CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON (THOSE UNDERWRITERS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE NUMBER 147044) v. ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON (THOSE UNDERWRITERS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE NUMBER 147044) a/s/o WILLIAM CHANEY, and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Those Underwriters Subscribing to Certificate of Insurance Number 147044)
Defendant: GROSS MECHANICAL LABORATORIES, INC., ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C. and SPEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv10087
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:30 AM in Key West Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 7/30/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 6/4/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for discovery. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Those Underwriters Subscribing to Certificate of Insurance Number 147044) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Election to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for Final Disposition of Motions)(Davant, Charles)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by GROSS MECHANICAL LABORATORIES, INC. (Reilly, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C. (Scarry, Brian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Those Underwriters Subscribing to Certificate of Insurance Number 147044) (Davant, Charles)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C. for dates of September 19 23, 2019, October 10 -14, 2019, November 21 25, 2019 (Horr, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent R.W. Spears, Inc. for SPEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Ebenfeld, Cindy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C.. (Scarry, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by GROSS MECHANICAL LABORATORIES, INC.. Attorney Michael John Reilly added to party GROSS MECHANICAL LABORATORIES, INC.(pty:dft). (Reilly, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Thomas Scarry on behalf of ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C.. Attorney Brian Thomas Scarry added to party ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C.(pty:dft). (Scarry, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David James Horr on behalf of ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C.. Attorney David James Horr added to party ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C.(pty:dft). (Horr, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Those Underwriters Subscribing to Certificate of Insurance Number 147044). GROSS MECHANICAL LABORATORIES, INC. served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Davant, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by SPEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY. Attorney Cindy Lea Ebenfeld added to party SPEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY(pty:dft). (Ebenfeld, Cindy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Those Underwriters Subscribing to Certificate of Insurance Number 147044). ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Davant, Charles)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Those Underwriters Subscribing to Certificate of Insurance Number 147044). SPEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Davant, Charles)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C., GROSS MECHANICAL LABORATORIES, INC., SPEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY. (jao)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11696774, filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON (THOSE UNDERWRITERS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE NUMBER 147044) a/s/o WILLIAM CHANEY,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Summons to Albren, #4 Summon(s) Summons to Spears, #5 Summon(s) Summons to Gross Mechanical)(Davant, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON (THOSE UNDERWRITERS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE NUMBER 147044) v. ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROSS MECHANICAL LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBREN YACHT SERVICES L.L.C.
Represented By: Brian Thomas Scarry
Represented By: David James Horr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: Cindy Lea Ebenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON (THOSE UNDERWRITERS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE NUMBER 147044) a/s/o WILLIAM CHANEY,
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Those Underwriters Subscribing to Certificate of Insurance Number 147044)
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Represented By: Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?