Canterella v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Canterella
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. and Sherry Wilson
Case Number: 2:2023cv14389
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Shaniek Mills Maynard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Filing 19 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/1/2024 09:30 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon via Zoom. The Zoom link and information will be emailed to the parties of record one business day before the scheduled hearing. All participants during the hearing are expected to appear by audio and video in a professional setting, with a reliable internet connection tested sufficiently in advance of the scheduled hearing. The parties shall prepare in advance and be ready to discuss the status of the case in detail, including all completed and outstanding discovery. (tci)
January 30, 2024 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT DEFENDANTS REMOVAL STATUS REPORT by Sam's East, Inc. (Reed, Gregory)
January 30, 2024 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM: I will hold a final discovery status conference on Tuesday, June 18, 2024, at 2:00 P.M. via Zoom. To join, the parties shall log in at least 10 minutes prior to the start time using the Zoom information below from a secure location and with a secure internet connection. **Please test your device's audio/video settings prior to joining the conference for functionality.** Join ZoomGov Meeting: # Zoom Link Meeting ID: 161 921 4596 Passcode: 185708If the link does not work, paste this link information into your address bar and go: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1619214596?pwd=ZWgzYUsyRmFqdmdsUnYvdzdaUjVRUT09 Prior to the conference, by Thursday, June 13, 2024, the parties shall file a Joint Discovery Status Report addressing (1) what discovery has been propounded by each party; (2) if the discovery requests have been answered; (3) the status of depositions, including the number of depositions taken, those that remain to be taken and if they have been scheduled, and an explanation of any delay in deposition scheduling; (4) the status of expert disclosures; (5) if there are any outstanding discovery disputes; (6) if the parties believe a discovery status conference is needed and whether it may be canceled; and (7) if the parties can certify that all discovery will be completed by the discovery deadline. I encourage the parties to keep in mind their obligations in discovery and to work cooperatively to complete discovery in this case as efficiently and expeditiously as possible. To the extent either party believes Court intervention is necessary, such party shall abide by the procedures set forth in my forthcoming Discovery Procedures Order. See DE 16. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard on 1/30/2024. (cfg)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL, SETTING PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 12/2/2024 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Calendar Call set for 11/26/2024 01:45 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2024., Discovery due by 7/23/2024., Expert Discovery due by 7/23/2024., Mediation Deadline 8/6/2024., In Limine Motions due by 11/4/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2024., Motions due by 8/14/2024., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/4/2024.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 26, 2024 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Sam's East, Inc., Sherry Wilson (Reed, Gregory)
January 26, 2024 Filing 13 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement DEFENDANTS SAMS EAST, INC. AND SHERRY WILSONS CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sam's East, Inc., Sherry Wilson identifying Other Affiliate HealthSpring of Florida, Inc., Other Affiliate Premier Physical Therapy & Sports Medicine, Other Affiliate Coastal Orthopedics & Sports Medicine Center, Other Affiliate Dr. Jeffrey Lazarus, Other Affiliate HCA Florida St. Lucie Hospital, Other Affiliate Treasure Coast Surgical, Other Affiliate South Florida Orthopaedics & Sports Medicine, Other Affiliate Dr. Agustin Sanz, Other Affiliate Nathaniel H. Hill, M.D. for Sam's East, Inc., Sherry Wilson (Reed, Gregory)
January 26, 2024 Filing 12 Initial Disclosure(s) of RULE 26 DEFENDANTS RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Sam's East, Inc., Sherry Wilson (Reed, Gregory)
January 25, 2024 Filing 11 Defendant's NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT, SAMS EAST, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO COUNT III OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Sam's East, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smothers, Julian)
January 25, 2024 Filing 10 Defendant's NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT, SHERRY WILSONS MOTION TO DISMISS by Sherry Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smothers, Julian)
January 24, 2024 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Canterella (Rivero, Ernesto)
January 10, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN REMOVAL CASES. ( Removal Status Report due by 1/31/2024.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/26/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ernesto Gabriel Rivero on behalf of John Canterella (Rivero, Ernesto)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Ernesto Rivero, mailing date December 11, 2023, (pt)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 DECLARATION signed by: Sherry Wilson re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Sherry Wilson (nwn)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17131156, filed by Sherry Wilson, Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Motion to Dismiss & Answer, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Reed, Gregory) Answer and Motion to Dismiss Filed. Modified text and attachment description on 12/11/2023 (nwn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canterella v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Canterella
Represented By: Julie Allyson Herzlich
Represented By: Ernesto G. Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Andrew Reed
Represented By: Julian Michael Smothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Wilson
Represented By: Gregory Andrew Reed
Represented By: Julian Michael Smothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?