Trump v. Clinton et al
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump
Defendant: Hillary R. Clinton, Democratic National Committee, HFACC, Inc., DNC Services Corporation, Perkins Coie, LLC, Michael Sussman, Marc Elias, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Charles Halliday Dolan Jr., Jake Sullivan, John Podesta, Robert E. Mook, Phillipe Reines, Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson, Peter Fritsch, Nellie Ohr, Bruce Ohr, Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd., Christopher Steele, Igor Danchenko, Neustar, Inc., Rodney Joffe, James Comey, Peter Strzok, Lisa Page, Kevin Clinesmith, Andrew McCabe, John Does 1 through 10, ABC Corporations 1 through 10, United States Of America, Adam Schiff, Rod Rosenstein and Neustar Security Services
Appellant: Alina Habba, Michael T Madaio, Habba Madaio & Associates, Peter Ticktin, Jamie A Sasson and The Ticktin Law Group
Case Number: 2:2022cv14102
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Pierce Office
Presiding Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
2 Judge: Ryon M McCabe
3 Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
4 Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
5 Judge: Jared M Strauss
6 Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 324 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #321 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Michael F. Houlihan representing Sussman, Michael (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Michael Houlihan. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/28/2023. (gm1)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 323 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #320 John J. McCarthy's Motion to Withdraw / be Removed as an Interested Party from this Case. Mr. McCarthy shall be removed from this case and will no longer receive any filings per his request. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/28/2023. (gm1)
March 14, 2023 Filing 321 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael F. Houlihan for / by Michael Sussman. Responses due by 3/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Roberto)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
March 7, 2023 Filing 320 MOTION to Withdraw from This Case with Prejudice as Nunc Pro Tunc by John J. McCarthy. (Address Updated) Responses due by 3/21/2023 (ebz)
February 23, 2023 Filing 319 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #312 Notice of Appeal, filed by John J. McCarthy. Date received by USCA: 2/15/2023. USCA Case Number: 23-10536-J. (apz)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER of DISMISSAL by USCA. This appeal was erroneously docketed as to John J. McCarthy by the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals and is hereby dismissed AS TO JOHN J. MCCARTHY ONLY re #312 Notice of Appeal, filed by John J. McCarthy. USCA #23-10387-J. (apz)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 316 PAPERLESS ORDER terminating #228 Defendant Neustar, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. The claims against this defendant were dismissed by way of my Order dated September 8, 2022 (DE #267 ). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/21/2023. (kal)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER DENYING #281 Non-Party John J. McCarthy's Motion for Rule 59(e);60(b). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
February 17, 2023 Filing 315 Clerks Receipt for deposit into the registry per order of the court (DE#309) received on 2/17/2023 in the amount of $ 1,031,788.33, receipt number FLS265147. (vt)
February 16, 2023 Filing 314 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #312 Notice of Appeal, filed by John J. McCarthy. Date received by USCA: 2/15/2023. USCA Case Number: 23-10387-J. (apz)
February 15, 2023 Filing 313 CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Instructions to John J. McCarthy re #312 Notice of Appeal. (apz)
February 15, 2023 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #312 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
February 13, 2023 Filing 312 Notice of Appeal re #302 Order on Motion for Sanctions by John J. McCarthy. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (apz)
February 12, 2023 Filing 311 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Alina Habba, Habba Madaio & Associates, Donald J. Trump re #308 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Roberts, Jared)
February 9, 2023 Filing 310 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #308 Notice of Appeal, filed by Habba Madaio & Associates, Alina Habba, Donald J. Trump. Date received by USCA: 2/6/2023. USCA Case Number: 23-10387-J. (apz)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER GRANTNG UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR STAY OF FINAL ORDER AND TO APPROVE BOND TO BE PAID TO REGISTRY OF COURT: ORDER granting #307 Motion to Stay. Upon Plaintiff's deposit of $1,031,788.33 into the Court's Registry, enforcement of this Court's Order Granting Sanctions DE #302 is STAYED pending a mandate or the equivalent from the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/6/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
February 6, 2023 Filing 308 Notice of Appeal as to #302 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Alina Habba, Habba Madaio & Associates, Donald J. Trump. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16298473. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (Roberts, Jared)
February 6, 2023 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #308 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
February 3, 2023 Filing 307 MOTION to Stay re #302 Order on Motion for Sanctions And Approve Bond by Alina Habba, Habba Madaio & Associates, Donald J. Trump. Attorney Jared Joseph Roberts added to party Alina Habba(pty:a), Attorney Jared Joseph Roberts added to party Habba Madaio & Associates(pty:a). Responses due by 2/17/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, Jared)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA for want of prosecution because the appellant Jimmy Smith has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules re #173 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jimmy Smith. USCA #22-11955-J. (apz)
January 23, 2023 Filing 305 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the contact information for PHV attorneys Andrew J. Ceresney, Wendy B. Reilly, and Isabela M. Garcez re #304 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name (pt)
January 21, 2023 Filing 304 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by William R. Barzee (Barzee, William)
January 21, 2023 Filing 303 NOTICE of Striking #300 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name filed by Robert E. Mook by Robert E. Mook (Barzee, William)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting #280 Defendants' Joint Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/19/2023. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (gm1)
January 19, 2023 Filing 301 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #300 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ebz)
January 19, 2023 Filing 300 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by William R. Barzee (Barzee, William)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER of USCA. : Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Donald J. Trump is GRANTED by clerk in 22-13410, ORDER: Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellants Alina Habba, Michael T. Madaio, Habba Madaio & Associates, Peter Ticktin, Jamie A. Sasson and The Ticktin Law Group is GRANTED by clerk in 22-14099 re #275 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald J. Trump, #291 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael T Madaio, Peter Ticktin, Habba Madaio & Associates, Jamie A Sasson, The Ticktin Law Group, Alina Habba. USCA #21-13410-HH, #22-14099-J. (apz)
December 27, 2022 Filing 298 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Alina Habba, Habba Madaio & Associates, Michael T Madaio, Jamie A Sasson, The Ticktin Law Group, Peter Ticktin re #291 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Roberts, Jared)
December 15, 2022 Filing 297 RESPONSE to Motion re #280 Joint MOTION for Sanctions Corrected filed by The Ticktin Law Group. Replies due by 12/22/2022. (Ticktin, Peter)
December 15, 2022 Filing 296 NOTICE of Striking #294 Response to Motion filed by The Ticktin Law Group by Habba Madaio & Associates, The Ticktin Law Group, Donald J. Trump (Kesl, Garrett)
December 15, 2022 Filing 295 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #294 Response to Motion. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ebz)
December 15, 2022 Filing 294 STRICKEN. RESPONSE to Motion re #280 Joint MOTION for Sanctions (Corrected) filed by The Ticktin Law Group. Attorney Garrett Edward Kesl added to party The Ticktin Law Group(pty:a). Replies due by 12/22/2022. (Kesl, Garrett) Modified per DE #296 Notice of Striking on 12/16/2022 (ebz).
