The Estate of Lily Coombs v. Atlantic Health Care Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Lily Coombs, by and through Susan E. Corrigan, Personal Representative and The Estate of Lily Coombs
Defendant: Atlantic Health Care Center, LLC, Brian Reynolds, Add It, LLC, Alan J Zuccari, John W Dwyer, SLC Professionals Chai, LLC, Lyric Health Care Holdings, III, Inc., SLC Professionals Holdings, LLC, Lyric Health Care Holdings, III, LLC, SLC Professionals Monarch, LLC and Milestone Retirement Communities, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Lyric Health Care Facilities, LLC, Grantham Health Care, LLC, Atlantic Healthcare, LLC and Timothy F Nicholson
3Rd Party Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv14420
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Argonaut Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Argo Group US Inc. for Argonaut Insurance Company (Darroch, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Stephen Fischer as Mediator. (Stewart, Todd)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand (Motion for Remand and Sanctions) filed by Atlantic Healthcare, LLC, Grantham Health Care, LLC, Lyric Health Care Facilities, LLC, Timothy F Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Timothy Nicholson, #2 Supplement Argonaut's Amended Answer)(Stewart, Todd)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand (Motion for Remand and Sanctions) filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. Replies due by 12/12/2019. (Darroch, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE and ORDER REQUIRING JOINT DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT, ( Joint Discovery Status Report due by 5/18/2020., Status Conference Re: Final Discovery Matters set for 5/21/2020 02:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, ANDTRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 5/28/2020., Expert Discovery due by 6/11/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2020., Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 9/23/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 8/26/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand (Motion for Remand and Sanctions) by Atlantic Healthcare, LLC, Grantham Health Care, LLC, Lyric Health Care Facilities, LLC, Timothy F Nicholson. Attorney Todd Stephen Stewart added to party Atlantic Healthcare, LLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Todd Stephen Stewart added to party Grantham Health Care, LLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Todd Stephen Stewart added to party Lyric Health Care Facilities, LLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Todd Stephen Stewart added to party Timothy F Nicholson(pty:3pp). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stewart, Todd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT FOR REMOVAL by Argonaut Insurance Company (Darroch, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal cases. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12129953, filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3)(Darroch, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Lily Coombs v. Atlantic Health Care Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Lyric Health Care Facilities, LLC
Represented By: Todd Stephen Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Grantham Health Care, LLC
Represented By: Todd Stephen Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Atlantic Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Todd Stephen Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Timothy F Nicholson
Represented By: Todd Stephen Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Health Care Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Add It, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan J Zuccari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLC Professionals Chai, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyric Health Care Holdings, III, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLC Professionals Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyric Health Care Holdings, III, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLC Professionals Monarch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milestone Retirement Communities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Lily Coombs, by and through Susan E. Corrigan, Personal Representative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Lily Coombs
Represented By: Rainey Cawthon Booth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Malcolm Darroch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?