Soto v. Bennets
Plaintiff: Jesus Martin Soto
Defendant: Officer Bennets
Case Number: 2:2021cv14273
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. #1 ] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before September 13, 2021, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, labeled "Amended Complaint," that cures the deficiencies identified herein. This case shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner) form) (daa)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP [ECF No. #3 ] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; On or before September 13, 2021, Plaintiff shall either pay the $402 filing fee, or he may renew his motion for leave to proceed IFP. If Plaintiff renews his motion for leave to proceed IFP, he must: a) Have the certificate concerning his prison/jail bank account completed by an officer of the institution; and, b) Attach a certified copy of his prison/jail account for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint, in accordance with the above quoted statute. This must be a full statement of all deposits and withdrawals, not just a summary. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (daa)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesus Martin Soto. (jas)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. (daa)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Bennets. Filing fee $ 402.00 (Filing fee not paid/IFP Motion not filed), filed by Jesus Martin Soto.(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Bennets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Martin Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bennets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?