Hartz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Barbara Hartz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv14418
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Brief #24 . Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by DECEMBER 29, 2021. Defendant's response/cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by JANUARY 27, 2022. Plaintiff may file a reply by FEBRUARY 10, 2022. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 11/29/2021. (jrz)
November 22, 2021 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Brief by Barbara Hartz. Responses due by 12/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Erik)
November 15, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE by Barbara Hartz Joint Notice (Berger, Erik)
November 2, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Lynn Soto on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Amy Lynn Soto added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft). (Soto, Amy)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE RE: CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Responses due by 11/15/2021) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 10/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #18 . Attorneys Karl E. Osterhout and Christopher H. Dellert are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this matter and are relieved of all further responsibility. Attorney Erik W. Berger has filed a formal notice of appearance as new counsel of record for Plaintiff going forward in this matter #16 . The Clerk of Court shall update the docket sheet accordingly. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 10/28/2021. (jrz)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
October 21, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Permit Withdraw of Karl E. Osterhout and Christopher H. Dellert by Barbara Hartz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Erik) Modified motion relief on 10/22/2021 (pcs).
October 21, 2021 Filing 17 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Christopher H Dellert and Karl E Osterhout, mailing date October 21, 2021, (pt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik William Berger on behalf of Barbara Hartz. Attorney Erik William Berger added to party Barbara Hartz(pty:pla). (Berger, Erik)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 14 Case transferred in from Washington Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-05395. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
October 8, 2021 Case has been electronically transferred to Southern District of Florida, per ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE, dkt no. 13. (TF)
October 8, 2021 Case will be sent to Southern District of Florida by electronic case transfer, per #13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE. (TF)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(TF)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Opening Brief due by 10/29/2021, Responsive Brief due by 11/26/2021, Reply Brief due by 12/10/2021. (TF)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Due to the COVID-19 crisis, the transcript filed on CM/ECF is the only transcript copy available at this time (Wolf, Leisa)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/1/2021. (KMP)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Leisa A. Wolf filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security re #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis)(Wolf, Leisa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/30/2021, (Wolf, Leisa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Leisa Wolf on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Wolf, Leisa)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Karl E Osterhout for plaintiff Barbara Hartz, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Karl Osterhout FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Barbara Hartz (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7099654 (Dellert, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (TF)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security. (KMC)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # AWAWDC-7097121) Attorney Christopher H Dellert added to party Barbara Hartz(pty:pla), filed by Barbara Hartz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dellert, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (KMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hartz
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Represented By: Christopher H. Dellert
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Represented By: Amy Lynn Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?