Mills et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Patrick G. Mills, Jr. and Dawn Mills
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 4:2018cv10196
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 09:30 AM in Key West Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 12/5/2019 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Dawn Mills, Patrick G. Mills, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Siracusa, John)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties by Dawn Mills, Patrick G. Mills, Jr. identifying Other Affiliate John M. Siracusa, Other Affiliate Joseph W. Janssen, III for Dawn Mills, Patrick G. Mills, Jr. (Siracusa, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Dawn Mills, Patrick G. Mills, Jr. re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Requiring Parties to Meet & File Joint Scheduling Report, et al.) (Siracusa, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent ARX Executive Holdings, LLLP, Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Other Affiliate Fowler White Burnett P.A., Other Affiliate Nielsen & Treas, LLC, Other Affiliate Megan Snider for American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Pennekamp, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent ARX Executive Holdings, LLLP, Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Pennekamp, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Attorney John Michael Pennekamp added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft). (Pennekamp, John)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Dawn Mills, Patrick G. Mills, Jr.. American Strategic Insurance Corp. served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Siracusa, John)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (ls)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ls)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11044599, filed by Dawn Mills, Patrick G. Mills, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A - Insurance Contract, #2 Exhibit B - October 26, 2017 letter from Monroe County Building Department, #3 Exhibit C - Monroe Countys Substantially Damaged Handout, #4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit D - Proof of Loss and Estimate, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s))(Siracusa, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick G. Mills, Jr.
Represented By: John Marcus Siracusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Mills
Represented By: John Marcus Siracusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?