December 13, 2022 Filing 293 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #291 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael T Madaio, Peter Ticktin, Habba Madaio & Associates, Jamie A Sasson, The Ticktin Law Group, Alina Habba. Date received by USCA: 12/9/2022. USCA Case Number: 22-14099-J. (apz)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 SUA SPONTE ORDER REQUIRING CORRECTED OBJECTIONS TO FEES Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan)
December 12, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #291 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 9, 2022 Filing 291 Notice of Appeal as to #284 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Alina Habba, Michael T Madaio, Habba Madaio & Associates, Peter Ticktin, Jamie A Sasson, The Ticktin Law Group. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16161429. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (Roberts, Jared)
December 5, 2022 Filing 290 Letter from Barabara L. Wardwell. (ebz)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR STAY OF FINAL ORDER AND TO APPROVE BOND TO BE PAID TO REGISTRY OF COURT: ORDER Granting #288 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 288 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay re #284 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 12/12/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Attorney's Unopposed Motion for Stay of Final Order and to Approve Bond to be Paid to Registry of Court)(Ticktin, Peter)
November 21, 2022 Filing 287 REPLY to #280 Joint MOTION for Sanctions by Hillary R. Clinton. (Markus, David)
November 15, 2022 Filing 286 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #282 Notice of Appeal, filed by John J. McCarthy. Date received by USCA: 11/9/2022. USCA Case Number: 22-13791-J. (apz)
November 14, 2022 Filing 285 RESPONSE in Opposition re #280 Joint MOTION for Sanctions filed by Donald J. Trump. Attorney Garrett Edward Kesl added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:pla). Replies due by 11/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kesl, Garrett)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting #268 Defendant Charles Dolan's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (gm1)
November 9, 2022 Filing 283 CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Instructions to John J. McCarthy re #282 Notice of Appeal. (apz)
November 9, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #282 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
November 8, 2022 Filing 282 Notice of Appeal re #278 Order Striking by John J. McCarthy. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (apz)
November 8, 2022 Filing 281 MOTION for Rule 59(e); 60(b) by John J. McCarthy re DE #278 Order . Responses due by 11/22/2022 (apz) Modified text on 11/9/2022 (apz).
October 31, 2022 Filing 280 Joint MOTION for Sanctions by Hillary R. Clinton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 2-12 Declarations in Support of Motion for Sanctions)(Markus, David)
October 25, 2022 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Donald J. Trump re #275 Notice of Appeal,, #272 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Roberts, Jared)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER STRIKING MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF re #271 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by John J. McCarthy Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
October 18, 2022 Filing 277 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #275 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald J. Trump. Date received by USCA: 10/11/2022. USCA Case Number: 22-13410-J. (apz)
October 12, 2022 Filing 276 REPLY to Response to Motion re #268 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.. (Levine, Jonathan)
October 12, 2022 Filing 275 Corrected Notice of Appeal as to #267 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Donald J. Trump. Filing fee $ 505.00. No Filing Fee Required. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Roberts, Jared)
October 12, 2022 Filing 274 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Joseph Roberts on behalf of Donald J. Trump. Attorney Jared Joseph Roberts added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:pla). (Roberts, Jared)
October 12, 2022 Transmission of Corrected Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #275 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
October 11, 2022 Filing 273 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #272 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald J. Trump. Document was filed conventionally that should have been filed electronically (CM/ECF Administrative Procedures). Document missing required signature(s) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a)). (apz)
October 11, 2022 Filing 272 Notice of Appeal re #267 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Donald J. Trump. Filing fee $ 505.00 Receipt#: 3042. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (apz)
October 11, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #272 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
October 6, 2022 Filing 271 Omnibus MOTION Many Things Motion Herein, Motion Nunc Pro Tunc by John J. McCarthy. (pcs)
October 5, 2022 Filing 270 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #268 MOTION for Sanctions by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Alina Habba, #2 Exhibit Danchenko Indictment, #3 Exhibit Government Opposition to MTD)(Ticktin, Peter)
September 21, 2022 Filing 269 NOTICE by Charles Halliday Dolan Jr. re #268 MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 Sanctions Motion Praecipe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoices) (Levine, Jonathan)
September 21, 2022 Filing 268 MOTION for Sanctions by Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit May 31, 2022 Letter, #2 Exhibit Dolan Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Jonathan)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #224 the United States' Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule 12(b)(1); granting #225 and #227 Defendants Charles Halliday Dolan, Jr. and Rodney Joffe's Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; granting #226 Defendants Hillary Clinton, HFACC, Inc., John Podesta, Robert Mook, Jake Sullivan, DNC, DNC Services Corporation, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Perkins Coie LLP, Marc Elias, Michael Sussman, Charles Halliday Dolan, Jr., Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson, Peter Fritsch, Nellie Ohr, Bruce Ohr, Igor Danchenko, Rodney Joffe, Neustar Security Services and Neustar Inc.'s Joint Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule 12(b)(6); granting #256 United States' Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule 12(b)(1); granting #260 Defendant Orbis Business Intelligence Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiff's #238 and #265 Motions to Set Aside Government's Certification. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #177 is dismissed with prejudice as to the Non-Federal Defendants Under Rule 12(b)(6) and without prejudice as to the United States Under Rule 12(b)(1). I reserve jurisdiction to adjudicate issues pertaining to sanctions. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (gm1)
September 8, 2022 Filing 266 Defendant's REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd.. (Lett, Enjolique)
September 6, 2022 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #258 Reply to Response to Motion, to Dismiss by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ticktin, Peter)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER extending deadline for Plaintiff to respond to #256 United States' Motion to Substitute and Dismiss. Plaintiff may file a response on or by September 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (kal)
September 1, 2022 Filing 263 DECLARATION OF TAKING of Alina Habba by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ticktin, Peter)
September 1, 2022 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #260 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ticktin, Peter)
September 1, 2022 Filing 261 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, with a response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 as determined by the attorney/filer of 08/09/2022 by Donald J. Trump. Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd. served on 7/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process)(Ticktin, Peter)
August 18, 2022 Filing 260 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd.. Responses due by 9/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lett, Enjolique)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTIES. The United States' Motion to Substitute and Dismiss DE #256 is GRANTED IN PART and I will DEFER RULING IN PART. It is granted with respect to the United States' substitution argument, and I will defer ruling on the United States' dismissal argument. Defendants Adam Schiff and Rod Rosenstein are DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 18, 2022 Filing 258 REPLY to Response to Motion re #224 MOTION to Substitute Party (Comey, McCabe, Clinesmith, Page, and Strzok) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by United States Of America. (Terrell, Stephen)
August 18, 2022 Filing 257 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Orbis Business International Ltd. for Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd. (Lett, Enjolique)
August 18, 2022 Filing 256 MOTION to Substitute Party (United States for Adam Schiff and Rod Rosenstein) ( Responses due by 9/1/2022), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Westfall Act Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Clouse Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Jenkins Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Terrell, Stephen)
August 16, 2022 Filing 255 Corrected REPLY to Response to Motion re #226 MOTION TO DISMISS #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #228 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Neustar, Inc.. (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
August 15, 2022 Filing 254 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil re #253 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in all pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
August 15, 2022 Filing 253 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil (Gilcrist Sainvil, Akiesha)
August 11, 2022 Filing 252 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #226 MOTION TO DISMISS #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #228 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Neustar, Inc.. (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
August 11, 2022 Filing 251 REPLY to Response to Motion re #225 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.. (Levine, Jonathan)
August 11, 2022 Filing 250 REPLY to Response to Motion re #226 MOTION TO DISMISS #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hillary R. Clinton. (Markus, David)
August 11, 2022 Filing 249 REPLY to Response to Motion re #227 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Rodney Joffe. (Soto, Edward)
August 11, 2022 Filing 248 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil on behalf of Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd.. Attorney Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil added to party Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd. (pty:dft). (Gilcrist Sainvil, Akiesha)
