Austin v. McHugh et al
Plaintiff: Robert Allen Austin
Defendant: Elizabeth Rose McHugh and James Walter McCann
Case Number: 2:2023cv14370
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Compliance by Robert Allen Austin re 23 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. (Copy of docket sheet mailed to Plaintiff) (amb)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as frivolous Plaintiff's "Motion to Alter or Amend to Set Aside" #22 . The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED TO MAIL A COPY of docket to Plaintiff. This case remains closed. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/17/2024. (mp01)
January 16, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION to Alter or Amend to Set Aside Doc Entry #12 Order Dismissing/Closing Case, Pursuant to (FRCP) 59-(e) Pursuant to (FRCP) Rule 60-(b)(1)- (Excusable Neglect) by Robert Allen Austin. Responses due by 1/30/2024. (pc)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as frivolous Plaintiff's "Motion: Obey as a Public Servant" #19 and "Motion for this Court to Respond" #20 . This case remains closed. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/11/2024. (mp01)
January 10, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for this Court to Respond to Doc Entry #19, 16 by 1/17/2024 re #19 Notice (Other) by Robert Allen Austin. (pc)
January 3, 2024 Filing 19 Motion: Obey as a Public Servant rendering Doc Entry:# 12 void/null by Robert Allen Austin re #17 Motion, re 18 Order on Motion for Reconsideration (pc) Modified text on 1/3/2024 (pc).
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER striking Plaintiff's Order to Obey #17 . This case remains closed. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/28/23. (cdz)
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 (STRICKEN PER DE#18) Motion: Order to Obey Doc: Entry #12 Is Rendered Void by Ex-Post Facto Law by Article I, Section 9, Clause 3.3.1. and Article I.-Section 10, Clause 1.5. That are Law Statutes of the United States Constitution that are Part of the Bill of Rights that lay within the United States Constitution Created for (We the People of the United States) re #12 Order Dismissing/Closing Case, by Robert Allen Austin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(pc) Text Modified on 1/2/2024 (cqs).
December 12, 2023 Filing 16 (Amended to Support Doc Entry #1,6,9,10,11,13,14) Motion: To Take Notice of Registered Deed of a (Affidavit of Reservation of Rights.) Filed by I, Robert Allen Austin for ROBERT ALLEN AUSTIN Registered Deed on 8.5 by 14; Legal Paper and a Legal True Copy of a Live Birth Vital Record by Robert Allen Austin (pc)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration #13 and Plaintiff's Motion to Take Notice of Registered Deed #14 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/11/2023. (mys)
December 8, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION: To Take Notice of a Registered Deed of a (Affidavit of Reservation of Rights,) Filed By I, Robert Allen Austin for ROBERT ALLEN AUSTIN Registered Deed on 8.5 by 14; Legal paper and a Legal True Copy of Live Birth Vital Record by Robert Allen Austin (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (pc)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 Motion: To Reconsider Docket Entry #12 Order Dismissing Claim Sua Sonte: Rule 60(a),(b)(4) for lack of Jurisdiction by Robert Allen Austin. (pc)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Motions terminated: #10 MOTION of a staked claim filed by Robert Allen Austin, #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Allen Austin, #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Allen Austin. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/7/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 11 Motion: A Written Warning Shot is being sent Across your Bow(s) By Me, Myself and I, Robert Allen Austin/ROBERT ALLEN AUSTIN. (pc) Modified text on 12/7/2023 (pc).
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION of a staked claim by a Free Mason of the Declaration of Independence and the United States Constitution for Me, Myself and I, by Robert Allen Austin. (pc)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION: Request, Amend, Adjust tolling Time for Motion: Summary Judgement from (12/11/2023) to (12/22/2023) as to #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert Allen Austin. (pc)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robert Allen Austin. James Walter McCann served on 11/28/2023, response/answer due 12/19/2023. (pc)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robert Allen Austin. Elizabeth Rose McHugh served on 11/28/2023, response/answer due 12/19/2023. (pc)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment: For an Illegal Act of Fraud, Force of an Illegal Motion Performed in Clear Absence of All Jurisdiction by Robert Allen Austin. Responses due by 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits in Support)(scn)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to James Walter McCann. (scn)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Rose McHugh. (scn)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/27/2023 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number 3343. (scn)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against James Walter McCann, Elizabeth Rose McHugh. Filing fee $ 402.00, filed by Robert Allen Austin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(scn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. McHugh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Allen Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Rose McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walter McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?