Woods v. Reeve et al
Plaintiff: Yolanda Woods
Defendant: Pat White, Christopher Reeve and Rick Sarcinello
Case Number: 2:2021cv14001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Resolution of Andrew Coffee IV's Criminal Case by Christopher Reeve, Pat White. Responses due by 3/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Arrest Affidavit for Andrew Coffee IV, #2 Exhibit B- Indictment for Andrew Coffee IV, #3 Exhibit C- Motion to Dimiss)(Jisa, Adriana)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 3/10/2021.); granting #10 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Motion for Leave to File. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ail)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Yolanda Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Sherris, Mary) Text Modified on 2/16/2021 (ail).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Complaint [DE-1] by Christopher Reeve, Pat White. (Jisa, Adriana)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of Christopher Reeve, Pat White. Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Christopher Reeve(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Pat White(pty:dft). (Jisa, Adriana)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rick Sarcinello. Attorney Gail C. Bradford added to party Rick Sarcinello(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/16/2021 (Bradford, Gail)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Yolanda Woods. Christopher Reeve served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021; Rick Sarcinello served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021; Pat White served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Sherris, Mary)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover sheet by Yolanda Woods re #1 Complaint (Sherris, Mary) Text Modified on 1/6/2021 (amb).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Christopher Reeve, Rick Sarcinello, Pat White. (amb)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (amb)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-14148046, filed by Yolanda Woods. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Sherris, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Reeve et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Woods
Represented By: Mary Sherris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat White
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Reeve
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Sarcinello
Represented By: Gail C. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?