Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. PALM DINER LLC
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., WACISSA RIVER MUSIC, INC., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, FRESH AVERY MUSIC, Mother May I music, Songs of Universal, Inc., E. O. SMITH MUSIC, Tokeco Tunes, ECHO ECHO TUNES, Peppermint Stripe Music, HAIR SUCKER SONGS and Randor Music International, Inc
Defendant: DIMITRIOS PANAGIOTOPOULOS, PALM DINER LLC, Back Alley Bar and Dimitri
Case Number: 2:2019cv14367
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading or a responsive motion by December 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/25/2019. (sk01)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James D D'Loughy on behalf of PALM DINER LLC (D'Loughy, James)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by PALM DINER LLC. Attorney James D D'Loughy added to party PALM DINER LLC(pty:dft). (D'Loughy, James)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURE. Plaintiff shall submit a Motion for Entry of ClerksDefault as to Defendants by no later than November 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by WACISSA RIVER MUSIC, INC., Peppermint Stripe Music, ECHO ECHO TUNES, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, FRESH AVERY MUSIC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Mother May I music, HAIR SUCKER SONGS, Broadcast Music, Inc., Randor Music International, Inc, E. O. SMITH MUSIC, Tokeco Tunes. DIMITRIOS PANAGIOTOPOULOS served on 10/26/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Messa, Zachary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by WACISSA RIVER MUSIC, INC., Peppermint Stripe Music, ECHO ECHO TUNES, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, FRESH AVERY MUSIC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Mother May I music, HAIR SUCKER SONGS, Broadcast Music, Inc., Randor Music International, Inc, E. O. SMITH MUSIC, Tokeco Tunes. PALM DINER LLC served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Messa, Zachary)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 11/23/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 11/18/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 10/21/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (mee)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (copy mailed to U.S. copyright office) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PALM DINER LLC, DIMITRIOS PANAGIOTOPOULOS. (mee)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PALM DINER LLC, DIMITRIOS PANAGIOTOPOULOS. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12033373, filed by WACISSA RIVER MUSIC, INC., Peppermint Stripe Music, ECHO ECHO TUNES, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, FRESH AVERY MUSIC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Mother May I music, HAIR SUCKER SONGS, Broadcast Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, E. O. SMITH MUSIC, Tokeco Tunes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Messa, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. PALM DINER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WACISSA RIVER MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESH AVERY MUSIC
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mother May I music
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. O. SMITH MUSIC
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECHO ECHO TUNES
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peppermint Stripe Music
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAIR SUCKER SONGS
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randor Music International, Inc
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIMITRIOS PANAGIOTOPOULOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALM DINER LLC
Represented By: James D D'Loughy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Back Alley Bar
Represented By: James D D'Loughy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitri
Represented By: James D D'Loughy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?