Davis v. Brandenburg et al

Plaintiff: Dean Everett Davis, Jr.
Defendant: Chief Sean T. Brandenburg and Officer Nicholas Dantu
Case Number: 4:2019cv10052
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE DISMISSAL NON-COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDERS AND/OR LACK OF PROSECUTION on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Dean Everett Davis, Jr.; Recommending that: 1. This civil action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for want of prosecution or for failure to comply with Court orders. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); and, 2. The case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before May 15, 2019, Plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee, or may renew his/her motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff renews his motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he/she must: a)Have the certificate concerning his/her prison bank account completed by an officer of the institution; and, b)Attach a certified copy of his/her prison/jail account for the six- month period preceding the filing of the complaint, in accordance with the above quoted statute. This must be a full statement of all deposits and withdrawals, not just a summary. Failure to pay the filing fee or renew his motion to proceed in forma pauperis will result in dismissal of this case. Responses due by 5/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Dean Everett Davis, Jr. Responses due by 4/24/2019 (ar2)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dean Everett Davis, Jr. (ar2)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ar2)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Sean T. Brandenburg, Nicholas Dantu. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Dean Everett Davis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ar2) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/12/2019) (rrs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Brandenburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Everett Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Sean T. Brandenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Nicholas Dantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?