Curtin v. St. Lucie County Sheriff Pretrial
Petitioner: Lawrence F. Curtin
Respondent: St. Lucie County Sheriff Pretrial
Case Number: 2:2019cv14442
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge 12 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. (kpe)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lawrence F. Curtin ; Adopting #8 Report and Recommendations. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 1/3/2020. (ip00)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTIONS to #8 Report and Recommendations by Lawrence F. Curtin. (kpe)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration by Lawrence F. Curtin. (kpe)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ip00)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lawrence F. Curtin Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 12/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ip00)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to the Court from Lawrence F. Curtin. (kpe)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek Maynard for appropriate resolution. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Lawrence F Curtin (mee)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION For Magistrate Maynard To Recuse Herself And The Heart Of My Request Is In If My Letter Is A Threat to Anyone, by Lawrence F. Curtin. (kpe)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/12/2019 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS2-2444 (cga)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. (cga)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 PAID Receipt#: FLS2-2444 filed by Lawrence F. Curtin.(cga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtin v. St. Lucie County Sheriff Pretrial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: St. Lucie County Sheriff Pretrial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence F. Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?