Kessler et al v. City of Key West et al
Plaintiff: Stuart Kessler and Pamela Kessler
Defendant: George Wallace, Douglas N. Higgins Inc., City of Key West, Paul R. Waters, Karen M. Olsen, Jim Young, James K. Scholl, Doug Bradshaw, Mark Tait, Greg Veliz and Ronald Ramsingh
Case Number: 4:2019cv10030
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Sanctions. Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (kmh)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/8/2019. Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 45 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Plaintiffs Pamela Kessler and Stuart Kessler appeared pro se; Michael Thomas Burke appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Matter taken under advisement. Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sl)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of suggestion of conflict of interest in Defense counsel's joint representation by Pamela Kessler, Stuart Kessler (lk)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Thomas Burke on behalf of Doug Bradshaw, Karen M. Olsen, Ronald Ramsingh, James K. Scholl, Mark Tait, Greg Veliz, George Wallace, Jim Young. Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party Doug Bradshaw(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party Karen M. Olsen(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party Ronald Ramsingh(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party James K. Scholl(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party Mark Tait(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party Greg Veliz(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party George Wallace(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party Jim Young(pty:dft). (Burke, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing on #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Sanctions for 4/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Each party shall submit a witness and exhibit list at the Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/21/2019. (kmh)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Sanctions filed by Pamela Kessler, Stuart Kessler. (jas)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Sanctions filed by City of Key West. Replies due by 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Burke, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant City of Key West's response to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is due by 3/15/2019. A review of the docket shows that Plaintiffs have failed to file proof that service was properly effectuated in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/13/2019. (kmh)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Sanctions by City of Key West. Responses due by 3/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Burke, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Thomas Burke on behalf of City of Key West. Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party City of Key West(pty:dft). (Burke, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO TIMELY RESPOND and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 3/26/2019), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Pamela Kessler, Stuart Kessler. (lk)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #9 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct event has been docketed as DE #10 (lk)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Stuart Kessler to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: skessler@kesslerlegal.com (lk)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Incorrect docket entry entered. (lk) Modified text and restricted image on 3/8/2019 (lk).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Consent by Pro Se Litigant to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Email address NOT added for Stuart Kessler. The Filer did not select/agree to all the terms and conditions on the form provided (see page 2 of consent form). (jc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Doug Bradshaw, City of Key West, Douglas N. Higgins Inc., Karen M. Olsen, Ronald Ramsingh, James K. Scholl, Mark Tait, Greg Veliz, George Wallace, Paul R. Waters, Jim Young. (mee)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Pamela Kessler, Stuart Kessler to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: skessler@kesslerlegal.com (jas)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 3/11/2019), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Sanctions by Pamela Kessler, Stuart Kessler. (jas)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doug Bradshaw, City of Key West, Douglas N. Higgins Inc., Karen M. Olsen, Ronald Ramsingh, James K. Scholl, Mark Tait, Greg Veliz, George Wallace, Paul R. Waters, Jim Young. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Stuart Kessler, Pamela Kessler. (1) Civil Cover Sheet) (jas). (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessler et al v. City of Key West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wallace
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas N. Higgins Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Key West
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen M. Olsen
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Young
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K. Scholl
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Bradshaw
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tait
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Veliz
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Ramsingh
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?