The United States of America v. North
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Defendant: Cory North
Case Number: 2:2019cv14376
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to Cory North - Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/27/2019. (ls)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Cory North by The United States of America. (Treanor, T. C.)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Default Procedure. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default due 11/26/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The United States of America. Cory North served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Treanor, T. C.)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: (Fact Discovery due by 4/17/2020., Expert Discovery due by 5/1/2020., Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/12/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Requirements, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cory North. (cds)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cory North. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Summon(s), #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Treanor, T. C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: T. C. Treanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?