Polanco-Chaer et al v. American Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Susana Polanco-Chaer and Jose Chaer
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv14092
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS Order: The telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for THURSDAY 6/11/2020 at 2:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Counsel shall call the Court's telephone conference line number (888) 684-8852 and use Access Code 5312437. Counsel are asked to call from a quiet space and not to use the speaker phone. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(b), counsel for the parties shall confer and prepare a Joint Scheduling Report based on the already set trial date. Their Joint Scheduling Report is due by TUESDAY 6/9/2020. The parties shall begin pre-trial tasks now, in advance of the scheduling conference. This includes Initial Disclosures (which the parties shall exchange before the Scheduling Conference) and discovery. In other words the case already should be progressing by the time of the Scheduling Conference, and the Joint Scheduling Report should reflect that. This is necessary so that the parties can complete all pre-trial tasks within the time allotted and have the case ready for trial by the soon upcoming trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/20/2020. (ip00)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring Case and Setting Trial Date: ( Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/27/2021 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Andrea M. Ramos is instructed to go to her PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating her information. Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Andrea M. Ramos re #5 Notice of Change of Address. (cw)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrea M. Ramos (Ramos, Andrea)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by American Security Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koch, Brian)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc., Other Affiliate Assurant, Inc. for American Security Insurance Company (Koch, Brian)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint). Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12651118, filed by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons and State Court Complaint)(Koch, Brian) Modified text on 3/25/2020 (ar2). (State Court Answer filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polanco-Chaer et al v. American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Polanco-Chaer
Represented By: Alexis Marie Bucelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Chaer
Represented By: Alexis Marie Bucelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Howard Koch
Represented By: Andrea M. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?