Lola v. Miami Herald, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David James Lola
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Rick Ramsey, Monroe County Board of Commissioners, Miami Herald, Inc., Catherine Scheff, Robert Phillips, Jacob Otten, Monroe County, Monroe County Sheriff's Office, Key West Police Department and Daniel Blanco
Case Number: 4:2020cv10091
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge 9 Order, #5 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines to District Court (amb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 Plaintiff's FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by David James Lola re DE #4 Order. (amb)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER SUA SPONTE EXTENDING THE TIME TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. In light of plaintiff's purported objections, ECF No. 6, the time to file an amended complaint is hereby sua sponte extended to October 9, 2020. All other provisions of the court's order to file an amended complaint, ECF No. 5, remain in full force. Thus, plaintiff's amended complaint must be filed (i.e., received by the court and docketed) by October 9, 2020. The court will not use the date on which plaintiff signs the amended complaint or the date on which he submits it to prison authorities for mailing as the date of filing. Plaintiff is cautioned to take any potential mailing delays into account when determining by when to submit the amended complaint for mailing. FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY October 9, 2020 WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THE CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND/OR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/10/2020. (rm01)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Other).Plaintiff shall file his inmate account statement by October 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/10/2020. (rm01)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing IFP Motion, by David James Lola. (amb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 APPEAL/ OBJECTIONS of Magistrate Judge's Order re #5 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines to District Court (amb)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT (Amended Complaint due by 9/6/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Form) (br)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 9/4/2020. Motions due by 9/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP form) (br)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ebz)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Daniel Blanco, Does 1 through 10, Key West Police Department, Miami Herald, Inc., Monroe County, Monroe County Board of Commissioners, Monroe County Sheriff's Office, Jacob Otten, Robert Phillips, Rick Ramsey, Catherine Scheff. Filing fee $ 400.00 NOT PAID/MONIES DUE, filed by David James Lola.(ebz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lola v. Miami Herald, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Herald, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Scheff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Otten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key West Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Blanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David James Lola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?