira Construction Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Ferreira Construction Co., Inc.
Claimant: Potential Claimants
Case Number: 2:2019cv14309
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Ferreira Construction Co., Inc. of filing Affidavit of Proof of Publication (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Proof of Publication of Notice of Monition) (Hodges, Whittni)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Approve Ad Interim Stipulation and Enter Monition and Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (eso)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ferreira Construction Co., Inc. (Hodges, Whittni)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Approve Ad Interim Stipulation and Enter Monition and Injunction by Ferreira Construction Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Monition, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Notice of Monition, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Monition)(Hodges, Whittni)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION by Ferreira Construction Co., Inc. (Hodges, Whittni)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against Potential Claimants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11930415, filed by Ferreira Construction Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Value)(Hodges, Whittni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferreira Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferreira Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Whittni Marie Hodges
Represented By: Jules Victor Massee
Represented By: Robert B. Birthisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Potential Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?