LaChase v. St. Lucie County Jail
Plaintiff: Charlton Edward LaChase
Defendant: St. Lucie County Jail
Case Number: 2:2020cv14233
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to increase access to Law Library computer while limit Covid-19 movement by Charlton Edward LaChase. (ebz)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Writ of Habeas Corpus for reduce fee $5.00 by Charlton Edward LaChase. (ebz)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT (Amended Complaint due by 8/31/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Form) (br)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Inquiry by Charlton Edward LaChase Copy of Docket Sheet mailed re #9 Notice (Other) (ebz)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. Plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350.00 which must be paid to the Clerk of the Court as funds become available.USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing FDC Bank Statement and Notice of Inquiry by Charlton Edward LaChase re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Copy of Docket Sheet mailed out). (ebz) Modified text on 7/23/2020 (ebz).
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Bank Account Statement by Charlton Edward LaChase re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ebz)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Inquiry by Charlton Edward LaChase (Copy of Docket Sheet mailed) (ebz)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlton Edward LaChase (Attachments: #1 FBP Account Transactions)(ebz)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlton Edward LaChase. (ebz)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for permission to have extra time in the law library by Charlton Edward LaChase. (ebz)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Inquiry by Charlton Edward LaChase (Copy of Docket Sheet and IFP application mailed) (ebz)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ebz)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against St. Lucie County Jail. Filing fee $ 400.00 MONIES DUE/NOT PAID, filed by Charlton Edward LaChase.(ebz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaChase v. St. Lucie County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Lucie County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlton Edward LaChase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?