Ruiz v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Francisco J. Ruiz
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, J. Juliano, D. Butler, Rosaryo, White, John Doe 1 and John Doe 2
Case Number: 2:2022cv14047
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Compel for Discovery by Francisco J. Ruiz. Responses due by 4/15/2022 (mee)
April 1, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Local Rules and a 1983 Complaint #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens ( Responses due by 4/15/2022), by Francisco J. Ruiz. (mee)
March 30, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taren L. Castro on behalf of Rosaryo. Attorney Taren L. Castro added to party Rosaryo(pty:dft). (Castro, Taren)
March 29, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taren L. Castro on behalf of D. Butler, J. Juliano. Attorney Taren L. Castro added to party D. Butler(pty:dft), Attorney Taren L. Castro added to party J. Juliano(pty:dft). (Castro, Taren)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE MORE INFORMATION FOR SERVICE re #13 Summons Returned Unexecuted. On or before April 12, 2022, Plaintiff shall provide the first name, first initial, shield number, or other identifying information to permit the Marshal to serve the proper defendant. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (daa)
March 23, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S.Marshal as to re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Rosaryo served on 3/21/2022, response/answer due 4/11/2022. (mee)
March 23, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal as to re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 J. Juliano served on 3/18/2022, response/answer due 4/8/2022. (mee)
March 23, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 D. Butler served on 3/21/2022, response/answer due 4/11/2022. (mee)
March 23, 2022 Filing 13 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by U.S. Marshals as to Sergeant White. (mee)
March 23, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of compliance re #11 Order. Copy of Order and Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner) form mailed to Plaintiff. (daa)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND WITHOUT PREJUDICE; denying without prejudice #10 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is permitted to refile a Motion for Leave to Amend on or before 4/15/2022. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (yar)
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Leave to File An Amended Complaint #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens by Francisco J. Ruiz. Responses due by 3/30/2022 (drz)
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to D. Butler. (daa)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sergeant White. (daa)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Officer Rosaryo. (daa)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to J. Juliano. (daa)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO U.S. MARSHAL DIRECTING PERSONAL SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS BUTLER, WHITE, JULIANO, AND ROSARYO. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (daa)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP MOTION; DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN PART; PERMITTING COMPLAINT TO PROCEED IN PART. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [ECF No. #3 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Mark S. Inch is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's claim against Defendants John Doe #1 and John Doe #2 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. #1 ] can PROCEED in part, specifically, Plaintiff's excessive force claims against Defendants White, Juliano, Rosaryo, and Plaintiff's failure to intervene claim against Defendant Butler survive. A separate order will issue ordering service of the Complaint and this screening order to Defendants White, Juliano, and Rosaryo. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (daa)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francisco J. Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate, #2 Trust Fund Account Statement)(ail)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. (ail)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against D. Butler, Florida Department of Corrections, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, J. Juliano, Rosaryo, White. Filing fee $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Francisco J. Ruiz.(ail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco J. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Juliano
Represented By: Taren L. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Butler
Represented By: Taren L. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosaryo
Represented By: Taren L. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?