August 9, 2022 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd. response/answer due 8/18/2022. Per DE 247 Order. (ebz)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #246 Defendant Orbis Business Intelligence Ltd.'s Motion to Set Response Deadline to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant Orbis requests that I set a deadline for it to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (DE #177 ), and that I make the deadline September 2, 2022. While I find good cause to grant the Motion in part and set a deadline for Defendant Orbis to respond, I also find that September 2, 2022 is not an appropriate deadline in light of how long this case has been pending, the Motion's vague language about when Orbis learned of this action, and the fact that the arguments Orbis will raise will likely be duplicative of those raised by the other Defendants in their Joint Motion to Dismiss (DE #226 ). As such, I will set Defendant Orbis's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (DE #177 ) as on or before August 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/9/2022. (jnk)
August 9, 2022 Filing 246 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd.. Attorney Enjolique Aytch Lett added to party Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd. (pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purported Service Documents, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lett, Enjolique)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #244 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Moving Defendants request ten extra pages for their joint reply brief, for a total of twenty pages. Based on the complex nature of this case, I find good cause to grant the relief requested. Accordingly, the Moving Defendants may file a reply brief in support of their Motion to Dismiss not to exceed twenty pages. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/8/2022. (jnk)
August 8, 2022 Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Hillary R. Clinton. (Markus, David)
August 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #242 the United States' Unopposed Expedited Motion for Enlargement of Time. The United States' deadline to reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss is August 11, 2022, and its deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside the Government's Westfall Act Certification is August 18, 2022. The United States seeks to extend these deadlines to August 25, 2022, citing that counsel has a pre-planned and pre-scheduled vacation from August 8 to August 12, 2022. Based on counsel's vacation plans, I find good cause to grant the United States' Motion in part and extend its deadline to reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss to August 18, 2022. However, because counsel's vacation plans still allow sufficient time for the United States to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside the Government's Westfall Act Certification, the United States' Motion is denied with respect to that request. Accordingly, the United States' deadline to both reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss and respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside the Government's Westfall Act Certification is August 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/6/2022. (jnk)
August 5, 2022 Filing 242 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #238 Memorandum, (Expedited) by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Service)(Terrell, Stephen)
August 4, 2022 Filing 241 RESPONSE to Motion re #225 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Donald J. Trump. Replies due by 8/11/2022. (Ticktin, Peter)
August 4, 2022 Filing 240 RESPONSE to Motion re #228 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Donald J. Trump. Replies due by 8/11/2022. (Ticktin, Peter)
August 4, 2022 Filing 239 RESPONSE to Motion re #227 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Donald J. Trump. Replies due by 8/11/2022. (Ticktin, Peter)
August 4, 2022 Filing 238 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #224 MOTION to Substitute Party (Comey, McCabe, Clinesmith, Page, and Strzok) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ticktin, Peter)
August 4, 2022 Filing 237 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #226 MOTION TO DISMISS #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Alina Habba, Esquire, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ticktin, Peter)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO EXTEND TRIAL DATE re #233 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 22, 2022 Filing 235 RESPONSE in Opposition re #233 MOTION to Continue re #39 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, filed by Hillary R. Clinton. Replies due by 7/29/2022. (Markus, David)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTIES. The United States' Motion to Substitute and Dismiss DE #224 is GRANTED IN PART and I will DEFER RULING IN PART. It is granted with respect to the United States' substitution argument, and I will defer ruling on the United States' dismissal argument. The United States is SUBSTITUTED as defendant for James Corney, Andrew McCabe, Peter Strzok, Lisa Page, and Kevin Clinesmith. Defendants James Corney, Andrew McCabe, Peter Strzok, Lisa Page, and Kevin Clinesmith are DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 21, 2022 Filing 233 MOTION to Continue re #39 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, by Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 8/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Peter Ticktin in Support of Motion to Extend Trial Date as Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Report as Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order, as Exhibit "C")(Ticktin, Peter)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #231 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (DEs #224 , #225 , #226 , #227 , #228 ) is July 28, 2022. He seeks a two-week extension of this deadline, citing the "complex nature of the case" and counsels' other trials the week of July 25, 2022. Defendants also seek leave to file a 55-page response to Defendant Clinton's Motion to Dismiss (DE #226 ). I find good cause to allow Plaintiff the same number of pages I allowed Defendants. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion is granted with respect to his request to file a 55-page response. As to an extension of time, Plaintiff's Motion is granted only in part. Based on counsels' upcoming trials, I find good cause to extend Plaintiff's deadline to respond to August 4, 2022. But because the arguments in the recently-filed Motions to Dismiss are largely the same as those raised in Defendants' previous motions, a longer extension is not warranted. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/21/2022. (jnk)
July 21, 2022 Filing 231 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #226 MOTION TO DISMISS #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #227 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, , #228 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, , #225 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time)(Ticktin, Peter)
July 21, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #225 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, , #226 MOTION TO DISMISS #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #227 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, , #224 MOTION to Substitute Party (Comey, McCabe, Clinesmith, Page, and Strzok) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, , #228 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, . Per DE 232 Order. Responses due by 8/4/2022 (ebz)
July 20, 2022 Filing 230 NOTICE by United States Of America re #181 Summons Issued, #197 Summons Returned Executed, #198 Summons Returned Executed, of Receipt of Service of Summonses and Amended Complaint (Terrell, Stephen)
July 15, 2022 Filing 229 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Peter Strzok served on 7/2/2022, response/answer due 7/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Peter Strzok)(Ticktin, Peter)
July 14, 2022 Filing 228 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by Neustar, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2022 (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
July 14, 2022 Filing 227 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by Rodney Joffe. Responses due by 7/28/2022 (Soto, Edward)
July 14, 2022 Filing 226 MOTION TO DISMISS #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hillary R. Clinton. Responses due by 7/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Markus, David)
July 14, 2022 Filing 225 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.. Responses due by 7/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Declaration)(Levine, Jonathan)
July 14, 2022 Filing 224 MOTION to Substitute Party (Comey, McCabe, Clinesmith, Page, and Strzok) ( Responses due by 7/28/2022), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by United States Of America. Attorney Stephen R. Terrell added to party United States Of America(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R. Terrell added to party United States Of America(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Westfall Act Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Crum Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certification of Service)(Terrell, Stephen)
July 12, 2022 Filing 223 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Lisa Page served on 7/7/2022, response/answer due 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Lisa Page)(Ticktin, Peter)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #219 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Allison S. Eisen. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/12/2022. (jnk)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #218 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kathryn E. Garza. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/12/2022. (jnk)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #217 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney John M. McNichols. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/12/2022. (jnk)
July 12, 2022 Filing 219 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Allison S. Eisen. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15781318 by Neustar Security Services. Responses due by 7/26/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillenwater, James)
July 12, 2022 Filing 218 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kathryn E. Garza. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15781307 by Neustar Security Services. Responses due by 7/26/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillenwater, James)
July 12, 2022 Filing 217 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John M. McNichols. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15781263 by Neustar Security Services. Responses due by 7/26/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillenwater, James)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #215 Defendants Perkins Coie, LLP, Rodney Joffe, Neustar, Inc., and Charles Halliday Dolan, Jr.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The Moving Defendants represent that the twenty-one served non-federal defendants intend to file a Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and request thirty-five additional pages to do so. Based on the voluminous nature of the Complaint and the Court's interest in a unified response, I find good cause to grant the Motion. Accordingly, the served non-federal defendants may file a Joint Motion to Dismiss not to exceed 55 pages. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/11/2022. (jnk)
July 11, 2022 Filing 215 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Perkins Coie, LLC. (Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #212 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Redact the Notice of Filing Proposed Summons. The Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE AND REMOVE Docket Entry #179 from the record. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/11/2022. (kal)
July 9, 2022 Filing 213 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Evans Gillenwater on behalf of Neustar Security Services. Attorney James Evans Gillenwater added to party Neustar Security Services(pty:dft). (Gillenwater, James)
