Harris v. Masterpiece Realty LLC
Plaintiff: Deborah Harris
Defendant: Masterpiece Realty LLC and Masterpiece Realty LLC doing business as Re/Max Masterpiece Realty
Case Number: 2:2020cv14020
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
September 8, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Deborah Harris (Eisenband, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Appropriate dismissal pleadings are due on or before 9/18/2020. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/19/2020. (hhn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulated Dismissal re #27 Order Staying Case by Masterpiece Realty LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2020 (Weber, Janelle)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Staying Case and Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close this Case for Statistical Purposes. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Settlement by Deborah Harris (Eisenband, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 25 Clerks Notice to Filer re #24 Notice (Other). Attorney Address Not CHANGED'-ATTORNEY LAW FIRM NAME NOT CHANGED/b>; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED -, ATTORNEY must modify Current Address AND Law firm name Change (lk)
July 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Masterpiece Realty LLC of Change of Law Firm Name (Weber, Janelle)
May 5, 2020 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT (Joint) re Order Staying Case by Deborah Harris (Hiraldo, Ignacio)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING CASE., Administrative Order Closing Case for Statistical purposes. All pending deadlines are TERMINATED. Motions terminated: #11 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Masterpiece Realty LLC. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
February 26, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Masterpiece Realty LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Weber, Janelle)
February 25, 2020 Filing 20 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Hunter Marckwald as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 6/24/2020 at 1:00 p.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hiraldo, Ignacio)
February 24, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Deborah Harris. Replies due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FCC Public Notice)(Hiraldo, Ignacio)
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Masterpiece Realty LLC identifying Other Affiliate News Corp., Other Affiliate Move Sales, Inc., Other Affiliate Ylopo LLC for Masterpiece Realty LLC (Weber, Janelle)
February 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 15 re #11 MOTION to Stay. Responses due by 2/24/2020 (lk)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/19/2020. (hhn)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court's Trial Order (DE #5 ) permits parties to stipulate to an extension of any pretrial deadline occurring prior to the dispositive motions deadline. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/19/2020. (hhn)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE. Plaintiff's response to #11 Defendant's Motion to Stay Case shall be filed by 5:00 PM on 2/24/2020. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/19/2020. (hhn)
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Masterpiece Realty LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Janelle)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #11 MOTION to Stay Case Amended by Janelle Alicia Weber on behalf of Masterpiece Realty LLC (Weber, Janelle)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Select Mediator and Notify Court re #5 Scheduling Order,,,, Order of Requirements,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, by Masterpiece Realty LLC. Responses due by 3/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weber, Janelle)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Case by Masterpiece Realty LLC. Responses due by 3/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weber, Janelle)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance by Deborah Harris re #6 Order of Requirements (Eisenband, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janelle Alicia Weber on behalf of Masterpiece Realty LLC. Attorney Janelle Alicia Weber added to party Masterpiece Realty LLC(pty:dft). (Weber, Janelle)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER REQUIRING JOINT DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT. ( Joint Discovery Status Report due by 10/1/2020). Final Discovery Status Conference set for 10/6/2020 02:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS IN TCPA-BASED CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, ANDTRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION. (Fact Discovery due by 11/2/2020., Expert Discovery due by 11/16/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2020., Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 1/27/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 12/16/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Deborah Harris. Masterpiece Realty LLC served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Eisenband, Michael)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Masterpiece Realty LLC. (ar2)
January 20, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Masterpiece Realty LLC d/b/a Re/Max Masterpiece Realty. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12320879, filed by Deborah Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Eisenband, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Masterpiece Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masterpiece Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masterpiece Realty LLC doing business as Re/Max Masterpiece Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Harris
Represented By: Michael Eisenband
Represented By: Ignacio Javier Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?