Cohan v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as Office Depot
Case Number: 2:2021cv14118
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Office Depot, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ODP Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate ODP Investment, LLC for Office Depot, Inc. (Wilson, Courtney)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Office Depot, Inc.. Attorney Courtney Blair Wilson added to party Office Depot, Inc.(pty:dft). (Wilson, Courtney)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/10/2021 Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Office Depot, Inc. served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Sconzo, Gregory)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Office Depot, Inc.. (pcs)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office Depot, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14513249, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sconzo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Gregory Steven Sconzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as Office Depot
Represented By: Courtney Blair Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?