Facciobene v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Donald Facciobene
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 4:2020cv10039
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent ARX Executive Holdings, LLLP, Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Other Affiliate Federal Emergency Management Agency, Other Affiliate National Flood Insurance Program for American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Pennekamp, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent ARX Executive Holdings, LLLP, Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Pennekamp, John)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff did not include a proposed order as the Local Rules require, and counsel waited until 5:49 p.m., on the day the motion would be due, to seek an extension. The Court further notes that striking affirmative defenses is a drastic remedy that is generally disfavored. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/9/2020. (jd00)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses to Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses re #6 Answer to Complaint by Donald Facciobene. Responses due by 6/23/2020 (Delgado, Javier)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 09:30 AM in Key West Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 4/22/2021 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Attorney John Michael Pennekamp added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft). (Pennekamp, John)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Javier Delgado on behalf of Donald Facciobene (Delgado, Javier)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #3 Summons Issued filed by Donald Facciobene. (Delgado, Javier)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (cds)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12775822, filed by Donald Facciobene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Delgado, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facciobene v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Facciobene
Represented By: Javier Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?