State of Florida Martin County v. Malvezzi
Plaintiff: State of Florida Martin County
Defendant: James Malvezzi
Case Number: 2:2023cv14388
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 28 Transmittal Letter Sent with With Certify Copies to: Nineteenth Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: 23001247CFAXMX (cds)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Remanding Case to State Court. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (mh02)
January 22, 2024 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL of State Criminal Prosecution against State of Florida Martin County, filed by James Malvezzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(nwn)
January 8, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Amended Notice of Appeal to the Fourth District Court of Appeal of West Palm Beach by James Malvezzi (jgo)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #23 Motion for Reconsideration re #4 Order Remanding Case to State Court, 13 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, filed by James Malvezzi, per (ECF No. #20 ). Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/3/2024. (mh02)
January 2, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Two Orders re #4 Order Remanding Case to State Court, and 13 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by James Malvezzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(nwn)
December 29, 2023 Filing 21 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by James Malvezzi. Date received by USCA: 12/27/2023. USCA Case Number: 23-14176-H. (jgo)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Reconsideration re #4 Order Remanding Case to State Court, 13 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, filed by James Malvezzi. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (mh02)
December 29, 2023 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #22 Notice of Appeal. Notice has been electronically mailed. (jgo)
December 28, 2023 Filing 22 Duplicate Notice of Appeal re #4 Order Remanding Case to State Court by James Malvezzi. No Filing Fee Required. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jgo)
December 27, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Malvezzi re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order Remanding Case to State Court, 13 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (nwn)
December 27, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Two Orders re #4 Order Remanding Case to State Court, and 13 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by James Malvezzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(nwn)
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Instructions to James Malvezzi re #15 Notice of Appeal. (jgo)
December 27, 2023 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #15 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (jgo)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 605.00 receipt number 3365 re #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by James Malvezzi. (jgo)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Appeal re #4 Order Remanding Case to State Court by James Malvezzi. Receipt#: 3365. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jgo)
December 21, 2023 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #5 Transmittal Letter Sent (nwn)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon pro se Defendant James Malvezzi's Motion to Correct the Docket Annotation of the (9) Attachments. #12 . Therein, Defendant requests that the Court "correct the order of attachments on the docket" with respect to certain filings. Id. at 1. On December 8, 2023, Defendant filed a Notice of Removal of State Criminal Prosecution and New Matters to Federal Court. See #1 . On December 12, 2023, the Court entered an Order #4 remanding Defendant's state criminal action back to the Nineteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Martin County, Florida, and closing this case. See #4 . Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Correct the Docket Annotation of the (9) Attachments #12 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/19/2023. (mh02)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Correct the Docket Annotation of the (9) Attachments re #1 Complaint, by James Malvezzi. Responses due by 12/29/2023 (nwn)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, filed by James Malvezzi. (nwn)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, filed by James Malvezzi. (nwn)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, filed by James Malvezzi. (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Request of Evidence Video by James Malvezzi. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(mee)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #6 Notice (Other) by James Malvezzi (mee)
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing re Certificate of Service by James Malvezzi re #1 Complaint, (mee)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 Transmittal Letter Sent with With Certify Copies to: Nineteenth Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: 23001247CFAXMX (cds)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Remanding Case to State Court. Closing Case. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/12/2023. See attached document for full details. (mh02)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 12/8/2023 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 3355. (wce)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (wce)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) against State of Florida Martin County. Filing fees $ 405.00, filed by James Malvezzi. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 5, #4 Attachment 6, #5 Attachment 7, #6 Attachment 8)(wce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Florida Martin County v. Malvezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida Martin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Malvezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?