Grossman v. Martin Memorial Medical Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mitchell A Grossman
Defendant: Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC, Martin Memorial Medical Center, Inc., United Collection Bureau, Inc. and Paragon Contracting Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv14465
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CLOSING CASE RE: #16 , Joint Stipulation to Dismiss All Defendants with Prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case. The parties shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (mno)
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal Jointly with Prejudice by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohlmyer, Ernest)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference and Order Requiring Joint Discovery Status Report, ( Status Report due by 3/15/2021., Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 3/18/2021 02:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 1/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 1/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER upon #12 Notice of Settlement as to Defendant United Collection Bureau, Inc., Only. Granting Request of Forty-Five (45) days to complete all Settlement Terms and File a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant United Collection Bureau, Inc. Only by United Collection Bureau, Inc. (Marees, John)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Calendar Call set for 8/12/2021 01:45 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Amended Pleadings due by 3/9/2021., Discovery due by 4/20/2021., Expert Discovery due by 4/20/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 3/9/2021., Mediation Deadline 5/4/2021., In Limine Motions due by 7/5/2021., Motions due by 5/12/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/5/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT Joint Removal Status Report by Defendants pursuant to DE 6 by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC (Kohlmyer, Ernest)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Marees, II on behalf of United Collection Bureau, Inc.. Attorney John Michael Marees, II added to party United Collection Bureau, Inc.(pty:dft). (Marees, John)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendants shall not file a response until all of the Defendants have been served. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Court Practice In Removal Cases., ( Status Report due by 1/5/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC (Kohlmyer, Ernest)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC (Kohlmyer, Ernest)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 DEFENDANT, HEALTHCARE REVENUE RECOVERY GROUP, LLC.S ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (Kohlmyer, Ernest)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Mitchell A. Grossman v. Martin Memorial Medical Center, Inc., et al) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14117312, filed by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Joinder and consents to Removal, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket, Pleadings, and Motions)(Kohlmyer, Ernest) Modified on 12/29/2020 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grossman v. Martin Memorial Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC
Represented By: Ernest Henry Kohlmyer, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Memorial Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Darrin J. Quam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Collection Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Marshall Burnette
Represented By: John Michael Marees, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Contracting Services, LLC
Represented By: John Philip Gaset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell A Grossman
Represented By: Jason R. Kobal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?