Diossy v. Mulligans Acquisition Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Istvan Diossy and Steve Diossy
Defendant: Mulligans Sebastian Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Melbourne Acquisition, LLC, George Hart, Mulligans LBTS Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Stuart Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Acquisition Inc., Mulligans Jensen Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Lake Worth Acquisition LLC, M N Worldwide, Inc., Mulligans Vero Acquisition LLC and Mulligans Singer Island Acquisition, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv14229
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant MN Worldwide, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint #26 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #26 is GRANTED. Defendant MN Worldwide, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 8, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/17/2020. (mgh)
August 13, 2020 Filing 26 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by M N Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warzecha, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Reset Deadlines Defendants Answer due 9/8/2020 Per DE#25. (cqs)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants George Hart, Mulligans Acquisition Inc., Mulligans Jensen Acquisition LLC, Mulligans LBTS Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Lake Worth Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Melbourne Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Sebastian Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Singer Island Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Stuart Acquisition LLC, and Mulligans Vero Acquisition LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint #24 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #24 is GRANTED. Defendants George Hart, Mulligans Acquisition Inc., Mulligans Jensen Acquisition LLC, Mulligans LBTS Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Lake Worth Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Melbourne Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Sebastian Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Singer Island Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Stuart Acquisition LLC, and Mulligans Vero Acquisition LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 8, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/13/2020. (mgh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 24 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by George Hart, Mulligans Acquisition Inc., Mulligans Jensen Acquisition LLC, Mulligans LBTS Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Lake Worth Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Melbourne Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Sebastian Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Singer Island Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Stuart Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Vero Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bandklayder, Daniel)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant MN Worldwide, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint #22 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #22 is GRANTED. Defendant MN Worldwide, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before August 19, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/3/2020. (mgh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by M N Worldwide, Inc.. Attorney Mark F Warzecha added to party M N Worldwide, Inc.(pty:dft). (Warzecha, Mark)
July 29, 2020 Terminate Answer Due Deadline for Defendant M N Worldwide, Inc.: This Defendant was not part of DE #19 Motion for Extension of Time that was then granted by DE 21 (jua)
July 29, 2020 Reset Deadlines All Defendants Answer Due 8/0/2020. (cqs)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. #19 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #19 is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before August 20, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/29/2020. (mgh)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 Clerks Notice to Filer re #19 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time 20 day extension to respond to complaint . Missing Filer Name(s); ERROR - The filer failed to select all parties indicated on DE #19 . The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. AND Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the case. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. ALSO, Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Mulligans Acquisition Inc., Mulligans Jensen Acquisition LLC, Mulligans LBTS Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Lake Worth Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Melbourne Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Sebastian Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Singer Island Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Stuart Acquisition LLC., Mulligans Vero Acquisition LLC, George Hart. Attorney Daniel Keith Bandklayder added to party Mulligans Acquisition Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/11/2020 (Bandklayder, Daniel) Modified Relief/Filers on 7/29/2020 (ls).
July 14, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. George Hart served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. M N Worldwide, Inc. served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. Mulligans Melbourne Acquisition, LLC served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. Mulligans Lake Worth Acquisition LLC served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. Mulligans Stuart Acquisition LLC served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. Mulligans Singer Island Acquisition, LLC served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. Mulligans Sebastian Acquisition LLC served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. Mulligans Jensen Acquisition LLC served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. Mulligans Vero Acquisition LLC served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. Mulligans LBTS Acquisition LLC served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Istvan Diossy. Mulligans Acquisition Inc. served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Barrios, Brad)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 7/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SHANIEK MAYNARD. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Shaniek Maynard to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Maynard's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/8/2020. (mgh)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/8/2020. (mgh)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to George Hart, M N Worldwide, Inc., Mulligans Acquisition Inc., Mulligans Jensen Acquisition LLC, Mulligans LBTS Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Lake Worth Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Melbourne Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Sebastian Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Singer Island Acquisition, LLC, Mulligans Stuart Acquisition LLC, Mulligans Vero Acquisition LLC. (cds)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 and Order Mailed TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (cds)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand (Injunctive Relief Sought) against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13139485, filed by Istvan Diossy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Mulligans Acquisition Inc., #3 Summon(s) Mulligans LBTS Acquisition LLC, #4 Summon(s) Mulligans Vero Acquisition LLC, #5 Summon(s) Mulligans Jensen Acquisition LLC, #6 Summon(s) Mulligans Sebastian Acquisition LLC, #7 Summon(s) Mulligans Stuart Acquisition LLC, #8 Summon(s) Mulligans Singer Island Acquisition, LLC, #9 Summon(s) Mulligans Lake Worth Acquisition LLC, #10 Summon(s) Mulligans Melbourne Acquisition, LLC, #11 Summon(s) M N Worldwide, Inc., #12 Summon(s) George Hart)(Barrios, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diossy v. Mulligans Acquisition Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Istvan Diossy
Represented By: David Andrew Hayes
Represented By: Brad F. Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Diossy
Represented By: David Andrew Hayes
Represented By: Brad F. Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligans Sebastian Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligans Melbourne Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Hart
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligans LBTS Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligans Stuart Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligans Acquisition Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligans Jensen Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligans Lake Worth Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M N Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Mark F Warzecha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligans Vero Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligans Singer Island Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Keith Bandklayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?