Coffee IV v. Indian River County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Coffee IV
Defendant: Sheriff Deryl Loar, Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Rick Sarcinello, Christopher Reeve and Patrick White
Case Number: 2:2021cv14154
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Joint and Unopposed and Memorandum of Law in Support by Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar, Christopher Reeve, Patrick White. Responses due by 6/16/2021 (Jisa, Adriana)
June 2, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar, Christopher Reeve, Rick Sarcinello, Patrick White (Bradford, Gail)
May 24, 2021 Filing 40 REPLY to #35 MOTION TO DISMISS #25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM **In support of their joint motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint** by Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar, Christopher Reeve, Patrick White. (Jisa, Adriana)
May 20, 2021 Filing 39 Amended RESPONSE to #35 MOTION TO DISMISS #25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Andrew Coffee IV. (Fadley, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2021 Filing 38 First RESPONSE to #35 MOTION TO DISMISS #25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Andrew Coffee IV. (Fadley, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Take Deposition from Andrew Coffee IV. Cancelling Telephonic Conference set for 5/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
May 10, 2021 Filing 36 First RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Take Deposition from Andrew Coffee IV by Andrew Coffee IV. (Fadley, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS #25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar, Christopher Reeve, Patrick White. Responses due by 5/24/2021 (Jisa, Adriana)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER: This matter is before the undersigned upon DE #32 Defendant's Motion to Take Deposition which seeks leave under Fed. R. Civ. P 30(a)(2) to depose Plaintiff, who is currently confined in county jail. Defendant states that Plaintiff opposes the relief sought due to his pending criminal prosecution. Pursuant to the undersigned's Standing Discovery Procedures Order, DE #12 , Plaintiff shall file his Response to the Motion on or before Thursday, May 13, 2021. It is further ORDERED that a telephonic Conference regarding the Motion and forthcoming Response is SET for MONDAY, MAY 17, 2021 at 2:00 PM. Counsel shall join the hearing by calling (888) 684-8852 and entering 5312437 as the Access Code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/7/2021. (ggr)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed the Page Limits on Their Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. #31 . Therein, Defendants request leave to exceed the page limit set by Rule 7.1(c) of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida ("Local Rules") by eleven (11) pages for their forthcoming motion to dismiss. Id. at 2. Defendants argue that an enlargement of the page limit is warranted because "[t]he defendants would like to file one joint motion to dismiss addressing all claims against all defendants in one single pleading." Id. The Court finds good cause to enlarge the page limit set by the Local Rules. See generally id. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion #31 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed the Page Limits on Their Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #31 is GRANTED. Defendants' forthcoming motion to dismiss shall not exceed thirty-one (31) pages. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/6/2021. (hwr)
May 6, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Take Deposition from Andrew Coffee IV by Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar, Christopher Reeve, Patrick White. (Jisa, Adriana)
May 5, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on their Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar, Christopher Reeve, Patrick White. (Jisa, Adriana)
May 2, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE by Rick Sarcinello re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), of Consent for Removal (Bradford, Gail)
May 2, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gail C. Bradford on behalf of Rick Sarcinello. Attorney Gail C. Bradford added to party Rick Sarcinello(pty:dft). (Bradford, Gail)
April 29, 2021 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compiance re 27 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants terminated per order. (pes)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's filing of a First Amended Complaint. #25 . The Amended Complaint moots Defendants Patrick White, Christopher Reeve, and James Hyde's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 and Defendants Indian River County Sheriff's Department and Sheriff Eric Flowers's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #10 . Further, the Amended Complaint eliminates James Hyde, Tim Crooker, Ruben Bermudez, Richard Olson, and Kesley Zorc as Defendants from this action. See #25 ; #26 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Amended Complaint #25 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 , #10 are DENIED AS MOOT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TERMINATE Defendants James Hyde, Tim Crooker, Ruben Bermudez, Richard Olson, and Kesley Zorc as parties to this action. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/29/2021. (hwr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE by Andrew Coffee IV of Dropping Parties (Defendants) (Fadley, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2021 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar, Christopher Reeve, Rick Sarcinello, Patrick White, filed by Andrew Coffee IV.(Fadley, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Trial having been set in this matter for the two week trial period beginning January 18, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Rule 16.2 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators. Designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. The parties shall agree upon a place, date, and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties and file a Notice of Scheduling Mediation no later than one hundred and ten (110) days prior to the scheduled trial date. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may motion the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The physical presence of counsel and each party or representatives of each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of those summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein, or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by filing a notice of settlement signed by the counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/27/2021. (hwr)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL IN FORT PIERCE. This case is now set for trial commencing the two week trial period of January 18, 2022 at 9 a.m. at the United States District Courthouse, 101 South U.S. Highway 1, Ft. Pierce, Florida. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on January 13, 2022 at 2 p.m., at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for January 4, 2022, at 11 a.m. The calendar call and the final pretrial conference will take place in Courtroom 13-1 (thirteenth floor), United States District Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be completed one hundred thirty (130) days prior to the date of trial. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed one hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. THE FILING BY COUNSEL OF A "NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY" BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE IS NOT PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE LOCAL RULES AND SHALL NOT BE PRESUMED TO ALTER OR MODIFY THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/27/2021. (hwr)
