Molina v. Wipro Limited Corp
Plaintiff: Oscar Molina
Defendant: Wipro Limited Corp
Case Number: 2:2024cv14103
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Shaniek Mills Maynard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard on 5/31/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
May 30, 2024 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM: I will hold a final discovery status conference on Thursday, January 16, 2025, at 1:00 P.M. via Zoom. To join, the parties shall log in at least 10 minutes prior to the start time using the Zoom information below from a secure location and with a secure internet connection. **Please test your device's audio/video settings prior to joining the conference for functionality.** Join ZoomGov Meeting: # Zoom Link Meeting ID: 161 921 4596 Passcode: 185708If the link does not work, paste this link information into your address bar and go: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1619214596?pwd=ZWgzYUsyRmFqdmdsUnYvdzdaUjVRUT09 Prior to the conference, by Thursday, January 9, 2025, the parties shall file a Joint Discovery Status Report addressing (1) what discovery has been propounded by each party; (2) if the discovery requests have been answered; (3) the status of depositions, including the number of depositions taken, those that remain to be taken and if they have been scheduled, and an explanation of any delay in deposition scheduling; (4) the status of expert disclosures; (5) if there are any outstanding discovery disputes; (6) if the parties believe a discovery status conference is needed and whether it may be canceled; and (7) if the parties can certify that all discovery will be completed by the discovery deadline. I encourage the parties to keep in mind their obligations in discovery and to work cooperatively to complete discovery in this case as efficiently and expeditiously as possible. To the extent either party believes Court intervention is necessary, such party shall abide by the procedures set forth in my forthcoming Discovery Procedures Order. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard on 5/30/2024. (jd02)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Trial, Setting Pre-Trial Deadlines: ( Jury Trial set for 6/16/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Calendar Call set for 6/10/2025 01:45 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2024., Discovery due by 2/18/2025., Expert Discovery due by 2/18/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 7/8/2024., Mediation Deadline 3/4/2025., In Limine Motions due by 5/12/2025., Motions due by 3/10/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/12/2025.), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/21/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 20, 2024 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Joint by Oscar Molina (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sconzo, Gregory)
May 20, 2024 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Oscar Molina (Sconzo, Gregory)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/20/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
April 29, 2024 Filing 8 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Wipro Limited Corp (Andrews, Nicholas)
April 29, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Wipro Limited Corp (Andrews, Nicholas)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Wipro Limited Corp. Attorney Nicholas S Andrews added to party Wipro Limited Corp(pty:dft). (Andrews, Nicholas)
April 10, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Oscar Molina. Wipro Limited Corp served on 4/9/2024, response/answer due 4/30/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory)
April 8, 2024 Filing 4 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Oscar Molina (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue) (Sconzo, Gregory)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wipro Limited Corp. (drz)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wipro Limited Corp. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17430123, filed by Oscar Molina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sconzo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina v. Wipro Limited Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Molina
Represented By: Samantha Lyn Simpson
Represented By: Gregory Steven Sconzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wipro Limited Corp
Represented By: Nicholas S Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?