July 8, 2022 Filing 212 REDACTION to #179 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Unopposed Motion to Redact Notice of Filing Proposed Summons by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ticktin, Peter)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING IN PART NON-PARTY UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME. The United States' Motion for Enlargement of Time DE #205 is GRANTED IN PART. It is granted insofar as the deadline for the Original Federal Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint (DE 177) is extended to July 14, 2022. It is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 7/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (bms)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 7/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (bms)
July 1, 2022 Filing 208 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court's Order on June 28, 2022 by Donald J. Trump (Ticktin, Peter)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Michael Bosworth's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Michael Sussman (DE 202) is GRANTED. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Michael Bosworth. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER DENYING NON-PARTY JIMMY SMITH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #193 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 1, 2022 Filing 205 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #203 Defendant Hillary Rodham Clinton's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed on behalf of Defendants. Defendant Clinton requests a two-week extension of Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (DE #177 ), citing that the intervening Fourth of July holiday has complicated communications among the various defense counsel in this matter. Plaintiff does not oppose the relief requested. Based on the holiday, and in the interest of allowing Defendants to file a streamlined Motion, I find good cause to grant Defendant Clinton's Motion in part. Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to July 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/1/2022. (jnk)
July 1, 2022 Filing 203 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by Hillary R. Clinton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Markus, David)
July 1, 2022 Filing 202 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael S. Bosworth for / by Michael Sussman. Responses due by 7/15/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Roberto)
July 1, 2022 Filing 201 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Neustar Security Services served on 6/29/2022, response/answer due 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Neustar Security Services)(Ticktin, Peter)
July 1, 2022 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: ABC Corporations 1 through 10 response/answer due 7/14/2022; Kevin Clinesmith response/answer due 7/14/2022; Hillary R. Clinton response/answer due 7/14/2022; James Comey response/answer due 7/14/2022; DNC Services Corporation response/answer due 7/14/2022; Igor Danchenko response/answer due 7/14/2022; Democratic National Committee response/answer due 7/14/2022; Charles Halliday Dolan Jr. response/answer due 7/14/2022; Marc Elias response/answer due 7/14/2022; Peter Fritsch response/answer due 7/14/2022; Fusion GPS response/answer due 7/14/2022; HFACC, Inc. response/answer due 7/14/2022; Rodney Joffe response/answer due 7/14/2022; John Does 1 through 10 response/answer due 7/14/2022; Andrew McCabe response/answer due 7/14/2022; Robert E. Mook response/answer due 7/14/2022; Neustar Security Services response/answer due 7/14/2022; Neustar, Inc. response/answer due 7/14/2022; Bruce Ohr response/answer due 7/14/2022; Nellie Ohr response/answer due 7/14/2022; Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd. response/answer due 7/14/2022; Lisa Page response/answer due 7/14/2022; Perkins Coie, LLC response/answer due 7/14/2022; John Podesta response/answer due 7/14/2022; Phillipe Reines response/answer due 7/14/2022; Rod Rosenstein response/answer due 7/14/2022; Adam Schiff response/answer due 7/14/2022; Debbie Wasserman Schultz response/answer due 7/14/2022; Glenn Simpson response/answer due 7/14/2022; Christopher Steele response/answer due 7/14/2022; Peter Strzok response/answer due 7/14/2022; Jake Sullivan response/answer due 7/14/2022; Michael Sussman response/answer due 7/14/2022; United States Of America response/answer due 7/14/2022. Per DE 204 Order. (ebz)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER ON THE PARTIES' PROPOSED JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSE TIME TO AMENDED COMPLAINT re #199 Stipulation, is DENIED Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 30, 2022 Filing 199 STIPULATION re #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, Joint Stipulation Regarding Response Time to Amended Complaint by Hillary R. Clinton (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Markus, David)
June 30, 2022 Filing 198 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Adam Schiff served on 6/28/2022, response/answer due 7/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process and Email from Douglas Letter accepting service)(Ticktin, Peter)
June 30, 2022 Filing 197 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Rod Rosenstein served on 6/28/2022, response/answer due 7/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of service and Email confirming service of Amended Complaint)(Ticktin, Peter)
June 30, 2022 Filing 196 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process)(Ticktin, Peter)
June 29, 2022 Filing 195 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. James Comey served on 4/1/2022, response/answer due 4/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service on James Comey, #2 Exhibit Email from Samuel Hendrix accepting service on behalf of James Comey)(Ticktin, Peter)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Requiring Status Report: Status Report due by 7/1/2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #189 Unopposed Motion to Redact the Address of Rod Rosenstein, a Former Employee of the Department of Justice, from the Public Record re #181 Summons Issued. Directing Clerk of Court to Strike and Remove Docket Entry 181-1 from the record. Plaintiff's Redacted Version due 7/1/2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
June 27, 2022 Filing 189 Unopposed MOTION to Redact the Address of Rod Rosenstein, a Former Employee of the Department of Justice, from the Public Record re #181 Summons Issued by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ticktin, Peter) Modified Text on 6/27/2022 (ls).
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. To the extent that the allegations against certain Defendants, and therefore the arguments relied on by those Defendants in support of dismissal, remain unchanged, and in the interest of reducing costs in this action, Defendants are advised that they may readopt their prior Motions to Dismiss if they so choose. Moreover, to the extent that the various Defendants seek to raise the same arguments, they are encouraged to consolidate their responses where appropriate. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER. In light of the Amended Complaint, Defendants' currently pending Motions to Dismiss, listed below, are DENIED AS MOOT: #52 Motion to Dismiss; #124 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #139 Motion to Dismiss; #141 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #143 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #144 Motion to Dismiss; #145 Motion to Dismiss; #146 Motion to Dismiss; #147 Motion to Dismiss; #149 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #157 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #159 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #160 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #162 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #163 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #165 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 PAPERLESS Order Cancelling the Status Conference previously scheduled for July 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/22/2022. (hk02)
June 22, 2022 Filing 184 Summons Issued as to Neustar Security Services. (ebz)
June 22, 2022 Filing 183 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Donald J. Trump re #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Donald J. Trump (Ticktin, Peter)
June 22, 2022 Filing 182 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Neustar Security Services. (Ticktin, Peter)
June 22, 2022 Filing 181 Summons Issued as to Rod Rosenstein, Adam Schiff. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
June 21, 2022 Filing 180 Clerks Notice to Filer re #177 Amended Complaint. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the amended complaint. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (ebz)
June 21, 2022 Filing 179 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Donald J. Trump re #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Donald J. Trump (Ticktin, Peter)
June 21, 2022 Filing 178 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Donald J. Trump re #177 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by Donald J. Trump (Ticktin, Peter)
June 21, 2022 Filing 177 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC Corporations 1 through 10, Kevin Clinesmith, Hillary R. Clinton, James Comey, DNC Services Corporation, Igor Danchenko, Democratic National Committee, Charles Halliday Dolan Jr., Marc Elias, Peter Fritsch, Fusion GPS, HFACC, Inc., Rodney Joffe, John Does 1 through 10, Andrew McCabe, Robert E. Mook, Neustar, Inc., Bruce Ohr, Nellie Ohr, Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd., Lisa Page, Perkins Coie, LLC, John Podesta, Phillipe Reines, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Glenn Simpson, Christopher Steele, Peter Strzok, Jake Sullivan, Michael Sussman, United States Of America, Adam Schiff, Rod Rosenstein, filed by Donald J. Trump.(Ticktin, Peter)
June 17, 2022 Filing 176 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #173 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jimmy Smith. Date received by USCA: 6/10/22. USCA Case Number: 22-11955-J. (vjk)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting a Status Conference for 7/6/2022 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.The July 6th Status Conference will be held in Courtroom 2 of the U.S. Courthouse located at 701 Clematis Street in West Palm Beach, Florida. Anyone may attend the status conference in person. In the alternative, counsel may appear remotely via Zoom using the same link previously provided. Only counsel will be permitted to attend the status conference via Zoom. Members of the public or press may listen to the audio of the conference using the following telephone link:Dial by your location: +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) Meeting ID: 160 751 8992; Passcode: 717319. Find your local number: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/aeEkZDMCbU. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/4/2022. (hk02) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/14/2022. (hk02) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 174 CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Transcript Information Form to Jimmy Smith re #173 Notice of Appeal. (apz)
June 7, 2022 Filing 173 Notice of Appeal re #126 Order Striking by Jimmy Smith. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (apz)
June 7, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #173 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re #171 Motion for Reconsideration by Jimmy Smith. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 3, 2022 Filing 171 MOTION to Reconsider Judge Middlebrooks' Order re #126 Order Striking by Jimmy Smith. (Address Updated) (ebz) Modified text on 6/3/2022 (ebz).