April 26, 2021 Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Ruben Bermudez, Tim Crooker, James Hyde, Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar, Christopher Reeve, Patrick White (Jisa, Adriana)
April 26, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Joinder by Tim Crooker re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), -Of Joinder in Defendants Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Indian River County Sheriff in his Official Capacity, Patrick White, Christopher Reeve and James Hyde's Notice of Removal [DE 1] (Jisa, Adriana)
April 26, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of Tim Crooker. Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Tim Crooker(pty:dft). (Jisa, Adriana)
April 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Deryl Loar re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM *Plaintiff's Complaint DE 1-1, Pages 6-57] MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM *Plaintiff's Complaint DE 1-1, Pages 6-57] Re: Joinder in Defendants Indian River County Sheriff's Department and Sheriff Eric Flowers (Jisa, Adriana)
April 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Ruben Bermudez re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM -Plaintiff's Complaint [DE 1-1, Pages 6-57] RE: Joinder in Defendants White, Reeve and Hyde's Motion to Dismiss. (Jisa, Adriana)
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Ruben Bermudez, Deryl Loar re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), -Of Joinder in Defendants Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Indian River County Sheriff in his official capacity, Patrick White, Christopher Reeve and James Hyde- (Jisa, Adriana)
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Striking #14 Notice of Consent to Join filed by Ruben Bermudez, Deryl Loar by Ruben Bermudez, Deryl Loar (Jisa, Adriana)
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Compliance Re: Court's Pretrial Order [DE 5] by Ruben Bermudez, James Hyde, Deryl Loar, Christopher Reeve, Patrick White re 5 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Jisa, Adriana)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 STRICKEN - NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of Ruben Bermudez, Deryl Loar (Jisa, Adriana) Modified/Stricken per DE #16 on 4/13/2021 (pes).
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of Ruben Bermudez, Deryl Loar. Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Ruben Bermudez(pty:dft). (Jisa, Adriana)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 4/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
April 9, 2021 Reset Deadlines per DE#11: Response to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Complaint [DE 1-1, Pages 6-57] and #10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 4/21/2021. Amended Complaint due by 4/28/2021. (scn)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS #9 , #10 . THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants Patrick White, Christopher Reeve, and James Hyde's ("Defendants White, Reeve, and Hyde") Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 and Defendants Indian River County Sheriff's Department and Sheriff Eric Flowers's ("Defendants Sheriff's Department and Sheriff") Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #10 . Therein, Defendants White, Reeve, and Hyde argue that the counts against them in Plaintiffs' Complaint [1-1] fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or alternatively, the lawsuit should be stayed pursuant to Florida Statute 776.085(3) and under Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971). See generally #9 . Defendants Sheriff's Department and Sheriff move to dismiss on similar grounds. See generally #10 . Without expressing any views as to the Motions' merits, the Court affords Plaintiff an opportunity to cure the purported pleading defects by granting Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to either amend their Complaint [1-1] on or before April 28, 2021, or respond to the Motions to Dismiss #9 , #10 on or before April 21, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/8/2021. (hwr)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM *Plaintiff's Complaint DE 1-1, Pages 6-57] by Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar. Responses due by 4/21/2021 (Jisa, Adriana)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM -Plaintiff's Complaint [DE 1-1, Pages 6-57] by James Hyde, Christopher Reeve, Patrick White. Responses due by 4/21/2021 (Jisa, Adriana)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Deryl Loar (Jisa, Adriana)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of James Hyde, Christopher Reeve, Patrick White (Jisa, Adriana)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SHANIEK MAYNARD. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Shaniek Maynard to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Maynard's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/6/2021. (hwr)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of a Notice of Removal. Counsel for the removing party is hereby ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to all other parties. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a Joint Scheduling Report. The report shall indicate the proposed month and year for the trial and the estimated number of days required for trial. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer, or may offer, if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (A) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (B) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address, and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report may result in remand or dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The filing of a motion to dismiss, or other motion, does not toll the time for filing a joint scheduling report. Counsel for the non-removing party must file a motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction within thirty (30) days after the filing of the Notice of Removal. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one-inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/6/2021. (hwr)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Patrick White, Christopher Reeve, Rick Sarcinello, James Hyde, Tim Crooker, Ruben Bermudez, Richard Olson and Kesley Zorc. (Jisa, Adriana)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) Modified on 4/5/2021 to correct text (jao).
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Andrew Coffee IV vs. Indian River County Sheriff's Office Department et al.,) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14577570, filed by Deryl Loar, Indian River County Sheriff's Department. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Composite Exhibit A- All filings in lower Court, #2 Exhibit B- Civil Cover Sheet)(Jisa, Adriana) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffee IV v. Indian River County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Deryl Loar
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian River County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Sarcinello
Represented By: Gail C. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Reeve
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick White
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Coffee IV
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Fadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?