Hobeika v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Crystal Hobeika and Crystal Michner)
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security, Attorney General of the U.S. and United States Attorney
Case Number: 2:2022cv14001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #5 Summons Returned Executed,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ail)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Crystal Hobeika. Attorney General of the U.S. served on 2/2/2022, response/answer due 4/4/2022; Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/31/2022, response/answer due 4/1/2022. SEE DE #5 #6 and #7 IMAGES (ail)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Crystal Hobeika. United States Attorney served on 2/1/2022, response/answer due 4/4/2022. (Zakhvatayev, Mark)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Crystal Hobeika. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/31/2022, response/answer due 2/22/2022. (Zakhvatayev, Mark)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Crystal Hobeika. Attorney General of the U.S. served on 2/2/2022, response/answer due 2/23/2022. (Zakhvatayev, Mark)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (drz)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (drz)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15285890, filed by Crystal Hobeika. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Zakhvatayev, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobeika v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hobeika
Represented By: Mark V Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Michner)
Represented By: Mark V Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?