June 2, 2022 Filing 170 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Status Conference held on 6/2/2022. Total time in court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hk02)
June 2, 2022 Filing 169 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Donald J. Trump for dates of June 2nd to June 6th; August 3rd to August 8th and August 18th to August 31st of 2022 (Sasson, Jamie)
June 1, 2022 Filing 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Andrew Lipshultz on behalf of Michael Sussman. Attorney Zachary Andrew Lipshultz added to party Michael Sussman(pty:dft). (Lipshultz, Zachary)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #166 the parties' Joint Motion to Adjourn the Status Conference to be held on 6/2/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/31/2022. (hk02)
May 31, 2022 Filing 166 Joint MOTION Adjourn Status Conference re 123 Order Setting Status Conference,,,, by Hillary R. Clinton. (Markus, David)
May 25, 2022 Filing 165 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, by Jake Sullivan. Responses due by 6/8/2022 (Barzee, William)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. ORDER granting #158 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez added. Attorney Alexandria N Epps representing Neustar, Inc. (Defendant) terminated. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (amb)
May 23, 2022 Filing 163 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, #162 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss by Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.. Responses due by 6/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dolan Declaration, #2 Exhibit Danchenko Indictment)(Levine, Jonathan)
May 23, 2022 Filing 162 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.. Responses due by 6/6/2022 (Levine, Jonathan)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #156 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Samantha L. Southall. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/23/2022. (kal)
May 20, 2022 Filing 160 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Neustar, Inc.. Responses due by 6/3/2022 (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
May 20, 2022 Filing 159 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Igor Danchenko. Responses due by 6/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Inspector General Report)(Fassbender, Diana)
May 20, 2022 Filing 158 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez, Esquire for Alexandria N. Epps by Neustar, Inc.. Responses due by 6/3/2022 (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
May 20, 2022 Filing 157 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum of Law by Rodney Joffe. Responses due by 6/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trump Declaration)(Soto, Edward)
May 20, 2022 Filing 156 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Samantha L. Southall, Esquire. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15656205 by Neustar, Inc.. Attorney Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez added to party Neustar, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Samantha L. Southall, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
May 17, 2022 Filing 155 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HFACC, Inc. (Pinto, Paola)
May 17, 2022 Filing 154 NOTICE of Striking #150 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by HFACC, Inc. by HFACC, Inc. (Pinto, Paola)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #151 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff seeks an extension of time to respond to the recently filed Motions to Dismiss in this matter (DE #139 , DE #141 , DE #143 , DE #144 , DE #145 , DE #146 , DE #147 ). For the same reasons articulated in my Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Hillary Clinton's Motion to Dismiss (DE #111 ), Plaintiff's Motion (DE #151 ) is granted. In the interest of efficiency, I will also sua sponte extend Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant HFACC's Motion to Dismiss (DE #149 ), and any future motions to dismiss filed by the Defendants, until June 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/17/2022. (kal)
May 16, 2022 Filing 152 Clerks Notice to Filer re #150 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ebz)
May 16, 2022 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #143 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Perkins Coie LLP's Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule 12(B)(6) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #141 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum of Law in Support, #146 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, , #144 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, , #145 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, , #147 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, UNDER FEDERAL RULE 12(B)(6), #139 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ticktin, Peter)
May 16, 2022 Filing 150 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HFACC, Inc. (Pinto, Paola)
May 16, 2022 Filing 149 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HFACC, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2022 (Pinto, Paola)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #137 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant John Podesta's Motion to Dismiss (DE #124 ). For the same reasons articulated in my Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Hillary Clinton's Motion to Dismiss (DE #111 ), Plaintiff's Motion (DE #137 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/12/2022. (kal)
May 11, 2022 Filing 147 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, UNDER FEDERAL RULE 12(B)(6) by Marc Elias. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mueller Report)(Pettis, Eugene)
May 11, 2022 Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, by Michael Sussman. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Martinez, Roberto)
May 11, 2022 Filing 145 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, by Robert E. Mook. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Barzee, William)
May 11, 2022 Filing 144 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, by Nellie Ohr. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Fels, Adam)
May 11, 2022 Filing 143 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Perkins Coie LLP's Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule 12(B)(6) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Perkins Coie, LLC. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Excerpts from IG Report))(Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
May 11, 2022 Filing 142 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DNC Services Corporation, Democratic National Committee (Greenberg, Gerald)
May 11, 2022 Filing 141 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum of Law in Support by DNC Services Corporation, Democratic National Committee, Debbie Wasserman Schultz. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Greenberg, Gerald)
May 11, 2022 Filing 140 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Fusion GPS (Fels, Adam)
May 11, 2022 Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, by Peter Fritsch, Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Fels, Adam)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #134 and #135 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Brian L. Stekloff and Sarah E. Neuman. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/10/2022. (kal)
May 10, 2022 Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #124 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ticktin, Peter)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #128 , #130 , #131 , and #132 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Stephen Barry, Sean Berkowitz, Michael Bosworth, and Michael Houlihan. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/9/2022. (kal)
May 9, 2022 Filing 135 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sarah E. Neuman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15622146 by Jake Sullivan. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barzee, William)
May 9, 2022 Filing 134 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian L. Stekloff. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15622123 by Jake Sullivan. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barzee, William)
May 9, 2022 Filing 133 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William R. Barzee on behalf of Jake Sullivan. Attorney William R. Barzee added to party Jake Sullivan(pty:dft). (Barzee, William)
May 6, 2022 Filing 132 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael Houlihan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15618905 by Michael Sussman. Responses due by 5/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Roberto)
May 6, 2022 Filing 131 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael Bosworth. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15618882 by Michael Sussman. Responses due by 5/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Roberto)
May 6, 2022 Filing 130 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sean Berkowitz. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15618873 by Michael Sussman. Responses due by 5/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Roberto)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #127 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Roberta A. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/6/2022. (kal)
May 6, 2022 Filing 128 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stephen Barry. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15618815 by Michael Sussman. Responses due by 5/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Roberto)
May 5, 2022 Filing 127 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Roberta A. Kaplan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15616626 by DNC Services Corporation, Democratic National Committee, Debbie Wasserman Schultz. Responses due by 5/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV of Roberta A. Kaplan)(Greenberg, Gerald)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER STRIKING MOTION TO INTERVENE re #119 Motion to Intervene filed by Jimmy Smith. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #120 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Robert P. Trout. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/4/2022. (kal)
