King v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al (Highlands County)
Plaintiff: Christopher Sneed King
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and Attorney General, State of Florida
Case Number: 2:2021cv14396
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS re #12 Response/Reply (Other) (Attachments: #1 Transcripts T1 Motion in Limine Hearing, #2 Transcripts T2 Williams Rule Hearing, #3 Transcripts T3 Change of Plea Hearing, #4 Transcripts T4 Motion to Withdraw Plea Hearing, #5 Transcripts T5 Sentencing Hearing, #6 Transcripts T6 Jury Trial Pgs. 1-211, #7 Transcripts T6 Jury Trial Pgs. 212-465, #8 Transcripts T7 Jan 2018 PC Motion Hearing, #9 Transcripts T8 Feb 2018 PC Motion Hearing, #10 Transcripts T9 Deposition of Michael Shaffer, #11 Transcripts T10 Deposition of Shirley Whitsitt) (O'Neill, Kelly)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 APPENDIX to #12 Response/Reply (Other) by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-19, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 20-27, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 28-37)(O'Neill, Kelly)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (O'Neill, Kelly)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (O'Neill, Kelly)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254: Show Cause Response due by 10/6/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. (bb)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 6:21-cv-01058. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER transferring case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/28/2021. (SC)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Petition to the Southern District of Florida by Secretary, Department of Corrections. (O'Neill, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 9/23/2021 (SPM).
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to respond within 90 days and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Documents)(DS)
July 28, 2021 Filing FEES paid by Christopher Sneed King (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number ORL099413) (ARJ)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioner shall file an Affidavit of Indigency or other application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of this Order. The failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/13/2021. (DS)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE: Parties are required to file a Notice of a Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions), within 14 days from the date of this Notice. Signed by Deputy Clerk. (copy mailed) (AKC)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Christopher Sneed King. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SPM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al (Highlands County)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sneed King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?