May 4, 2022 Filing 124 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Podesta. Responses due by 5/18/2022 (Pinto, Paola)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Status Conference: a Status Conference Re: Scheduling/Deadlines/Procedural Matters is hereby set for 6/2/2022 at 2:00 PM in the West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the scheduling of the Rule 16 conference.The June 2nd Status Conference will be held in Courtroom 2 of the U.S. Courthouse located at 701 Clematis Street in West Palm Beach, Florida. Anyone may attend the status conference in person. In the alternative, counsel may appear remotely via Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom link to counsel in advance of the conference. Only counsel will be permitted to attend the status conference via Zoom. Members of the public or press may listen to the audio of the conference using the following telephone link: Dial by your location: +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) Meeting ID: 160 751 8992; Passcode: 717319. Find your local number: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/aeEkZDMCbU. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/4/2022. (hk02)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #116 , #117 , and #118 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Wendy B. Reilly, Isabela M. Garcez, and Andrew J. Ceresney. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/3/2022. (kal)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #115 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Maximillian Feldman. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/3/2022. (kal)
May 3, 2022 Filing 120 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert P. Trout. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15609103 by HFACC, Inc., John Podesta. Attorney Paola Pinto added to party HFACC, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paola Pinto added to party John Podesta(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pinto, Paola)
May 3, 2022 Filing 119 MOTION to Intervene by Jimmy Smith. (ebz)
May 2, 2022 Filing 118 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew J. Ceresney. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15604897 by Robert E. Mook. Responses due by 5/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barzee, William)
May 2, 2022 Filing 117 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Isabela M. Garcez. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15604840 by Robert E. Mook. Responses due by 5/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barzee, William)
May 2, 2022 Filing 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Wendy B. Reilly. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15604719 by Robert E. Mook. Responses due by 5/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barzee, William)
April 29, 2022 Filing 115 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Maximillian Feldman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15602245 by DNC Services Corporation, Democratic National Committee, Debbie Wasserman Schultz. Responses due by 5/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV of Maximillian Feldman.)(Greenberg, Gerald)
April 29, 2022 Filing 114 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S UNOPPOSED SECOND re #84 MOTION To redact addresses from public record and preclude further filing of the addresses on the public record filed by United States Of America. (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) Modified text on 4/29/2022 (ebz).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #106 , #107 , #108 , and #109 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys F. Joseph Warin, Geoffrey M. Sigler, Katherine Moran Meeks, and Nancy E. Hart. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/29/2022. (kal)
April 28, 2022 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION To redact addresses from public record and preclude further filing of the addresses on the public record filed by Donald J. Trump. Replies due by 5/5/2022. (Ticktin, Peter)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME re #66 Motion to Expedite. Amended Complaint due by 6/20/2022. Responses due by 6/20/2022 Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT KEVIN E. CLINESMITH'S MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DEADLINE re #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Kevin Clinesmith. Response/Answer due 6/27/2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 27, 2022 Filing 109 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nancy E. Hart. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15595571 by Perkins Coie, LLC. Responses due by 5/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Attorney Nancy E. Hart, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
April 27, 2022 Filing 108 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Katherine Moran Meeks. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15595567 by Perkins Coie, LLC. Responses due by 5/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Attorney Katherine Moran Meeks, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
April 27, 2022 Filing 107 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Geoffrey M. Sigler. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15595563 by Perkins Coie, LLC. Responses due by 5/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Attorney Geoffrey M. Sigler, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
April 27, 2022 Filing 106 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for F. Joseph Warin. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15595561 by Perkins Coie, LLC. Responses due by 5/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Attorney F. Joseph Warin, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #93 , #96 , and #97 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Steven Tyrrell, Christopher Muha, and William Pittard. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/27/2022. (kal)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #92 Defendant Rodney Joffe's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Joffe's deadline to respond to the Complaint is May 11, 2022. Defendant Joffe seeks a nine-day extension until May 20, 2022, citing the extensive nature of the Complaint and that more time will allow an opportunity to coordinate with counsel for other Defendants to minimize duplication. I find good cause to grant the Motion. Accordingly, Defendant Joffe's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to May 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/27/2022. (kal)
April 27, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard Jay Harrington on behalf of Perkins Coie, LLC. Attorney Howard Jay Harrington added to party Perkins Coie, LLC(pty:dft). (Harrington, Howard)
April 27, 2022 Filing 102 RESPONSE to Motion re #66 MOTION to Expedite filed by Hillary R. Clinton. Replies due by 5/4/2022. (Markus, David)
April 27, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE of Striking #89 Response to Motion filed by Hillary R. Clinton by Hillary R. Clinton (Markus, David)
April 27, 2022 Filing 100 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Noah Hy Brozinsky (Brozinsky, Noah)
April 26, 2022 Filing 98 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #45 Summons Returned Executed, by Kevin Clinesmith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brozinsky, Noah)
April 26, 2022 Filing 97 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William Pittard. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15591820 by Kevin Clinesmith. Responses due by 5/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order William Pittard)(Brozinsky, Noah)
April 26, 2022 Filing 96 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher Muha. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15591802 by Kevin Clinesmith. Attorney Noah Hy Brozinsky added to party Kevin Clinesmith(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brozinsky, Noah)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING SECOND MOTION TO REDACT. The United States' Second Motion to Redact DE #84 Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND RULING IS RESERVED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks redaction of the documents nowin the court file. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE and REMOVE Docket Entries 28, 28-1, 45, and 45-1 from the record. These items shall be substituted with the redacted versions filed by the government. On or before April 28, 2022, Plaintiff SHALL RESPOND to that portion of the United States' Motion which sets forth a suggested procedure for handling future improper disclosures of addresses in court documents. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #88 and #90 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys George R.A. Doumar and Shawn G. Crowley. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/26/2022. (kal)
April 26, 2022 Filing 93 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven Tyrrell. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15589786 by Rodney Joffe. Responses due by 5/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Edward)
April 26, 2022 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by Rodney Joffe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Edward)
April 26, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Soto on behalf of Rodney Joffe. Attorney Edward Soto added to party Rodney Joffe(pty:dft). (Soto, Edward)
April 26, 2022 Filing 90 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Shawn G. Crowley. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-15589054. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by DNC Services Corporation, Democratic National Committee, Debbie Wasserman Schultz. Responses due by 5/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV of Shawn G. Crowley)(Greenberg, Gerald)
April 25, 2022 Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re #66 MOTION to Expedite filed by Hillary R. Clinton. Replies due by 5/2/2022. (Markus, David)
April 25, 2022 Filing 88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for George R.A. Doumar. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15586857 by Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.. Responses due by 5/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Jonathan)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #82 Defendant Debbie Wasserman Schultz's Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is April 25, 2022. (DE #23 ). She seeks to extend this deadline until May 11, 2022, citing the voluminous nature of Plaintiff's Complaint. I find good cause to grant the Motion. (DE #82 ). Accordingly, Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to May 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/25/2022. (kal)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #80 Defendants Perkins Coie LLP, Michael Sussman, Marc Elias, the Democratic National Committee and DNC Services Corp. (DNC), Robert E. Mook, Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson, and Peter Fritsch's (collectively, "Defendants") Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants seek an extension of time until May 11, 2022 for each to serve their respective responsive pleading or motion directed to the Complaint, citing the voluminous nature of Plaintiff's Complaint. I find good cause to grant the Motion. (DE #80 ). Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to May 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/25/2022. (kal)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #62 , #64 , #68 , #69 , #72 , #73 , and #74 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Benjamin Peacock, Joshua Berman, April A. Otterberg, Reid J. Schar, Joshua A. Levy, Rachel Clattenburg, and Kevin P. Crenny. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/25/2022. (kal)
April 25, 2022 Filing 84 MOTION To redact addresses from public record and preclude further filing of the addresses on the public record by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redacted copy of docket entry 28, #3 Exhibit Redacted copy of docket entry 28-1, #4 Exhibit Redacted copy of docket entry 45, #5 Exhibit Redacted copy of docket entry 45-1)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE to #66 "Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for an Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint as a Matter of Course or to Response [sic] to Hillary Clinton's Motion to Dismiss." Plaintiff's Certificate of Conferral indicates that "[a]n email was sent to all counsel on record" and that Plaintiff's counsel "called David Kendall and left a message," but that no response was received at the time Plaintiff filed the Motion. This does not satisfy the conferral requirements of this court's Local Rules. As such, I cannot discern whether the requested relief is opposed. In the interest of ruling on Plaintiff's Motion without unnecessary delay I will expedite briefing. Therefore, if any Defendant opposes the Motion, they must file a response on or before April 27, 2022 explaining their position. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/25/2022. (kal)
April 23, 2022 Filing 82 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by Debbie Wasserman Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting DWS Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint)(Greenberg, Gerald)
April 23, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerald Edward Greenberg on behalf of Debbie Wasserman Schultz. Attorney Gerald Edward Greenberg added to party Debbie Wasserman Schultz(pty:dft). (Greenberg, Gerald)
April 22, 2022 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by DNC Services Corporation, Democratic National Committee, Marc Elias, Peter Fritsch, Fusion GPS, Robert E. Mook, Perkins Coie, LLC, Glenn Simpson, Michael Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time)(Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
April 22, 2022 Filing 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perkins Coie, LLC (Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
April 22, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerald Edward Greenberg on behalf of DNC Services Corporation. Attorney Gerald Edward Greenberg added to party DNC Services Corporation(pty:dft). (Greenberg, Gerald)
April 22, 2022 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerald Edward Greenberg on behalf of Democratic National Committee. Attorney Gerald Edward Greenberg added to party Democratic National Committee(pty:dft). (Greenberg, Gerald)
April 22, 2022 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William R. Barzee on behalf of Robert E. Mook. Attorney William R. Barzee added to party Robert E. Mook(pty:dft). (Barzee, William)
April 22, 2022 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eleni S. Kastrenakes Howard on behalf of Perkins Coie, LLC. Attorney Eleni S. Kastrenakes Howard added to party Perkins Coie, LLC(pty:dft). (Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
April 22, 2022 Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin P. Crenny. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15582106 by Peter Fritsch, Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. Responses due by 5/6/2022 (Fels, Adam)
April 22, 2022 Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rachel Clattenburg. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15582090 by Peter Fritsch, Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. Responses due by 5/6/2022 (Fels, Adam)
April 22, 2022 Filing 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua A. Levy. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15582082 by Peter Fritsch, Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. Responses due by 5/6/2022 (Fels, Adam)
April 22, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Seth Fels on behalf of Peter Fritsch, Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. Attorney Adam Seth Fels added to party Peter Fritsch(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Seth Fels added to party Fusion GPS(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Seth Fels added to party Glenn Simpson(pty:dft). (Fels, Adam)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #65 Defendant Nellie Ohr's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Nellie Ohr's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is April 21, 2022. (DE #34 ). Defendant Nellie Ohr requests a 20-day extension of this deadline, citing the extensive nature of the Complaint. I find good cause to grant the Motion. Accordingly, Defendant Nellie Ohr's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to May 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2022. (kal)
April 22, 2022 Filing 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Reid J. Schar. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15581858 by Marc Elias. Responses due by 5/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Reid J. Schar Certification Pursuant to Rule 4(b), #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Pettis, Eugene)
April 22, 2022 Filing 68 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for April A. Otterberg. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15581774 by Marc Elias. Responses due by 5/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification April Otterberg Certification Pursuant to Rule 4(b), #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Pettis, Eugene)
April 22, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roberto Martinez on behalf of Michael Sussman. Attorney Roberto Martinez added to party Michael Sussman(pty:dft). (Martinez, Roberto)
April 21, 2022 Filing 66 MOTION to Expedite by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Amended Complaint)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 21, 2022 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Nellie Ohr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fels, Adam)
April 21, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua Berman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15579833 by Bruce Ohr, Nellie Ohr. Responses due by 5/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fels, Adam)
April 21, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene K. Pettis on behalf of Marc Elias (Pettis, Eugene)
April 21, 2022 Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Benjamin Peacock. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15579823 by Bruce Ohr, Nellie Ohr. Responses due by 5/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fels, Adam)
April 21, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene K. Pettis on behalf of Marc Elias. Attorney Eugene K. Pettis added to party Marc Elias(pty:dft). (Pettis, Eugene)
April 21, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Seth Fels on behalf of Bruce Ohr, Nellie Ohr. Attorney Adam Seth Fels added to party Bruce Ohr(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Seth Fels added to party Nellie Ohr(pty:dft). (Fels, Adam)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #55 Defendant Igor Danchenko's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Danchenko's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint was April 20, 2022. (DE #25 ). Defendant Danchenko seeks an extension until May 20, 2022, citing that he "requires additional time" to evaluate the extensive Complaint. (DE #55 ). I find good cause to grant the Motion. Accordingly, Defendant Danchenko's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to May 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/21/2022. (kal)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #49 , #50 , #51 , and #54 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys David E. Kendall, Michael J. Mestitz, Katherine M. Turner, and Franklin Monsour Jr. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/21/2022. (kal)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #47 Defendant Charles Halliday Dolan's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Dolan's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint was April 20, 2022. (DE #27 ). Defendant seeks a 30-day extension of this deadline, citing the extensive nature of the Complaint and that Defendant Dolan "is sorting through issues of legal representation." (DE #47 ). I find good cause to grant the Motion. Accordingly, Defendant Dolan's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to May 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/21/2022. (kal) Modified signature date on 4/21/2022 (pcs).
April 21, 2022 Filing 56 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Service on #1 Complaint by Donald J. Trump. NO proof of service attached. (Ticktin, Peter). Modified on 4/21/2022 (lbc).
April 20, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by Igor Danchenko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fassbender, Diana)
April 20, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Franklin Monsour Jr.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15575603 by Igor Danchenko. Responses due by 5/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fassbender, Diana)
April 20, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diana Marie Fassbender on behalf of Igor Danchenko. Attorney Diana Marie Fassbender added to party Igor Danchenko(pty:dft). (Fassbender, Diana)
April 20, 2022 Filing 52 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,,, by Hillary R. Clinton. Responses due by 5/4/2022 (Markus, David)
April 20, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Katherine M. Turner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-15575178 by Hillary R. Clinton. Responses due by 5/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Markus, David)
April 20, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael J. Mestitz. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-15575169 by Hillary R. Clinton. Responses due by 5/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Markus, David)
April 20, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David E. Kendall. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15575147 by Hillary R. Clinton. Responses due by 5/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Markus, David)
April 20, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Oscar Markus on behalf of Hillary R. Clinton. Attorney David Oscar Markus added to party Hillary R. Clinton(pty:dft). (Markus, David)
April 20, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time extension to 05/23/2022 to file responsive pleading by Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.. Attorney Jonathan Edward Levine added to party Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levine, Jonathan)
April 20, 2022 Filing 46 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Fusion GPS served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Fusion GPS)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 19, 2022 Filing 45 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Kevin Clinesmith served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Kevin Clinesmith)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 19, 2022 Filing 44 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Michael Sussman served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Michael Sussmann)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 19, 2022 Filing 43 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Glenn Simpson served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Glenn Simpson)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #40 Defendant Neustar, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Neustar, Inc. seeks a 30-day extension of its deadline to respond to the Complaint, citing the extensive nature of the Complaint and the need for additional time to review relevant documents. I find good cause to grant the Motion. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Neustar, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to May 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/19/2022. (kal)
April 18, 2022 Filing 41 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neustar, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Neustar, Inc. (Epps, Alexandria)
April 18, 2022 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by Neustar, Inc.. Attorney Alexandria N Epps added to party Neustar, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Epps, Alexandria)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 5/8/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 5/3/2023 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart to conduct a Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 15, 2022 Filing 36 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. John Podesta served on 4/13/2022, response/answer due 5/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on John Podesta)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 14, 2022 Filing 38 Letter from Phillp Mohler. (ebz)
April 14, 2022 Filing 37 Letter from Phillp Mohler. (ebz)
April 13, 2022 Filing 35 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Bruce Ohr served on 3/31/2022, response/answer due 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Bruce Ohr)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 13, 2022 Filing 34 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Nellie Ohr served on 3/31/2022, response/answer due 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Nellie Ohr)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 13, 2022 Filing 33 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Perkins Coie, LLC served on 4/6/2022, response/answer due 4/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 32 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. DNC Services Corporation served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 31 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Peter Fritsch served on 4/6/2022, response/answer due 4/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #21 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (gm1)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart as Paired Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 4/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
April 6, 2022 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Andrew McCabe served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Andrew McCabe)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 6, 2022 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Charles Halliday Dolan Jr. served on 3/30/2022, response/answer due 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 6, 2022 Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Democratic National Committee served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Democratic National Commitee)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 6, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Igor Danchenko served on 3/30/2022, response/answer due 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Igor Danchenko)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 6, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Robert E. Mook served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Robert E Mook)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 6, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Debbie Wasserman Schultz served on 4/4/2022, response/answer due 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Debbie Wasserman)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 4, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald J. Trump. Marc Elias served on 4/4/2022, response/answer due 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process on Marc Elias)(Ticktin, Peter)
April 4, 2022 Filing 21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks by Donald J. Trump. (Ticktin, Peter)
April 4, 2022 Filing 20 Letter from Philip Mohler (lbc)
March 30, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of filing letter by Phillp Roy Mohler. (ebz)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #17 the Parties' Joint Notice of Filing Redacted Copies of Summonses and Motion to Otherwise Redact Addresses from the Court's Public Record. The United States has moved to redact the addresses of five named former FBI employees from the docket in Case No. 22-cv-14101. Docketing staff from the clerk's office has advised my chambers that Case No. 22-cv-14101 was opened in error, and accordingly the addresses for all Defendants have now been removed from that docket. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/30/2022. (kal)
March 30, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to redact addresses from companion case by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
March 30, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by United States Of America re #12 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Joint Filing of Redacted Copies (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redacted copy of docket entries 1-24 - 1-28, #3 Exhibit Redacted copy of docket entry 7) (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 and #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Michael T. Madaio and Alina Habba. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/29/2022. (kal)
March 28, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by removing images from docket entries #1 -24, #1 -25, #1 -26, #1 -27, #1 -28 & #7 pursuant to #12 Order. (kpe)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REDACT re #10 Motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE and REMOVE docket entries 1-24, 1-25, 1-26, 1-27, 1-28 and 7 from the record. Plaintiff SHALL FILE redacted copies of docket entries 1-24, 1-25, 1-26, 1-27, 1-28 and 7 on or before March 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 3/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
March 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to redact addresses from DE 1-24, 1-25, 1-26, 1-27, 1-28, and 7 p.24-28 re #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued by United States Of America. Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party United States Of America(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alina Habba. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15508371 by Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 4/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ticktin, Peter)
March 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael T. Madaio. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15508333 by Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 4/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ticktin, Peter)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ail)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Alina Habba and Michael T. Madaio, mailing date March 24, 2022, (pt)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee $402.00, receipt number AFLSDC-15504826, Electronic Civil Case Filing re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Ticktin, Peter)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $402.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (jua)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The filing fee has not been paid. (ebz)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by DONALD J TRUMP. No Motion for IFP filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s), #13 Summon(s), #14 Summon(s), #15 Summon(s), #16 Summon(s), #17 Summon(s), #18 Summon(s), #19 Summon(s), #20 Summon(s), #21 Summon(s), #22 Summon(s), #23 Summon(s), #24 Summon(s), #25 Summon(s), #26 Summon(s), #27 Summon(s), #28 Summon(s), #29 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ticktin, Peter) Modified text on 3/24/2022 (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trump v. Clinton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Alina Habba
Represented By: Michael T. Madaio
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Represented By: Jared Joseph Roberts
Represented By: Garrett Edward Kesl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary R. Clinton
Represented By: David Oscar Markus
Represented By: Katherine M. Turner
Represented By: Michael J. Mestitz
Represented By: David E. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Shawn G. Crowley
Represented By: Maximillian Feldman
Represented By: Roberta A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HFACC, Inc.
Represented By: Paola Pinto
Represented By: Robert P. Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNC Services Corporation
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Shawn G. Crowley
Represented By: Maximillian Feldman
Represented By: Roberta A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perkins Coie, LLC
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes Howard
Represented By: Howard Jay Harrington
Represented By: F. Joseph Warin
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Sigler
Represented By: Katherine Moran Meeks
Represented By: Nancy E. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sussman
Represented By: Roberto Martinez
Represented By: Stephen P. Barry
Represented By: Michael S. Bosworth
Represented By: Michael F. Houlihan
Represented By: Sean M. Berkowitz
Represented By: Zachary Andrew Lipshultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Elias
Represented By: Eugene K. Pettis
Represented By: April A. Otterberg
Represented By: Reid J. Schar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Wasserman Schultz
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Shawn G. Crowley
Represented By: Maximillian Feldman
Represented By: Roberta A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Halliday Dolan Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Levine
Represented By: George R.A. Doumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Sullivan
Represented By: Brian L. Stekloff
Represented By: Sarah E. Neuman
Represented By: William R. Barzee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Podesta
Represented By: Paola Pinto
Represented By: Robert P. Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Mook
Represented By: William R. Barzee
Represented By: Isabela M. Garcez
Represented By: Wendy B. Reilly
Represented By: Andrew J. Ceresney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillipe Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fusion GPS
Represented By: Joshua Levy
Represented By: Kevin P. Crenny
Represented By: Rachel Clattenburg
Represented By: Adam Seth Fels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Simpson
Represented By: Joshua Levy
Represented By: Kevin P. Crenny
Represented By: Rachel Clattenburg
Represented By: Adam Seth Fels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Fritsch
Represented By: Joshua Levy
Represented By: Kevin P. Crenny
Represented By: Rachel Clattenburg
Represented By: Adam Seth Fels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellie Ohr
Represented By: Adam Seth Fels
Represented By: Benjamin Peacock
Represented By: Joshua Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Ohr
Represented By: Adam Seth Fels
Represented By: Benjamin Peacock
Represented By: Joshua Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbis Business Intelligence, Ltd.
Represented By: Enjolique Aytch Lett
Represented By: Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor Danchenko
Represented By: Franklin G. Monsour, Jr.
Represented By: Diana Marie Fassbender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neustar, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandria N Epps
Represented By: Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez
Represented By: Samantha L. Southall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Joffe
Represented By: Edward Soto
Represented By: Steven Tyrrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Comey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Strzok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Clinesmith
Represented By: Noah Hy Brozinsky
Represented By: Christopher Muha
Represented By: William Pittard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Represented By: Stephen R. Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neustar Security Services
Represented By: James Evans Gillenwater
Represented By: Allison S. Eisen
Represented By: John M. McNichols
Represented By: Kathryn E. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alina Habba
Represented By: Jared Joseph Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael T Madaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Habba Madaio & Associates
Represented By: Jared Joseph Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peter Ticktin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jamie A Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Ticktin Law Group
Represented By: Garrett Edward Kesl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?